Pirelli Armstrong v. Lay, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:01-cv-03645
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 3, 2017 at 11:58 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PIRELLI ARMSTRONG TIRE CORPORATION RETIREE MEDICAL BENEFITS TRUST, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Baskin Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Dollar Baskin, III +1 512 381 6300 +1 512 322 9280 jbaskin@baskin.com
v.
No Logo Andrew S Fastow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/25/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Bruce Drubel +1 603 643 9090 +1 603 643 9010 rdrubel@bsfllp.com

Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Represented by Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP

No Logo Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Bearkowitz PC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam B. Blair, Jr. +1 901 526 2000 +1 901 577 2000 sblair@bakerdonelson.com
No Logo Charles A Lemaistre, Defendant
No Logo Chris Hanslick, Defendant
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.

Represented by Wilshire & Scott

No Logo E Michelle Bohreer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roberts Markel, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg S Weinberg +1 713 840 1666 +1 713 840 9404 gweinberg@robertsmarkel.com
Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lassetter Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott D Lassetter +1 713 523 0325 +1 713 523 0132 sdl@lassetterfirm.com
No Logo Frank Savage, Defendant
No Logo Herbert S Winokur, Jr, Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "J P Morgan Chase & Co"

Represented by Mithoff Law Firm

No Logo John H Duncan, Defendant
No Logo John Mendelsohn, Defendant
No Logo John Wakeham, Defendant
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E Coleman, Jr. +1 214 855 3000 + 214 855 1333 jcoleman@ccsb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DIANE M. SUMOSKI +1 214 855 3000 + 214 855 1333 dsumoski@ccsb.com

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Lee A Collins, Defendant
No Logo Linda P Lay, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nathan Sommers Jacobs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George R Gibson +1 713 892 4843 +1 713 892 4840 ggibson@nathansommers.com
No Logo Norman P Blake, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Paulo V Ferraz Pereira, Defendant
No Logo Robert A Belfer, Defendant
No Logo Robert K Jaedicke, Defendant
No Logo Ronnie C Chan, Defendant
No Logo Trent L Rosenthal, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William D Cobb +1 214 220 5201 +1 214 220 5251 wcobb@cobbmartinez.com
No Logo Wendy L Gramm, Defendant
No Logo Affiliated Debtors and Debtors in Possession, Movant
No Logo Greg Whalley, Movant
No Logo Kevin Hannon, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reid Mason Figel +1 202 326 7918 +1 202 326 7999 RFIGEL@KHHTE.COM
No Logo Mark E Haedicke, Movant
No Logo Mary K Joyce, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Ondrasik, Jr. +1 202 429 6486 +1 202 429 3902 msherman@steptoe.com
Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Movant
Officially listed as "Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald A Wall

Toggle Switch Represented by Baggett Gordon & Deison

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George David Gordon +1 936 756 1813 +1 936 760 2305 gdgordon@bgdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Darden Fowler et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry L Foerster +1 936 756 3337 + 936 756 2606

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin Cardwell et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael V Marconi +1 214 999 1324 +1 214 999 1326

Toggle Switch Represented by Green & Green

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick A Green +1 936 756 4545 +1 936 756 4579

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Watson Cunningham +1 214 978 4003 + 214 978 4044 ccunningham@mckoolsmith.com
Space Mike McKool, Jr. +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Titus LeClair +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 lleclair@mckoolsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard J C Nicols +1 216 479 8500 +1 216 479 8500
Space Stephen Darrell Lerner +1 513 361 1200 +1 513 361 1201 slerner@ssd.com
Space James P +1 202 626 6793
Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "All Similarly Situated Officers and Directors of Enron Corp"
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rusty Hardin and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Hardin, Jr. +1 713 652 9000 +1 713 652 9800

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Ben F Glisan, Jr, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity EP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom P Allen +1 832 393 6411
No Logo Charles E Walker, Consol Defendant
No Logo Chewco Investments LP, Consol Defendant
No Logo Cindy K Olson, Consol Defendant
No Logo D Stephen Goddard, Jr, Consol Defendant
No Logo Duncan Law Firm, Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "David T Duncan"

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry G. Flynn +1 713 961 3366 +1 713 961 3938 bflynn@gordonrees.com
No Logo Dean Swick, Consol Defendant
No Logo James V Derrick, Jr, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Clifford Gunter, III +1 713 221 1213 + 713 221 2164 clifford.gunter@bgllp.com
No Logo Jeffrey K Skilling, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon M. Barrett +1 202 383 5308 +1 202 383 5414 sbarrett@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Petrocelli +1 310 553 6700 +1 213 430 6407 dpetrocelli@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Stern +1 202 383 5328 +1 202 383 5396 rstern@omm.com
No Logo Jeffrey McMahon, Consol Defendant
No Logo Jerome J Meyer, Consol Defendant
No Logo Joe H Foy, Consol Defendant
No Logo John A Urquhart, Consol Defendant
No Logo John Niemann, Consol Defendant
No Logo John Wakeman, Consol Defendant
No Logo Joseph M Hirko, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barnes H. Ellis +1 503 294 9243 +1 503 220 2480 bhellis@stoel.com
No Logo Joseph W Sutton, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jesse R. Pierce & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward John Jack O'Neill, Jr. +1 713 634 3638 +1 713 634 3639 joneill@pierceoneill.com
No Logo Ken L Harrison, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tonkon Torp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary W L Wright +1 503 802 2041 +1 503 802 3741 zach.wright@tonkon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F. Martson, Jr. +1 503 802 2005 +1 503 972 3705 rick.martson@tonkon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Amy Joseph Pedersen +1 503 802 2110
No Logo Ken Rice, Consol Defendant
No Logo Kenneth D Rice, Consol Defendant
No Logo LJM 2 Co-Investment LP, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BECK REDDEN & SECREST LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J.R. Nichols +1 713 951 3700 +1 713 951 3720 enichols@brsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark K Glasser +1 713 315 9002 +1 713 315 9199 mkglasser@sidley.com
No Logo Ljm Cayman L.p., Consol Defendant
No Logo Lou L Pai, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BECK REDDEN & SECREST LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Fogler +1 713 951 3700 +1 713 951 3720 mfogler@brsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Jeffrey +1 202 778 1800 + 202 822 8106 djeffrey@zuckerman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Eric Zuckerman +2027781 800 ext1802 +1 202 822 8106 rzuckerman@zuckerman.com
No Logo Mark E Koenig, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Thomas Inglima +1 202 624 2795 +1 202 628 5116 pinglima@crowell.com
No Logo Mark Frevert, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Michael Kopper, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barnet B Skelton +1 713 659 8761 +1 713 659 8764 barnetbjr@msn.com
No Logo Michael S McConnell, Consol Defendant
No Logo Richard A Causey, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tekell, Book, Matthews & Limmer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Robert Mace +1 713 222 9542 +1 713 655 7727 bmace@tekellbook.com
No Logo Richard Buy, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter & Hedges, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ronald Jones +1 713 226 6653 +1 713 226 6253 djones@porterhedges.com
No Logo Stanley Horton, Consol Defendant
No Logo Tom Elsenbrook, Consol Defendant
No Logo William Swanson, Consol Defendant
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Interested Party
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence David Finder +1 713 427 5030 +1 713 427 5099 lawrence.finder@bakermckenzie.com
Barclays PLC Barclays PLC, Interested Party
Unknown Role, Imperial Holly Corp
Unknown Role, Jcg Inc
Unknown Role, Candie's, Inc.
Unknown Role, Eott Energy LLC
No Logo Canadian Imperial Bank Of Commerce, Interested Party
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Interested Party
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Interested Party
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Interested Party
Unknown Role, Nrp, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Unknown Role, Briazz, Inc.
Unknown Role, Dsl.net, Inc.
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Brazil Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Solv Ex Corp
Unknown Role, Newmark Homes Corp
Unknown Role, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Unknown Role, Doblique Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
Unknown Role, Emerson Radio Corp
Unknown Role, Emachines Inc /de/
Unknown Role, Rreef America L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Id Arizona Corp.
No Logo Dr. Charles LeMaistre, Interested Party
Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc., Interested Party
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Interested Party
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co"
No Logo Candy Mounter, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Candy Mounter

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/13/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffery B Kaiser +1 713 571 8000 +1 713 571 8002 admindesk@kaiserconrad.com
No Logo Cheryl Trzebucki, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo David Trzebucki, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas E. Moseley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth D McConnico +1 281 286 7779 +1 281 286 9990 ken@mcconnicolaw.com
No Logo Detectives Endowment Association Annuity Fund, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Claxton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger F Claxton +1 214 969 9029 +1 214 953 0583 roger@claxtonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schoengold & Sporn, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Philips Sporn +1 212 964 0046 +1 212 267 8137 sporn@spornlaw.com
Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Consol Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Enron Corporation Savings Plan Administrative Committee"

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell Harrison et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin L Harrison +1 713 752 2332 +1 713 752 2330 rharrison@chd-law.com
No Logo Frank Conway, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Fred Greenberg, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Puls and Liebrecht P C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Kelly Puls +1 214 363 9393 +1 214 890 1300
No Logo Harvey L Young, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph E Kassoway, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Ted Suder +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 jts@fsblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Goldstein +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 egoldstein@gliplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris & Morris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen L. Morris +1 302 426 0400 +1 302 426 0406 kmorris@morrisandmorrislaw.com
No Logo Lynn Goffman, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Benckenstein Oxford LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hubert Oxford, IV +1 409 833 9182 +1 409 833 8819 hoxfordiv@benoxford.com
No Logo Richard P Bergsieker, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by David T. Lopez & Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David T Lopez +1 713 523 3900 +1 713 523 3908 dtlopez@lopezlawfirm.com
No Logo Rick Barsky, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abraham Watkins Nichols Sorrels Agosto & Aziz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel David Horowitz, III +1 713 222 7211 +1 713 225 0827 dhorowitz@abrahamwatkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Roberts Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Alan Roberts +1 713 630 0900 sr@therobertsfirm.com
No Logo Sara J McMurray, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cunningham Darlow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom Alan Cunningham +1 713 255 5500 +1 713 255 5555 tcunningham@cunninghamdarlow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Much Shelist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carol Valerie Gilden +1 312 521 2403 +1 312 621 1750 cgilden@muchshelist.com
No Logo Shirley Pratz, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shirley Pratz
No Logo WILLIAM COY, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Coy
No Logo William E Young, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Krislov & Associates, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jessica J Mead +1 312 606 0500 +1 312 606 0207

Toggle Switch Represented by VanDerGinst Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clinton A. Krislov +1 312 606 0500 +1 312 606 0207 clint@krislovlaw.com
No Logo Carolyn S Schwartz, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn S Schwartz +1 212 510 0500
No Logo Nathen Duke, Claimant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathen Duke
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (328) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Scott David Lassetter re: 325 Order on Motion to Reinstate, filed. Updated address could not be found. (glyons) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
    Mail Returned Undeliverable as to atty for Karen L Morris for Joseph E Kassoway re: 325 Order on Motion to Reinstate, filed. (hler, ) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
      Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James D Baskin, III atty for Pirelli Armstrong Tire Corporation Retiree Medical Benefits Trust re: 325 Order on Motion to Reinstate, filed. (hler, ) Renoitced to new address. (Entered: 06/20/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 324 Motion for Reinstatement and Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(bthomas, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
          Unopposed MOTION to Reinstate Case by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/24/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Unopposed Motion for Reinstatement and Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON SETTLEMENT ANNOUNCEMENT. Case terminated on March 4, 2011.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
              STATUS REPORT by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                STATUS REPORT by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                  STATUS REPORT by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                    STATUS REPORT by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs counsel shall file a status report within 3 weeks indicating whether any settlements have been reached, and if not, providing potential dates in early 2011 for trial of whatever remains of this litigation..(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 316 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate, The trial setting for 10/12/10 is VACATED; either party may move to reset this matter for trial.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                          Unopposed MOTION to Vacate by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order To Vacate Trial Setting)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 313 Motion for Continuance Jury Trial set for 10/12/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2010. Unopposed Motion for continuance of the May 3 trial is granted, as stated on the record. Jury Trial is RESET to 10/12/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon. (Order to issue.) Appearances:See attached for courtroom appearances, Lew LeClair by telephone.(Court Reporter: Gayle Dye), filed.(htippen, ) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Trial Setting by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 311 Motion for Conference. Status Conference set for 4/8/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Status Conference by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Status Conference)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      AGREED ORDER re: 309 Proposed Order ( Jury Trial set for 5/3/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon).(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                        Agreed PROPOSED ORDER re Lay Estate, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 304 Motion to Dismiss; mooting 305 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(dgould) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp.'s 306 Motion of Voluntary Dismissal Claims Against Michael J Kopper. The dismissal is with prejudice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, ) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                                              Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Michael J. Kopper by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Claims Against Richard A. Causey by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Richard A. Causey)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 299 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Richard A Causey 9/14/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER Granting 296 Pltf Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp's Unopposed Motion of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims against Jeffrey Skilling.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 300 Unopposed MOTION For Status Conference and Status Report in Response to Court August 6 2009 Order. Status Conference set for 10/5/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Unopposed MOTION For Status Conference and Status Report in Response to Court August 6 2009 Order by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Status conference)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER The Court ORDERS that counsel for The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corporation, the representative of the Enron bankruptcy estate shall file a status report regarding the member cases by August 21, 2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 296 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(dgould, ) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Jeffrey K. Skilling by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/18/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Jeffrey K. Skilling)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 293 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 7/31/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 292 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 8/14/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaints by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/20/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/15/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 290 Motion for Judgment.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Joint MOTION for Entry of Order of Final Judgment by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Final Judgment)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER.Counsel shall file within two weeks of receipt of this order a status report regarding the parties' request for the Court to defer ruling on the pending motions to dismiss by Arthur Andersen, LLP.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 284 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 6/30/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 285 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Richard A Causey 6/30/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Letter from attorney Donald Wall requesting removal of himself and Squire Sanders & Dempsey LLP from future communications, filed. (ltien, ) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/18/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Nathen Duke re: 278 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed. (mewilliams, ) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 280 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 4/30/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kcarr, ) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 279 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 4/30/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Complaints by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 277 Motion to Defer Ruling on Arthur Andersen LLP's Motions to Dismiss until April 15, 2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION Agreed Motion of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. And Defendant Arthur Andersen Requesting That the Court Defer Ruling on Arthur Andersen LLPS Pending Motions to Dismiss by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Defer Ruling on Defendant Arthur Andersen LLPs Motions to Dismiss)(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Nathen Duke re: 269 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed. (pjameson, ) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 272 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 3/31/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 273 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time Response due by 3/31/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kcarr, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/17/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney William Kelly Puls re: 269 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed. (Renoticed) (mewilliams, ) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 265 Notice of Voluntary dismissal with prejudice of claims against Ben Glisan, Jr. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 266 Motion to Defer Ruling on 249 Defendant Arthur Anderson's Motions to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that the ruling be deferred until 03/15/09 or later.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 263 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Richard A. Causey is given until February 27, 2009 to file responsive pleadings to the complaints. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 264 Motion for Extension of Time. Mr. Skilling shall answer or otherwise response to the complaints on or before 2/27/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION Of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. And Defendant Arthur Andersen Requesting That the Court Defer Ruling On Arthur Andersen LLPs Pending Motions to Dismiss by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion To Defer Ruling on Defendant Arthur Andersen LLPs Motions To Dismiss)(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Dismissal as to Ben F Glisan, Jr by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order granting Voluntary Dismissal of Claims against Ben Glisan, Jr. with prejudice)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of 257 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersens Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 257 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersens Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Shepherd, George) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Intent To Oppose The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp.s Motion for Leave to File A Sur-Reply In Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersens Motions To Dismiss The Amended Complaint re: 257 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersens Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. (Shepherd, George) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 256 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 255 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersens Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Sur-Reply, # 2 Exhibit A to Sur-Reply, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2008. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Intent to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersen re: 249 MOTION to Dismiss 209 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. MOTION to Dismiss 209 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Corrected APPENDIX re: 252 Reply,, by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed.(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY Memorandum in Support of 249 MOTION to Dismiss 209 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Defendant Arthur Andersen LLPs Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss The Amended Complaint [OCUC Instrument Nos. 129, 177, 178 and 183], filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A to Defendant Arthur Andersen LLPs Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss The Amended Complaint [OCUC Instrument Nos. 129, 177, 178 and 183])(Shepherd, George) Call from Attorney's office on attachment appendix A has been filed in error - Attorney to refile as Corrected Appendix Modified on 10/20/2008 (ncavazos, ). Linked to #249 on 10/27/2008 (ltien, ). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 249 MOTION to Dismiss 209 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. MOTION to Dismiss 209 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order denying Arthur Andersen LLP's Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP'S Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss The Amended Complaint [PIRELLI Instrument No. 209] by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1; Form 8-K,, # 2 Exhibit 2; (Part 1 of 2) Form 10-Q, # 3 Exhibit 2; (Part 2 of 2) Form 10-Q)(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss 209 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint [PIRELLI Instrument No. 209])(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss The Amended Complaint [PIRELLI Instrument No. 209] re: 209 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed.(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Please see corrected document at 250 . MOTION Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP'S Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss The Amended Complaint [PIRELLI Instrument No. 209] by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1; Form 8-K, # 2 Exhibit 2; (Part 1 of 2) Form 10-Q, # 3 Exhibit 2; (Part 2 of 2) Form 10-Q)(Shepherd, George) Modified on 9/19/2008 (ltien, ). (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 245 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/20/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 243 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due 11/2/08.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/18/2008. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 241 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Causey given until 8/4/2008 to file resposive pleadings to Complaints.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension)(Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 239 Motion for Extension of Time. Jeffrey K. Skilling to answer by 8/4/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/16/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 237 Motion for Extension of Time. Jeffrey K. Skilling to answer by 4/6/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 235 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints Responses due by 4/5/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltrevino, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/19/2007. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 233 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Jeffrey K. Skilling to answer on or before 1/7/2008. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 10/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Amended Nts of Partial Withdrawal re: 206 MOTION to Dismiss by Linda P Lay, filed. (Attachments: # 1)(Gibson, George) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of No Response Required To The Motion To Dismiss Filed By Defendant Linda P. Lay, Executrix Of re: 230 Notice (Other) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Withdrawal of 206 Motion to Dismiss by Linda P Lay, filed. (Gibson, George) Linked to #206 on 8/21/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 228 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due 8/17/2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp to Extend its Response Date to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Linda P Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Skilling's 226 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints on or before 10/9/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/1/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 224 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Defendant Linda Lay's Motion to Dismiss.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 06/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Linda P. Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/13/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Richard Causey's 219 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints until 08/09/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Deft's Skilling 221 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints on or before July 11, 2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eric D Green re: 218 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, filed. (smurdock, ) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed.Motion Docket Date 4/25/2007. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 217 Motion for Extension of Time for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp to Respond to Defendant Linda K Lay's Motion to Dismiss on or before 05/29/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. to Extend its Response Date to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Linda K. Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/11/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 215 Motion for Extension of Time. Response to Motion to Dismiss is extended to and including March 29, 2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(espencer, ) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. to Extend its Response Date to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Linda K. Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Partial Withdrawal of 206 Motion to Dismiss by Linda P. Lay by Linda P Lay, filed. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Gibson, George) Modified on 3/8/2007 - linked to #206 (ltien, ). (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 212 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(dpower, ) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. Response Date to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Linda K. Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This is a duplicate of 210 . ORDER granting motion 182 to amend complaint..( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(pawilliams, ) Modified on 2/7/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 182 Second Amended Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified. This entry is a duplicate of # 208 and was made for noticing purposes.(ltrevino, ) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Jeffrey K Skilling, Arthur Andersen LLP, Linda P Lay, Michael Kopper, Richard A Causey, Ben F Glisan, Jr filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp.(ltrevino, ) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 182 Second Amended Motion for Leave to File amended complaint.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltrevino, ) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 205 Motion for Extension of Time.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(mmar, ) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER and MOTION to Dismiss 209 Amended Complaint under Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(6) by Linda P Lay, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/6/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(Gibson, George) Motion added and entry linked to #209 on 3/8/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mace, Carl) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY'S APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Candy Mounter, Shirley Pratz, William Coy, filed. (Kaiser, Jeffery) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Termination of Electronic Service by Candy Mounter, Shirley Pratz, William Coy, filed. (Kaiser, Jeffery) (Entered: 12/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Production of Ninth Supplemental Documents to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of attorney substitution by Rick Barsky. Attorney Daniel D. Horowitz added. Attorney Sean Alan Roberts terminated, filed. (Horowitz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Production of Eighth Supplemental Documents to Expert Report by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of the Seventh Supplemental Documents to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Amending Expert Discovery Schedule in the Cases Coordinated and Consolidated with Newby (excluding H 01-3624, H 03-5528, H 04-0087 and H 04-88) The expert discovery period is extended to and including 12/15/06.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Production of Sixth Supplemental Documents to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 11/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 194 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Russell Hardin, Jr terminated, granting 194 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney Russell Hardin, Jr terminated .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(mmar, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This is a duplicate of 194 . MOTION to Substitute Attorney George W Shepherd III in place of Rusty Hardin by Arthur Andersen LLP, D Stephen Goddard, Jr, William Swanson, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/21/2006. (ypippin, ) Modified on 11/7/2006 (mmar, ). Modified on 11/14/2006 (ltien, ). (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Russell Hardin to Withdraw as Attorney, MOTION to Substitute Attorney George W. Shepherd in place of Rusty Hardin by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/21/2006. (mmar, ) (Entered: 11/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Production of Fifth Supplemental Invoices to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Supplemental Certificate of Service re: 189 Notice (Other) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Motion to Substitute as Real Party Plaintiff in Interest on Behalf of the Bankruptcy Estate in Chinn, Young and McMurray Derivative Cases re: 181 MOTION to Substitute Party in place of Frank Conway, Detectives Endowment Association Annuity Fund, Pirelli Armstrong Tire Corporation Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Candy Mounter, Shirley Pratz, William Coy, Joseph E Kassoway, Sara J McMurray, Fred by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Non-Opposition re: 182 Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Production of Fourth Supplemental Invoices to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Pltf Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp's Unopposed 185 Motion to Substitute Mrs Linda Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth L Lay, for Deft Kenneth Lay .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Nathan Duke re: Claim , filed. (jbradford, ) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Production of Third Supplemental Invoices to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Mrs. Linda Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth L. Lay in place of Kenneth L Lay by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp Unopposed Motion to Substitute Mrs. Linda Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth L. Lay, for Defendant Kenneth L Lay)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service re: 182 Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service re: 181 MOTION to Substitute Party in place of Frank Conway, Detectives Endowment Association Annuity Fund, Pirelli Armstrong Tire Corporation Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Candy Mounter, Shirley Pratz, William Coy, Joseph E Kassoway, Sara J McMurray, Fred by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B# 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp.'s Second Amended Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(LeClair, Lewis) Modified on 9/27/2006 - Refer to Civil Action No. 04-91 instrument #118. (ltien, ). (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Substitute Party in place of Frank Conway, Detectives Endowment Association Annuity Fund, Pirelli Armstrong Tire Corporation Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, Candy Mounter, Shirley Pratz, William Coy, Joseph E Kassoway, Sara J McMurray, Fred Greenberg, Enron Corporation Savings Plan Administrative Committee, David Trzebucki, Cheryl Trzebucki, Lynn Goffman, Harvey L Young, Rick Barsky, Richard P Bergsieker, William E Young by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. to Substitute as Real Party Plaintiff in Interest on Behalf of Bankruptcy Estate in Chinn, Young and McMurray Derivative Cases)(LeClair, Lewis) Modified on 9/27/2006 - Refer to Civil Action Nos. 03-862 #45, 03-5542 #79, 04-1546 #61. (ltien, ). (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Claim Letter by Nathan Duke, filed.(kejones, ) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eric D Green re: 176 Order of Dismissal, , filed. (swhite) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Committee, the Bank Defts and Le Maistre's 144 Motion to Consolidate Cases 03-5542, 04-1546 and 04-0091 into the Lead Case 01-3645 is GRANTED. This order entered in the Member Cases 03-5542, 04-1546 and 04-0091.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eric D Green re: 172 Order on Motion for Extension of Time , filed. (ejuarez, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Derivative Claims against Defendant Lou Pai Without Prejudice re the Notice of Dismissal by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. The Court dismisses the claims asserted against Lou Pai without prejudice subject to refiling, but the action shall proceed against all remaining defts. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) Modified on 9/27/2006 - Refer to Civil Action No. 04-91 instrument #114. (ltien, ). (Entered: 08/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/6/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp.'s Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(LeClair, Lewis) Modified on 9/27/2006 - Refer to Civil Action No. 04-91 instrument #112. (ltien, ). (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Dismissal as to Lou L Pai by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal of Derivative Claims Against Defendant Lou Pai Without Prejudice)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Lou Pai's 168 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Rebuttal Reports until 9/13/06.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to Kenneth L Lay by Linda P Lay, filed.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Production of Second Supplemental Invoice to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Production of Expert Surrebuttal Reports and Materials by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Third MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve Expert Rebuttal Reports (Unopposed) by Lou L Pai, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jeffrey, Deborah) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 166 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports. Defendant Lou L. Pai will have until August 14, 2006, to serve expert rebuttal reports.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ealexander, ) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve Expert Rebuttal Reports (Unopposed Motion) by Lou L Pai, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/21/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jeffrey, Deborah) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Lou Pai's 162 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Rebuttal Reports.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eric D Green re: 159 Order , filed. (cpeebles) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James D Baskin, III re: 160 , filed. (pcrawford, ) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve Expert Rebuttal Reports by Lou L Pai, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/7/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jeffrey, Deborah) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eric D Green re: 160 Order of Dismissal , filed. (jbradford, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT FILED ON WRONG DOCKET - First Amended ORDER OF Final Judgment and DISMISSAL .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(mmarch, ) Modified on 6/26/2006 (mmarch, ). (Entered: 06/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER and Judgment Dismissing Derivative Claims Against the Outside Directors, James Derrick, Ken L. Harrison and Richard Buy.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(mmarch, ) (Entered: 06/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Production of Supplemental Invoices to Expert Reports re: 156 Notice (Other) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Dismissal as to Jeffrey McMahon by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Notice of Dismissal of Derivative Claims Against Defendant Jeffrey McMahon Without Prejudice)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Production of Expert Reports and Materials and Designation of Experts by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corrected JOINDER in MOTION with Respect to Certain Discovery Deadlines (MDL 1446 Instrument No. 394) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order CORRECTED Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp Joinder in Motion With Respect to Certain Discovery Deadlines in the Cases Coordinated or Consolidated with Newby or Tittle)(LeClair, Lewis) Modified on 5/25/2006 (ltien, ). (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER in MOTION with Respect to Certain Discovery Deadlines (MDL 1446 Instrument No. 394) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Joinder in Motion with Respect to Certain Discovery Deadlines in the Cases Coordinated or Consolidated with Newby or Tittle)(LeClair, Lewis) Modified on 5/25/2006 (ltien, ). (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Michael J. Kopper's 152 Motion to Substitute Attorney Barnet B. Skelton, Jr. in place of Eric J. R. Nichols.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltien, ) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Substitute Attorney Barnet Skelton, Jr. as Attorney-in-Charge in place of Eric J. R. Nichols by Michael Kopper, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ltien, ) (Entered: 04/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Derivative Claims Against Defendant Andrew S. Fastow without Prejudice .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(jmarchand, ) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Dismissal as to Andrew S Fastow by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Notice of Dismissal of Derivative Claims Against Defendant Andrew S. Fastow Without Prejudice)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 147 Motion to Stay Answers and Discovery .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(jmarchand, ) (Entered: 02/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER re: 147 MOTION to Stay, filed.(Sumoski, Diane) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay by Kenneth L Lay, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sumoski, Diane) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 144 MOTION for Order of Consolidation and MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 01cv3645 and Member Case No. 04cv0091 by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/20/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order granting Motion of the Committee to Consolidate Certain Derivative Claims and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Others; and Response of Committee to Motion by Bank Defendants and Defendant Charles LeMaistre for Order of Consolidation)(LeClair, Lewis) Modified on 12/12/2005 - linked to #144 (ltien, ). (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPINION AND ORDER in MDL 1446 #348 (Ref #3888 CA H 01-3624) Motions for Clarification of Scheduling Order and #349 and #350 Motions with Respect to Expert Discovery in Consolidated and Coordinated Cases.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified. (Ref MDL 1446 #367, CA H 01-3624 #4149)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 01cv3645 by Bank Of America, Barclays PLC, Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Citigroup Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Bank AG,, Dr. Charles LeMaistre, JP Morgan Chase & Co, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.,, Merrill Lynch & Co, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Proposed Order)(mharrison, ) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned Undeliverable as to George W Billy Shepherd, III re: 142 Order on Motion to Withdraw , filed. (mewilliams, ) (Entered: 06/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 141 Motion to Withdraw Pro Hac Counsel Keara M Gordon and David Clarke Jr. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw Keara M. Gordon and David Clarke Jr. as Pro Hac Counsel by Kenneth L Lay, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(rroberts, ) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned Undeliverable re: 138 Clerks Notice , filed. (rroberts, ) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C to Sur-Reply of Creditors' Committee in Opposition to Motion of Plaintiff Wai Chinn for Reconsideration of June 14, 2004 Memorandum and Order# 2 Proposed Order denying Motion of Plaintiff Wai Chinn for Reconsideration of June 14, 2004 Memorandum and Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE re: Entry of Orders 136 137 Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 134 Notice of Dismissal of Derivative Claims against Kathy Lynn without prejudice. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp 135 Motion to Dismiss Derivative Claims against Kristina Mordaunt without prejudice. (CA H 02-1832 and CA H 02-1922)( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Derivative Claims Against Kristina Mordaunt Without Prejudice)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Derivative Claims Against Defendant Kathy Lynn by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eric D Green re: 132 Notice , filed. (rroberts, ) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE re: 131 Agreed Order, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AGREED ORDER Extending Time for Certain Defendants' Objections to Settlement.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 124 Motion to Substitute Attorney Reid Figel for Attorney Jacks C Nickens granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jacks C Nickens terminated. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 127 Motion to Substitute Attorney David R. Jones for Attorney Jacks C Nickens and grantingMotion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jacks C Nickens terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 126 Motion to Substitute Attorney David R. Jones for Jacks C Nickens and Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jacks C Nickens terminated. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Attorney David R. Jones in place of Jacks C. Nickens, MOTION for Jacks C. Nickens to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeffrey McMahon, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Substitute Attorney David R. Jones in place of Jacks C. Nickens, MOTION for Jacks C. Nickens to Withdraw as Attorney by Richard Buy, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying Pltfs motion to remand in CA H 04-1546. (Ref #50) ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Substitute Attorney Reid Figel in place of Jacks Nickens, MOTION for Jacks C Nickens to Withdraw as Attorney by Kevin Hannon, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2005. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 02/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE relating to dismissal of claims asserted in Derivative Cases Against Certain Defendants, by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on notice and motion relating to dismissal of claims asserted in derivative cases against certain defendants)(LeClair, Lewis) Modified on 2/9/2005 (htippen, ). (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 121 Motion to Substitute Attorney Barnes H Ellis for Attorney Jacks C Nickens (terminated).( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Attorney Barnes H Ellis in place of Jacks C Nickens by Joseph M Hirko, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/8/2004. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting motion to withdraw and substitute Attorney-in-charge for deft Mark Koenig. Philip T. Inglima is substituted as attorney-in-charge.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 118 Motion to Substitute Attorney Philip T Inglima for Attorney Jack C Nickens for deft Mark E. Koenig, Attorney Jack C Nickens terminated. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Substitute Attorney Philip T Inglima in place of Jacks C Nickens by Mark E Koenig, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2004. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 114 Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp to Reopen Pirelli Derivative Cases and to Substitute as Real Party Plaintiff in Interest on behalf of Bankruptcy Estate, (H 01-3645, H 01-3690, H 01-3892, H 01-3998, H 02-1832, H 02-1838, H 02-1922, and H 02-3427) ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER the USDC SDTX has implemented an electronic system for filing of all court documents, in light of the large number of cases involved in this litigation counsel shall deliver a courtesy copy of all documents filed with the Court to Judge Melinda Harmon chambers.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/20/2004) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE by Unsecured Creditors Committee to [114-1] motion to Reopen Pirelli Derivative Cases, [114-2] motion Substitute as Real Party Plaintiff in Interest on Behalf of Bankruptcy Estate, filed. (kmurphy) (Entered: 08/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Reopen Pirelli Derivative Cases and to Substitute as Real Party Plaintiff in Interest on Behalf of Bankruptcy Estate by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp and its Affiliated Debtors and Debtors in Possession Motion Docket Date 8/22/04 [114-1] motion, 8/22/04 [114-2] motion , filed. (kmurphy) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: H 03-862 dismissing defts LJM Cayman LP, LJM2 Cayman Co-Investment LP, Chewco Investments LP and Joint Energy Development Investments Limited Partnership pursuant to Pltf's [6-1] notice of dismissal; denying Plf's [9-1] motion to remand; H 03-862 is consolidated with H 01-3645 and is administratively closed, entered. Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (kmurphy) (Entered: 06/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF COORDINATION; The Court ORDERS that the motion to stay proceedings (instrument #14 in H04-1546) is MOOT. Because the deft's have not had an opportunity to respond to the motion to remand (#25 in H04-1546), and because a resolution of the issues it raises will determine whether this action will be remanded, dismissed, or consolidated with Newby or Pirelli, the Court ORDERS that deft's shall file responses within twenty days of receipt of this order. If pltf's wish to file a reply, they shall do so within ten days of receipt of those responses. The Court ORDERS that H04-1546 is hereby COORDINATED with MDL 1446, Newby and Pirelli and shall be so listed on those docket sheets. The Court further ORDERS that the notice of consolidation with Pirelli (instrument #39 in H04-1546), filed by counsel for deft Charles A LeMaistre, is of no effect because that determination has yet to be made by the Court, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (tward) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [110-1] motion for Murray Fogler to withdraw as counsel, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (tward) (Entered: 02/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Murray Fogler to withdraw as counsel by Lou L Pai, Motion Docket Date 3/10/04 [110-1] motion , filed. (tward) (Entered: 02/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF REMAND, pltf's motion to remand (#9 H02-3939) and motion to abstain (#9 H02-3939) is moot, case remanded to the 9th JDC, Montgomery County, TX, entered. Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (tward) (Entered: 10/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: pltf Richard P Bergsieker's motion for reconsideration (#14 in H.02-3427) of this Court's [103-1] order of consolidation (#12 in H.02-3427): after reviewing the file, the motion, and the opposition, this Court has not changed its mind and accordingly orders that the motion is denied, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 09/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (H.01-3996, H.01-3997, H.01-3995) ORDER pursuant to notice of voluntary dismissal filed by plaintiffs in cases H.01-3996, H.01-3997 and H.01-3995, these actions are hereby SEVERED from H.01-3645 and DISMISSED without prejudice, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that Pltf Rick Barsky's [104-1] motion to amend original complaint to join as party defts J P Morgan Chase & Co and Citigroup, is DENIED, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (Ref: H-02-1922 Barsky vs Arthur Andersen, LLP, etal) (fmremp) (Entered: 04/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by Pltf Rick Barsky amending [1-1] complaint adding J P Morgan Chase Co and Citigroup, Inc as additional defts, filed. (Re: H-02-1922) (fmremp) (Entered: 04/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to amend original complaint to join as party defts J P Morgan Chase & Co and Citigroup, Inc by Pltf Rick Barsky, Motion Docket Date 3/17/03 [104-1] motion , filed. (Re: H-02-1922) (fmremp) (Entered: 04/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/30/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION and administrative closure; member case H.02-3427 is consolidated into lead case H.01-3645; pltf's motion to remand (document #5 in H.02-3427) is denied; member case H.02-3427 is administratively closed, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of CONSOLIDATION by Richard Buy, Richard A Causey, Mark Frevert, Mark E Haedicke, Kevin Hannon, Mary K Joyce, Michael S McConnell, Cindy K Olson, Kenneth D Rice, Gred Whalley, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certified copy of ORDER substituting Scott D Lassetter in place of Stephen D Susman for deft Enron Corporation, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 12/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certified copy of NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER entered in H.02-1922 (doc #13) correcting order of consolidation (doc #12) of 8/16/02 denying remand, consolidating and administratively closing H.02-1922; the case number is corrected (for lead case) to H.01-3645, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) Modified on 09/16/2002 (Entered: 08/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE, the shareholder derivative actions are the property of Debtor Enron Corporation's bankruptcy estate; mooting [44-1] motion for a preliminary order freezing and imposing a constructive trust over individual defts assets and limited expedited discovery into those assets, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 08/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER NOTICE of termination of mediation efforts due to unresolvable differences by Eric D Green, filed. (copy only, original in H.01-3624) (ddarneille) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION and administrative closure; cases transferred to this court by the MDL Panel, H.02-1832 and H.02-1838, are consolidated into lead case H.01-3645 and the member cases are administratively closed, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 06/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER pursuant to L. R. 1; Christa M. Anderson is admitted pro hac vice to appear for Andrew Fastow, entered. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (sjones) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certified copy of MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying American National Insurance Company et al's emergency motion for temporary injunction (#422 in H 01-3624) and denying lead pltf's exparte application for a temporary restraining order and order to show cause (#440 in H 01-3624) (re: G-02-0084), entered. Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 05/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certified copy of ORDER extending deadline for deft J P Morgan Chase & Company to answer lead pltf's amended consolidated class action complaint to 6/12/02, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) Modified on 05/16/2002 (Entered: 05/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute entry: Injunction hearing held. Apps: Mytelka, Leblanc, Windsor, Howes, Hardaway, Wilshire, Bilek, Marks, Matthews, Golden, Greenberg, Flynn, Kolb, Katz, Ramzel. Hearing held on pltf American National's emergency motion for temporary injunction against deft Anderson and request for hearing. and lead pltf's ex parte application for TRO and order to show cause regarding preliminary injuncton to enjoin deft Anderson's breakup. Ct Reporter: Warner . (ckrus) (Entered: 05/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certified copy of TRANSFER ORDER consolidating the following cases into MDL 1446 (EDAR CA 4:01-836; SDCA CA 3:01-2182; SDFL CA 1:01-4951; EDTX CAs 5:01-299; 5:01-308, 5:01-310, 5:01-313, 5:01-318, 5:01-319, 5:01-320, 5:01-321, 5:01-322, 5:01-323 and 9:01-289; SDTX CAs 4:01-3624, 4:01-3630, 4:01-3645, 4:01-3647, 4:01-3652, 4:01-3660, 4:01-3670, 4:01-3671, 4:01-3681, 4:01-3682, 4:01-3686, 4:01-3690, 4:01-3733, 4:01-3734, 4:01-3735, 4:01-3736, 4:01-3737, 4:01-3789, 4:01-3838, 4:01-3839, 4:01-3889, 4:01-3903, 4:01-3913, 4:01-3914, 4:01-3993, 4:01-3998, 4:01-4009, 4:01-4060, 4:01-4063, 4:01-4071, 4:01-4089, 4:01-4106, 4:01-4108, 4:01-4125, 4:01-4128, 4:01-4150, 4:01-4168, 4:01-4189, 4:01-4198 and 4:01-4208) (ddarneille) Modified on 09/16/2002 (Entered: 05/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying defts' motions to extend time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the consolidated complaints, entered; the response date remains 5/8/02. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 05/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Copy of MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, entered. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (original order entered in 01-3624) (psmith) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Arthur Andersen LLP's emergency motion to continue hearing; the hearing on Lead Plaintiff's ex parte application for a temporary restraining order and order to show cause re: preliminary injunction to enjoin deft Andersen's breakup and American National Insurance Co et al's emergency motion for temporary injunction and request for hearing is continued to 8:00 5/9/02 , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 04/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Copy of ORDER granting expedited consideration of motions to stay discovery (#493 & #504 in H 01-3624) in Bullock v Arthur Anderson LLP; responses to be filed by 5:00 4/26/02, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (Original #544 in H 01-3624) (ddarneille) (Entered: 04/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER , entered; The Court ORDERS that the motions for extension of time to file responsive pleadings to the consolidated complaints are DENIED. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Arthur Andersen LLP's emergency motion (joined in part by the Lead Plaintiff) to adjourn date for the filing of Andersen's response to the Regents' motion and to continue hearing, entered. The hearing on Lead Plaintiff's ex part application for a temporary restraining order and order to show cause re: preliminary injunction to enjoin deft Andersen's breakup and American National Insurance Co et al's emergency motion for a temporary injunction and request for hearing is continued until 9:00 4/29/02 . Andersen's papers in response to the Regent's application shall be due on 4/26/02 at 5:00. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL , entered; granting instrument #499 filed by lead pltf in H-01-3624; the Court ORDERS that all claims against defts C E Andrews and Bruce G Willison are DISMISSED without prejudice. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 04/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, entered; the response date is 4/24/02 at 12:00 for Arthur Andersen's emergency motion to stay discovery and to enjoin Fleming from seeking a temporary injunction in Bullock v Arthur Adnersen LLP. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER , entered; The Court ORDERS that Lead Counsel in both cases shall file a response by 04/24/02 to motion to extend time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the consolidated complaints (Instrument #460 in H-01-3624) and motion for expedited consideration (Instrument #461 in H-01-3624). Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, entered: Lead counsel shall file a response to the Motion to Amend Court's March 22, 2002 scheduling order and extend time to respond by April 24, 2002. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (psmith) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Copy of ORDER, entered: A hearing will be held on April 24, 2002 at 2 pm on Lead Pltfs Motion for a TRO and American National's Motion for Temporary Injunction. The subpoenas served by Pltf American National are quashed. Deft Andersen Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (psmith) (Entered: 04/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF CLARIFICATION, entered; the deadline for motions to dismiss remains 5/8/02. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 04/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Copy of Minute entry: INJUNCTION HEARING held on Pltf American National's Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunction against Deft Arthur Anderson and request for hearing (instrument #422 in 01-3624). Hearing is continued to April 17, 2002 at 2 pm. Counsel appeared. Ct Reporter: A Traylor . (psmith) (Entered: 04/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, entered: The party representatives and their attorneys who were referred to mediation on March 22, 2002 before Professor Green are to appear for a conference on April 6, 2002 at 1:30 pm. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (psmith) (Entered: 04/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE/ORDER , entered. None of the Harmon children is a minor, and the undersigned is not obligated to recuse herself. Nevertheless, the undersigned believes it is important for the parties to know that under the Frank G Harmon Trust, as of March 2002, the three Harmon children held 3/13 of the beneficial interest in shares of stock of defts who have been added by the consolidated complaint filed today. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, entered; parties shall continue to mediate with Professor Eric D Green and his associate Jonathan Marks through Friday, 4/5/02 under the same conditions as ordered on 3/22/02. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, entered: A hearing is set for April 8, 2002 at 9 am for Pltfs emergency motion for temporary injunction (instrument #422 filed in 01-3624). Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (psmith) (Entered: 04/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [73-1] motion for entry of order on stipulation of the parties regarding subpoenas , entered; The Court ENTERS the attached stipulation as an Order of this Court. The Court CANCELS the hearing previously set on the motion for stay of discovery proceedings in Cause No. 21,716 and request for expedited hearing or ruling (Instrument #406 Newby, H-01-3624). Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 04/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/3/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for entry of order on stipulation of the parties regarding subpoenas by LJM Cayman LP, Chewco Investments, Michael Kopper, Motion Docket Date 4/23/02 [73-1] motion , filed. (kprice) (Entered: 04/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER entered. Parties wishing to file a response shall doe so by 4/3/02 at 5:00 for LJM Cayman LP, Chewco Investments LP, and Michael Kopper's motion for stay of discovery proceedings in Cause No 32,716, Bullock v Arthur Andersen LLP pending in the 21st Judicial District Court of Washington County, Texas. An expedited hearing on the motion is set for 2:00 4/4/02 , Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 04/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Replies to any opposition to motions to dismiss due 6/24/02 , entered; No further pleading relating to the motions to dismiss will be allowed. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION AND ORDER for admission as to John W Keker, appearing as the attorney for deft Andrew Fastow, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION AND ORDER for admission Pro Hac Vice as to Karin Kramer, appearing as the atty for deft Andrew Fastow, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION AND ORDER for admission Pro Hac Vice as to Jan Nielsen Little, appearing as the attorney for deft Andrew Fastow entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION AND ORDER for admission Pro Hac Vice as to Elliotb R Peters, appearing as the attorney for deft Andrew Fastow , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER , entered; The date for Enron Corporation's production of documents is EXTENDED from 04/01/08 to 04/08/02. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting the Tittle Plaintiffs' [59-1] motion to transfer first amended derivative complaint on behalf of the Savings Plan and the ESOP, entered; the First Amended Derivative Complaint previously consolidated under H-01-3645 is transferred to and consolidated with H-01-3913. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting deft's motion to substitute counsel Jon Keker in place of Richard B Drubel Added John W Keker, , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 03/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER referring case for mediation to Professor Eric D Green beginnings 3/24/02, entered. Parties ntfd. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 03/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER entered. Pltfs' amended consolidated complaint due by 4/8/02; motions to dismiss due by 5/8/02 ; opposition to motions to dismiss due by 6/10/02; replies due by 7/24/02 . Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 03/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF FACTUAL DETERMINATION REGARDING SERVICE OF THE WILT ACTION ON MS TEMPLE AND ORDER REQUIRING MS TEMPLE TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION IN HOUSTON, entered. Ms Temple shall appear for her deposition in Houston, TX at 9 am on 03/22/02 at the Houstonian. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 03/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC; Consolidated complaints by 04/1/02; Motions to dismiss due by 05/1/02; opposition to motions to dismiss by 06/3/02; replies to opposition to motions to dismiss by 06/17/02; class discovery begins 07/1/02 and ends 09/2/02; pltfs' motions for class certification by 10/1/02 ; defts' opposition by 11/1/02, pltfs' replies by 12/2/02; joining of parties, or to file third party complaints or cross complaints/claims by 1/2/03; All Fact Discovery cutoff 4/1/03 ; Expert witness list submitted by 4/15/03 ; Deadline for filing all dispositive motions 8/15/03 ; Joint Pretrial order to be on or before 10/15/03 ; Docket call deadline 1:30 11/14/03 Trial date deadline 9:00 12/1/03 ; before Judge Melinda Harmon , Deft expert witness list due for 5/15/03 , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kprice) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/25/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Tittle Pltfs MOTION to transfer first amended derivative complaint on behalf of the Savings Plan and the ESOP , by Pamela M Tittle, Enron Corp Savings, Enron Corp Stock, Motion Docket Date 3/19/02 [59-1] motion , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 03/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, entered; Clerk shall henceforth send a copy of every court order entered in each of the above referenced, three consolidated actions to counsel in all three actions (CA H-01-3624, CA H-01-3645, CA H-01-3913). Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (copy only - original docketed in CA H-01-3624). (sguevara) (Entered: 03/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Consolidated Complaints filed by 4/1/02 ; Motions to dismiss due 5/1/02; Opposition to Motions to dismiss due 6/3/02; Replies to opposition to Motions to dismiss due 6/17/02; Class discovery begins 7/1/02; Class discovery ends 9/2/02; Pltfs Motion for Class Certification by 10/1/02; Defts opposition due 11/1/02; Pltfs replies by 12/2/02; Joining of parties or to file third party complaints or cross complaints by 1/2/03 ; All fact discovery completed by 4/1/03; Pltf expert witness list submitted by 4/15/03 ; Deft expert witness list submitted by 5/15/03 ; Expert Discovery completed by 7/2/03 ; Motions for summary judgment and all other dispositive motions filed by 8/15/03 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 10/15/03 ; Docket call deadline 1:30 11/14/03 ; Trial is set for 9:00 12/1/03 , entered. Parties notified. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (psmith) Modified on 03/08/2002 (Entered: 02/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute entry: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held jointly in Enron cases. Court heard argument on specific scheduling needs and problems. Court will issue scheduling orders. Lead counsel for Newby advised court that an order defining duties of lead counsel is not necessary. He also suggested the parties participate in a montly telephone conference call with the court. An update was given on a hearing on the Enron bankruptcy matter. terminated deadlines Ct Reporter: K Metzger . (psmith) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, entered: Keara Gordon is admitted pro hac vice as attorney for Kenneth Lay. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (psmith) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, entered: Mark Glasser is substituted as attorney for LJM2 Co-Investment in place of Eric Nichols. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (psmith) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Deft LJM2 Co-Investment's [43-1] motion to substitute counsel Mark K. Glasser in place of Eric J.R. Nichols , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (psmith) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Litigation Plan with respect to consolidated derivative cases, by LJM Cayman LP, LJM 2 Co-Investment, Chewco Investments , filed (ltien) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Copy of ORDER, entered: Clerk to enter the name, address and telephone and facsimile numbers of the Trustee for the Enron Corporation's estate. Copies of all orders to be sent to Carolyn Schwartz. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (psmith) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Copy of Minute entry: MOTION HEARING held on Kenneth Lay's Emergency Motion to Enjoin (#276 in 01-3624). The court took the matter under advisement. terminated deadlines Ct Reporter: K Metzgert. (original Minutes entered in 01-3624) (psmith) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that David Clarke,Jr is admitted pro hac vice for Deft Kenneth L Lay, pursuant to L. R. 1, entered. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (fmremp) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE: Parties are advised that the scheduling conferences set 2/25/02 at 9:00 am before Judge Harmon will be held in Ctrm 11-B, 11th Floor, filed (fmremp) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submission by Enron Corporation regarding [27-2] order , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for D Stephen Goddard Jr by Billy Shepherd, filed (fmremp) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by of the Tittle, Rinard and Kemper Pltfs in support of [44-1] motion for a preliminary order freezing and imposing a constructive trust over individual defts assets and limited expedited discovery into those assets , filed (psmith) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION of the Tittle, Rinard and Kemper Pltfs for a preliminary order freezing and imposing a constructive trust over individual defts assets and limited expedited discovery into those assets , Motion Docket Date 3/6/02 [44-1] motion , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to substitute counsel Mark K. Glasser in place of Eric J.R. Nichols by LJM 2 Co-Investment, Motion Docket Date 3/5/02 [43-1] motion , filed. (kprice) (Entered: 02/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT for violations of federal securities law, The employment retirement income security act, the racketeer influenced and corrupt organizations act and Texas common law by Enron Corporation Savings Plan, Enron Corporation Stock Ownership Plan,(Answer due 2/22/02 for Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche, for Chewco Investments, for Richard Buy, for Stanley Horton, for Steven Kean, for Ken Rice, for Cliff Baxter, for Mark Frevert, for Michael Kopper, for John A Urquhart, for Jerome J Meyer, for Ken L Harrison, for Tom Elsenbrook, for Dean Swick, for William Swanson, for John Niemann, for D Stephen Goddard Jr, for David T Duncan, for Arthur Andersen LLP, for Enron Corporation, for All Similarly Situat, for LJM Cayman LP, for LJM 2 Co-Investment, for Jeffrey K Skilling, for Andrew S Fastow, for Joint Energy Develop, for Joint Energy Develop, for Enron Corporation, for Andrew S Fastow, for Herbert S Winokur Jr, for John Wakeham, for Frank Savage, for Paulo V Ferraz Pereira, for John Mendelsohn, for Charles A Lemaistre, for Robert K Jaedicke, for Wendy L Gramm, for John H Duncan, for Ronnie C Chan, for Norman P Blake Jr, for Robert A Belfer, for Kenneth L Lay ) amending , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING: A hearing will be held on Deft Kenneth Lay's Motion to Enjoin (instrument #276 in 01-3624) at 10:00 on 2/14/02 , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Overruled Pltf's [28-1] objection to consolidation , entered. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda ) (hlerma) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Copy of Minute entry: MOTION HEARING held. Apps: counsel appeared. The Motion of Deft Kenneth Lay to Enjoin Certain Pltfs from Prosecuting State Court Action is now moot. (original filed in 01-3624). Ct Reporter: F Warner . (psmith) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFT'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW by David T Duncan in opposition to Coy pltfs' motion to remand (filed in H 01-4248), filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of law by Arthur Andersen LLP, John Niemann, William Swanson, Dean Swick, Tom Elsenbrook in opposition to Coy pltfs' motion to remand in H-01-4248, filed. (ljackson) (Entered: 01/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD , entered; A hearing on Deft. Lay's emergency motion to enjoin has been set for 1/30/02, at 1:30, in Courtroom 11B. Parties notified. (leddins) Modified on 01/28/2002 (Entered: 01/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER , entered; the shareholder derivative member cases that have been consolidated into lead case H-01-3645 are administratively closed (with the exception of H-01-4248). Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (sguevara) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Copy of Minute entry: INJUNCTION HEARING held on Amalgamated's Motion for Particularized Expedited Discovery from Deft Arthur Anderson (#119) and Florida State Board and the NYC Funds Motion for TRO (#120). Amalgamated orally withdrew its request to serve as lead pltf in favor of Regents. Counsel to work out an agreed order for the court's signature on Jan 23, 2002 at 3 pm. Apps: All counsel appeared. Ct Reporter: F Warner . (psmith) (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: A hearing has been set for 3:00 pm on 1/23/02 , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: The Injunction hearing scheduled for 9:00 am on 1/22/02 before Judge Melinda Harmon has been CHANGED to Courtroom 11B, 11th Fl of the U S Courthouse . terminated deadlines . Parties ntfd. (psmith) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting hearing for 9:00 1/22/02 on Florida State Board of Administration and New York City Pension Funds' motion for temporary restraining order and a limited lifting of the discovery stay, and Amalgamated Bank's motion for particularized expedited discovery from deft Arthur Andersen LLP to preserve evidence , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ltien) (Entered: 01/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting scheduling conference for 9:00 am on 2/25/02 before Judge Melinda Harmon , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (sguevara) (Entered: 01/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lee H. Rosenthal ) Case reassigned to Judge Melinda Harmon (leddins) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to Court's [20-1] order of consolidation by William Coy, Candy Mounter , filed. (sguevara) (Entered: 01/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER entered GRANTING Defendants motion to extend time to respond {Docket entry 92 in lead 01-3624}. Pretrial scheduling conference to be held February 25, 2002 at 9:00 a.m. Proposals for pretrial scheduling orders due by February 19, 2002 set pretrial conference for 9:00 2/25/02 before Judge Lee H. Rosenthal ; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lee H. Rosenthal ) (leddins) Modified on 01/09/2002 (Entered: 01/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to expedite consideration of its motion for enlargement of time to answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to pltfs complaint , by Arthur Andersen LLP, Motion Docket Date 1/3/02 [26-1] motion , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 12/26/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Information to counsel to ensure the integrity of the litigation process; this court will extend the deadline for objecting to the consolidation order to 1/3/02, entered, Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lee H. Rosenthal ) (fmremp) Modified on 12/21/2001 (Entered: 12/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for administrative closure of case , and supplemental motion for enlargement of time to file responsive pleadings or motions to dismiss by LJM 2 Co-Investment, LJM Cayman LP, Motion Docket Date 1/6/02 [24-1] motion, 1/6/02 [24-2] motion , filed. (sguevara) (Entered: 12/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Andrew S Fastow , filed. (sguevara) (Entered: 12/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Andrew S Fastow , filed. (CA H-01-3995) (sguevara) (Entered: 12/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY Filing Of Nominal Deft Enron Corporation, and Imposition Of Automatic Stay, filed. (psmith) (Entered: 12/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. THE DERIVATIVE CASES WILL BE CONSOLIDATED UNDER CIVIL ACTION NO. H-01-3645, PIRELLI ARMSTRONG TIRE CORP. DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN, ET AL V. KENNETH L. LAY, ET AL. AS THE LEAD CASE. IF ANY PARTY OBJECTS TO THE CONSOLIDATION, THAT PARTY MUST FILE AN OBJECTION TO CONSOLIDATION WITH THIS COURT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE FILNG OF THIS NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION; granting Enron's [13-1] motion for consolidation of 01-3892 with 01-3645 , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lee H. Rosenthal ) (sguevara) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting deft Lay's [14-1] motion to substitute attorney James E. Coleman, Jr. in place of Robin C. Gibbs Added , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes ) (sguevara) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of stay pending review by Special Litigation Committee, and in the alternative, MOTION to stay by Enron Corporation, Motion Docket Date 12/20/01 [18-1] motion , filed. (no proposed order received) (ltien) (Entered: 12/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting deft Kenneth Lay's [9-1] motion to substitute attorney James C Coleman Jr in place of Robin C Gibbs Added James E Coleman Jr , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes ) (sguevara) (Entered: 12/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, entered; this Court will defer ruling on consolidation or the stipulation until the parties have had an opportunity to present a motion to consolidate the derivative and securities claims before one judge. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes ) (sguevara) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER of non-opposition to a stipulation to the second- and second-filed derivative cases by Enron Corporation , filed (sguevara) (Entered: 11/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/6/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED MOTION to substitute attorney James E. Coleman, Jr. in place of Robin C. Gibbs by Kenneth L Lay, Motion Docket Date 12/18/01 [14-1] motion , filed. (sguevara) Modified on 11/29/2001 (Entered: 11/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for consolidation of 01-3892 with 01-3645 by Enron Corporation, Motion Docket Date 12/17/01 [13-1] motion , filed. (fmremp) Modified on 11/30/2001 (Entered: 11/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM held in chambers. Appearances: S. Savett (by phone) f/pltf; C. Richards f/deft Lay; R. Gibbs, K. Patrick, J. Frizzell f/individual defts except Fastow; R. Druble (by phone) f/deft Fastow; S. Susman, K. Marks f/deft Enron. Order to be entered. terminated deadlines , entered. Parties ntfd. ( signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes ) (sguevara) (Entered: 11/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to consolidate cases (CA H-01-3892 into CA H-01-3645) by Enron Corporation, Motion Docket Date 12/17/01 [11-1] motion , filed. (sguevara) (Entered: 11/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Andrew S Fastow , filed. (sguevara) (Entered: 11/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to substitute attorney James C Coleman Jr in place of Robin C Gibbs by Kenneth L Lay, Motion Docket Date 12/16/01 [9-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER from aty Savett RE: response in opposition to letter dated November 21, 2001 from Samuel Sporn (#6). (dkelly) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE: A pretrial conference is set for 3:00 11/27/01 , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes ) (psmith) (Entered: 11/26/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER to Judge Hughes re a Stipulation and proposed Pretrial Order, by Detectives Endowment , filed (psmith) (Entered: 11/26/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION for an enlargement oftime to respond to complaint for an additional 60 days by Kenneth L Lay, Enron Corporation, Motion Docket Date 12/9/01 [5-1] motion , filed. (sguevara) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kenneth L Lay, Robert A Belfer, et al, filed. (sguevara) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Enron Corporation , filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 11/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER for Conf set initial pretrial conference for 10:30 2/19/02 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes , entered; Parties notified. (bchurchill) (Entered: 10/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT by Pirelli Armstrong filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 514707 (bchurchill) (Entered: 10/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 302 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?