La Rose Construction v. Stonemakers USA LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10421
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo La Rose Construction, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert N. Meltzer +1 508 872 7116 +1 508 647 0332 robmeltzer@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Harbor Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary C. Casey +1 508 842 9244 +1 508 842 9311 casey@harborlaw.com
v.
No Logo Eric Smithson, Defendant
No Logo Stonemakers USA LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 501
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/14/07 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Womack. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at womack@megatran.com or the Clerk's Office. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
    Exhibit and Witness List by La Rose Construction, Stonemakers USA LLC, and Eric Smithson.. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/5/07 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Womack. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at womack@megatran.com or the Clerk's Office. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by La Rose Construction, The Court sets the case for nonjury trial March 14, 2007 at 9AM. Plaintiff is ordered to make service of this order.(Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT of Judy Armstrong re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT of David Montoya re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by La Rose Construction. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by La Rose Construction.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by La Rose Construction.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT against Stonemakers USA LLC, Eric Smithson , filed by La Rose Construction. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Folan, Karen) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2007 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 1,156 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?