NBCUniversal Media LLC et al v. Barry Driller Inc et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-06950-GW-E
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 20, 2017 at 12:30 PM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo ABC Holding Company Inc, Plaintiff
American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Big Ticket Televison Inc, Plaintiff
CBS Broadcasting, Inc. CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Plaintiff
CBS Studios, Inc. CBS Studios, Inc., Plaintiff
Disney Enterprises, Inc. Disney Enterprises, Inc., Plaintiff
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Infoseek Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Active Network, Inc.,
Officer/Director, A.b.c. Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Holding CO Inc.
Officer/Director, ESPN Holding Company, Inc.
Officer/Director, Espn, Inc.
Officer/Director, Espn Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ESPN Digital Media, Inc.
No Logo NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, Plaintiff
NBCUniversal Media, LLC NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Telemundo Network Group LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Universal Network Television, LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo FilmOn X, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
Space Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
No Logo FilmOn.com, INC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
Space Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
Space Jaime Wayne Marquart +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 jmarquart@bakermarquart.com
No Logo FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
Space Jaime Wayne Marquart +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 jmarquart@bakermarquart.com
No Logo FilmOn.TV, INC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
Space Jaime Wayne Marquart +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 jmarquart@bakermarquart.com
v.
No Logo Aereokiller LLC, Defendant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/25/2014

Erroneously Sued AsInternet TV Broadcasting LLC
TERMINATED: 09/25/2014 Christian Anstett +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 canstett@bakermarquart.com
TERMINATED: 09/25/2014

Erroneously Sued AsInternet TV Broadcasting LLC
TERMINATED: 09/25/2014 Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
TERMINATED: 09/25/2014

Erroneously Sued AsInternet TV Broadcasting LLC
TERMINATED: 09/25/2014 Jaime Wayne Marquart +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 jmarquart@bakermarquart.com
No Logo Alkiviades David , Defendant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
No Logo Barry Driller Content Systems PLC, Defendant
No Logo Barry Driller Inc, Defendant
No Logo BarryDriller Content Systems Plc, Defendant
No Logo FilmOn X LLC, Defendant
No Logo FilmOn.com Inc, Defendant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Wayne Marquart +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 jmarquart@bakermarquart.com
No Logo FilmOn.TV Inc, Defendant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Wayne Marquart +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 jmarquart@bakermarquart.com
No Logo FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, Defendant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Wayne Marquart +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 jmarquart@bakermarquart.com
No Logo John Does, Defendant
No Logo Universal Cable Productions LLC, Counter-Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (209) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Permanent Injunction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, ADVANCES the Status Conference previously scheduled for 06/22/2017 to 4/24/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Stipulation to Continue Status Conference (the "Stipulation"), and good cause appearing therefor: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the status conference currently scheduled for March 16, 2017 be continued to June 22, 2017, at 8:30 a.m. (jy) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CHANGE CASE CAPTION by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Clarify, 156 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: a) "Universal Cable Productions LLC" shall be substituted for "Universal Network Television LLC" for all purposes in this matter; and b) The case caption shall be changed accordingly. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Status Conference continued to 3/16/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint STIPULATION to Clarify CASE CAPTION filed by plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge George H. Wu. Effective November 14, 2016, Judge Wu will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 9D on the 9th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Counsel for Defendants is not present. Based on the status report filed on September 22, 2016, and for reasons stated on the record, the status conference is continued to December 15, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: In light of the parties' Joint Status Report 152 regarding the pending appeal in this action, the present status conference now set for April 21, 2016, is continued to September 26, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to jointly file a status report on September 22, 2016.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ryan G Baker counsel for Defendants Alkiviades David, FilmOn X LLC, FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc, Counter Claimants FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, FilmOn.TV, INC, FilmOn.com, INC. Changing Address to 2029 Century Park East, Suite 1600, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Defendant and counterclaimants. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn X LLC(pty:dft))(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Based on the Court's Order 148 , the parties are ordered to file a Joint Status Report by October 26, 2015.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge George H. Wu: granting 145 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert A. Garrett on behalf of Plaintiff, designating James S. Blackburn as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Robert A. Garrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16075829 paid.) 145 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: No signatures on Application. Applicant and local counsel did not sign the application. Electronic is not accepted. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Answer to Counterclaim
Plaintiffs' ANSWER to Counterclaim, 135 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC.(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Answer
ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, 136 DEFENDANT FILMON.COM INCS AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant FilmOn.com Inc, FilmOn.com, INC.(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Answer
ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, 136 DEFENDANT FILMON.TV, INC's AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV, INC.(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Answer
ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, 136 DEFENDANT ALKIVIADES DAVID'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Alkiviades David.(Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party Alkiviades David (pty:dft))(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Amended Answer to Complaint
AMENDED ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant FilmOn.TV Networks Inc. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Amended Answer to Complaint
AMENDED ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant FilmOn X LLC. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Third Amended Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying ABC Holding Company Inc., Open 4 Business Productions LLC, CBS Broadcasting Inc., Big Ticket Television, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., NBCUniversal Media, LLC, CBS Studios Inc., Telemundo Network Group LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, American Broadcasting Companies Inc., NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, Universal Network Television LLC. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Amended Complaint
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint,, 67 , filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, CBS Broadcasting Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBCUniversal Media LLC, CBS Studios Inc, Telemundo Network Group LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, Universal Network Television LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 43)(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Counterclaim
First COUNTERCLAIM against Counterdefendants All Plaintiffs, filed by Counterclaimants FilmOn.com, INC, FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn.TV, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn X, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn.TV, INC(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn.TV Networks, INC(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn.com, INC(pty:cc))(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR (1) PLAINTIFFS TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; (2) DEFENDANTS TO FILE ANSWERS TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; (3) DEFENDANTS TO FILE COUNTERCLAIM; AND (4) PLAINTIFFS TO FILE ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 133 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs shall file a Third Amended Complaint in the form attached as Exhibit A to the Stipulation, within two (2) court days from the date of this Order. 2. Defendants shall file the Counterclaim in the form attached as Exhibit G to the Stipulation, within two (2) court days from the date of this Order. 3. Defendants and Alkiviades David shall file Answers in response to the Third Amended Complaint in the form attached as Exhibits B-F to the Stipulation, within two (2) court days after the Third Amended Complaint is filed. 4. Plaintiffs shall file an Answer in response to the Counterclaim in the form attached as Exhibit H to the Stipulation, within two (2) court days after the Counterclaim is filed. (lom) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
Joint STIPULATION to Amend Pleadings filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/10/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: For reasons stated on the record, the above-entitled action is consolidated with Fox Television StationsInc., et al. v. AeroKiller, et al., CV 12-6921-GW(JCx) for all pretrial purposes. The Court's Further Consideration Based on Additional Submissions is circulated and attached hereto. Court confers with counsel and the following schedule is set:Last Day to Amend Pleadings September 22, 2014; Fact Discovery Cutoff Limited to the Section 111 Issue January 9, 2015; Simultaneous Exchange oflnitial Expert Reports on Section 111 February 2, 2015; Simultaneous Exchange of Rebuttal Expert Reports March 2, 2015; Simultaneous Opening Briefs on Summary Adjudication of the March 31, 2015 Section 111 Issue; Simultaneous Rebuttal Briefs April 24, 2015; Hearing on Summary Adjudication May 8, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. (Cases associated with Lead Case 2:12-cv-6921-GW(JCx)). Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014 Objection
OBJECTIONS to Supplement (non-motion),, 126 Objections to Declaration of Jim Blackburn filed by Defendants Aereokiller LLC, FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Court's Request for Briefing re Copyright Act Section 111 filed by Defendants Aereokiller LLC, FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Scott Malzahn)(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Reply (non-motion)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/23/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support request for judicial notice filed by Defendants Aereokiller LLC, FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/23/2014, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Supplement (Motion related)
SUPPLEMENT to status conference filed by Defendants Aereokiller LLC, FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. (Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn.TV Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn.TV Networks Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn.com Inc(pty:dft))(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Supplement (non-motion)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer. Parties are ordered to file simultaneous supplemental briefs by August 22, 2014. Simultaneous responses and proposed schedules will be filed by September 2, 2014. The status conference is continued to September 8, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, sets a Status Conference re: USCA Order 123 for 8/11/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 USCA Order
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, 104 filed by NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, CBS Studios Inc, NBCUniversal Media LLC, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, ABC Holding Company Inc, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, CBS Broadcasting Inc, Universal Network Television LLC, Disney Enterprises Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 101 filed by FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc, Aereokiller LLC, CCA # 13-55157 and 13-55228. This case is resubmitted effective June 25, 2014. As stipulated by the parties, this appeal is dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. This order served on the district court shall constitute the mandate of this court. Order received in this district on 7/29/14. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 USCA Order
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 104 filed by NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, CBS Studios Inc, NBCUniversal Media LLC, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, ABC Holding Company Inc, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, CBS Broadcasting Inc, Universal Network Television LLC, Disney Enterprises Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 101 filed by FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc, Aereokiller LLC, CCA # 13-55157 and 13-55228. The Order is Within 20 days of the date of this order the parties shall file simultaneous briefs of no more than fifteen pages, addressing the implications of the recent decision in American Broadcasting Cos., Inc. v. Aereo, Inc., No. 13-461, 573 U.S. (2014), on this appeal. Order received in this district on 7/9/14. (mat) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Report
JOINT REPORT of Supreme Court Area Decision filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue,, 119 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Except for the status conference date, the provisions of this Courts March 14, 2013 Order (Dkt. No. 110) staying the litigation pending appeal remain in full force and effect; 2. The status conference, set for February 3, 2014, will be taken off calendar; 3. The parties shall file a joint report to this Court within 5 court days ofthe Supreme Courts decision in American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. v. Aereo, Inc. (U.S. No. 13-461), setting forth their views on how the case should proceed in light of that decision and when a status conference should be set; and 4. The continuance does not preclude the parties from seeking relief from this Court if the Ninth Circuits opinion in the appeal and cross-appeal of this CourtsDecember 27, 2013 Order requires some District Court action. (pj) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Stipulation to Continue
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from February 3, 2014 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 116 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 USCA Order
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, 104 filed by NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, CBS Studios Inc, NBCUniversal Media LLC, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, ABC Holding Company Inc, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, CBS Broadcasting Inc, Universal Network Television LLC, Disney Enterprises Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 101 filed by FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc, Aereokiller LLC CCA # 13-55157,13-55228. Submission of this case is vacated and the appeal is held in abeyance pending the United States Supreme Court's decision in American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., v. Aereo, Inc., No. 13-461. Order received in this district on 1/27/2014. (dmap) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The time to appear at the Status Conference, presently set for 02/03/2014, has changed from 8:30 to 11:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the status Conference previously scheduled for 01/23/2014 to 2/3/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
ORDER re Stipulation to Continue 114 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Except for the status conference date, the provisions of this Courts March 14, 2013 Order (Dkt. No. 110) staying the litigation pending appeal remain in full force and effect; 2. The status conference will be continued from December 2, 2013 to January 23, 2014 at 8:30 a.m.; and 3. The continuance does not preclude the parties from seeking relief from this Court if the Ninth Circuits opinion in the appeal and cross-appeal of this Courts December 27, 2013 Order requires some District Court action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kti) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Stipulation to Continue
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from December 2, 2013 to January 20, 2014 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 113 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Status Conference previously scheduled for 11/21/2013 to 12/2/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE of Defendant Aereokiller LLC Name Change filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC, FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc, John Does. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES OF POST-MEDIATION Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Settlement was not reached. A Status Conference is set for November 21, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. This action is stayed pending the resolution of the matter in front of the Ninth Circuit Court. All previously set dates are vacated and taken off-calendar.: Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (pj) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Staying CaseCourt Filing
ORDER RE STAYING THELITIGATION PENDING APPEAL by Judge George H. Wu. A Status Conference is set for November 21, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. (pj) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: 3/6/2013 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Status Conference previously scheduled for 03/07/2013 to 3/14/2013 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CORRECT THE RECORD FOR CONSOLIDATED CROSS APPEALS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct, 106 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Exhibits A through C attached to the stipulation are filed with the Court and will be transmitted to the Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit as part of the record of the consolidated cross-appeals (Ninth Circuit Case Nos. 13-55156, 13-55157, 13- 55226, and 13-55228). (pj) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, continues the Post-Mediation Status Conference previously scheduled for 03/02/2013 to 3/7/2013 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
Joint STIPULATION to CORRECT THE RECORD FOR CONSOLIDATED CROSS-APPEALS filed by Plaintiff ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 13-55228, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 104 as to Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Television Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (mat) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 104 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. Appeal of Preliminary Injunction 82 , Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion Hearing,,,, 81 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-11635126 paid.) (Mason, Eric) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION RE MEDIATION DEADLINE 100 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The mediation completion deadline is extended from January 30, 2013 to March 1, 2013; and 2. The post-mediation status conference is continued from January 31, 2013 to March 2, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (afe) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 13-55157, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 101 as to Defendants Aereokiller LLC, FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. (mat) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC, FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. Appeal of Preliminary Injunction 82 , Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,,,,, 75 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-11572472 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Mediation Deadline and Post-Mediation Status Conference from January 30, 2013 and January 31, 2013 to March 1, 2013 and March 2, 2013 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ulin, John) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant FilmOn.TV Networks Inc (Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, identifying AEREOKILLER LLC, FILMON.TV, INC., FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC., FILMON.COM, INC. (Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, 67 filed by Defendant FilmOn.TV Networks Inc.(Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant FilmOn.TV Inc (Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FilmOn.TV Inc, identifying AEREOKILLER LLC, FILMON.TV, INC., FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC., FILMON.COM, INC. (Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, 67 filed by Defendant FilmOn.TV Inc.(Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant FilmOn.com Inc (Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FilmOn.com Inc, identifying AEREOKILLER LLC, FILMON.TV, INC., FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC., FILMON.COM, INC. (Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, 67 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant FilmOn.com Inc.(Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT executed by Plaintiff ABC Holding Company Inc, et al., upon Defendants Aereokiller LLC; Filmon.tv, Inc; Filmon.tv Networks, Inc; Filmon.com, Inc., by serving Ryan Baker, Esq by messenger service on on 12/4/12. Statute not specified by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (lom) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Alkiviades David re Compliance with Preliminary Injunction Order filed by Defendants Aereokiller LLC, FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. (Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, 68 , Summons Issued, Amended Complaint,, 67 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 69 FILMON TV INC.,, ETC. (ALEX HARTMAN - REGISTERED AGENT) served on December 28, 2012. (Mason, Eric) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, 68 , Summons Issued, Amended Complaint,, 67 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 69 FILMON TV NETWORKS INC. (ALEX HARTMAN - REGISTERED AGENT) served on December 28, 2012. (Mason, Eric) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, 68 , Summons Issued, Amended Complaint,, 67 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 69 FILMON.COM, INC. (ALEX HARTMAN, REGISTERED AGENT) served on December 28, 2012. (Mason, Eric) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE BY ATTORNEY RE APPROVAL OF BOND re Bond, 84 filed by Plaintiffs (pj) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
INJUNCTION BOND in the amount of $ 250,000.00 posted by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC (pj) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF BOND POSTING filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Coronel, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 82 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge George H Wu (pj) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (filed11/08/12) 41 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Motion Hearing held before Judge George H Wu: Court hears oral argument. The Tentative Final Ruling circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's final ruling. The Court GRANTS IN PART Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction. Court signs the proposed order. The Court accepts the following stipulation placed on the record: (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Thursday, December 20, 2012; 10:13 A.M. re Transcript 79 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Wilcox, Wil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Thursday, December 20, 2012; 10:13 A.M. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, phone number 213-290-2849. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/17/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2013. (Wilcox, Wil) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
JOINT REPORT of Re: (1) Geographic Scope of Preliminary Injunction and (2) Amount of Preliminary Injunction Bond filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, Defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Coronel, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ABC Holding Company Inc, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Telemundo Network Group LLC, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, upon Defendant FilmOn.TV Inc served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/25/2012; FilmOn.TV Networks Inc served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/25/2012; FilmOn.com Inc served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/25/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon 12/4/2012 by serving Ryan Baker, Jaime Marquart Esquire by personal service (pj) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,,,,, 75 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Preliminary Injunction)(Mason, Eric) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF re Motion for Preliminary Injunction 41 held before Judge George H Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion is taken under submission and continued to December 27,2012 at 11:00 a.m. A joint document regarding the bond amount issue is due by noon on December 26,2012. Court to issue ruling. Please note: hearing originally set for 9:30 a.m. has been changed to 11:00 a.m. (See Order for details.) Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (kti) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Answer
ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, 67 filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC.(Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Response - non motion
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC to Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/17/2012 Objections -- non-motion
OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF NIGEL JONES FILED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES OF TUTORIAL HEARING (Non-Evidentiary) held before Judge George H Wu: Hearing held. Parties made their presentations to the Court.Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (pj) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Granting Stipulation 66 by Judge George H Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The hearing on Plaintiffs' request for preliminary injunction 41 is continued from December 18, 2012 to December 20, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. (lom) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, 68 , Amended Complaint, 67 Proof of Service on Defendants served on 12/04/2012. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
SECOND AMENDED CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (lom) (lom). (Entered: 12/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 67 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Amended Complaint
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 8 , 28 ; Demand for Jury Trial against Defendants John Does, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.TV Inc, FilmOn.com Incfiled by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, CBS Broadcasting Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Telemundo Network Group LLC, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, Universal Network Television LLC. (lom) (lom). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2012: # 1 Part 2) (lom). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2012: # 2 Summons Issued) (lom). (Entered: 12/05/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Stipulation to Continue
Joint STIPULATION to Continue preliminary injunction hearing from December 18, 2012 to December 20, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anstett, Christian) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Response in Support of Motion
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 (Response to Aereokiller LLC's Sur-Reply) filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Motion Related Document
Sur-Reply re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Anstett, Christian) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES OF Telephone Status Conference held before Judge George H Wu. Hearing held off the record. Court and counsel confer. The Court GRANTS the Stipulation re Filing of Sur-Reply and Response 61 as follows: The sur-reply will be filed by November 30, 2012; the response will be filed by 3:00 p.m. on December 4, 2012; and the Preliminary Injunction 41 hearing is continued from December 6, 2012 to December 18, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. The Court sets a Tutorial hearing on December 6, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. Each side will have 15 minutes for their presentation. Court Reporter: None Present. (kti) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/29/2012 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER re Stipulation 56 by Judge George H Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: a) Defendants Barry Driller, Inc. and Barrydriller Content Systems Plc be dismissed without prejudice; b) Plaintiffs shall manually file a Second Amended Complaint adding FilmOn.TV, Inc., FilmOn.TV Networks, Inc. and FilmOn.com, Inc. as named defendants to their copyright infringement claims within five (5) court days after the date this Order is entered on the docket for this action. (Barry Driller Content Systems PLC and Barry Driller Inc terminated.) (kti) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/28/2012 Stipulation for Leave
Joint STIPULATION for Leave to File Sur-Reply and Response Thereto in Connnection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS to MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, 51 Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to Declarations, Requests for Judicial Notice and Exhibits Offered By Defendants in Support of their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Supplemental Declaration of Julie A. Shepard in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Nigel Jones in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
REPLY in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
Joint STIPULATION to Amend Corrected Complaint,, 28 , Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Barry Driller Content Systems PLC, Barry Driller Inc, BarryDriller Content Systems Plc filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, CBS Broadcasting Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Telemundo Network Group LLC, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, Universal Network Television LLC. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation)(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Julie A. Shepard in Support of Plaintiffs' MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mat) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 53 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Application for Filing Documents Under Seal. (mat) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 52 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION to Seal File Under Seal. (mat) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Declaration of Ryan Baker, # 3 Declaration of Jaime Marquart, # 4 Declaration of Mykola Kutovyy, # 5 Declaration of Alkiviades David)(Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu. Last day to add parties and/or amend pleadings 11/20/2012. Discovery cut-off 4/30/2013. Motion hearing cutoff 6/27/2013. Mediation cuotff 1/30/2012. Jury Trial set for 8/6/2013 09:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2013 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. Status Conference set for 1/31/2013 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. The parties are referred to ADR Procedure No.3-Private Mediation.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (bp) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 40 Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Application for Filing Documents Under Seal; Declaration of Julie A. Shepard in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filed Under Seal) including Exhibit M thereto; and Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filed Under Seal) served on November 8, 2012. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Julie A. Shepard in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 (Public Version) filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Ulin, John) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Samuel Bahun in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Sherry Brennan in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Rebecca Borden in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Marsha Reed in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Carly Seabrook in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act. 41 (Public Version) filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Prohibiting retransmitting Plaintiffs' over-the-air broadcasts via the Internet, web applications, portable devices, or any other method without Plaintiffs' authorization in violation of the Copyright Act... If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate judicial review, please call 213-894-2485 to advise that a Preliminary Injunction has been electronically filed. Failure to call the courtroom deputy, or the after hours filing contact number, may result in a delay of judicial review. Motion filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/6/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Preliminary Injunction Order)(Ulin, John) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC of Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Application for Filing Doucments Under Seal; Declaration of Julie A. Shepard in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filed Under Seal) including Exhibit M thereto; Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filed Under Seal). (Ulin, John) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge George H Wu. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than (pj) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order/Referral to ADR)(Mason, Eric) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan & Scheduling Report ; estimated length of trial 7-15 days, filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC.. (Mason, Eric) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation for Discovery 34 a) Aereokiller shall serve its written responses and objections to theDiscovery on or before September 28, 2012; b) Subject to its objections and any response thereto, Aereokiller shall produce documents responsive to the Discovery on or before October 15, 2012; and c) Subject to its objections and any response thereto, the deposition ofAereokiller shall occur on or before October 29, 2012. (pj) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: On the Courts own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for November 8, 2012 at 8:30 a.m.Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and reportto the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than October 25, 2012. See Civil L.R. 26-1. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to all parties that have appeared in this action, and is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date.: (pj) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Discovery as to preliminary discovery filed by defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 08.05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 12-06921 GW(JCx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for DISCOVERY. The case number will now read as follows: CV 12-06950 GW(JCx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (rn) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: On the Courts own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for November 8, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than October 25, 2012. (pj) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (sp) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulated Protective Order re Amended Complaint,, 8 (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Protective Order)(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE EXPEDITED DISCOVERY (filed 08/30/12) 14 Motion Hearing held before Judge George H Wu: The Court grants in part and denies in part the motion. Defendant's objections are due within 15 days. Counsel shall submit a stipulation re production within 30 days. The depositions shall take place within 45 days. The parties are ordered to notify the magistrate judge of the Court's schedule.Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (bp) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
CORRECTED COMPLAINT against defendants Barry Driller Inc, Barry Driller Content Systems PLC, Aereokiller LLC, John Does correcting Amended Complaint,, 8 ,filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Big Ticket Televison Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Telemundo Network Group LLC, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, Universal Network Television LLC (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3)(pj) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge George H Wu ORDERING Corrected First Amended Complaint submitted by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC received on 8/27/12 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (pj) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, 8 filed by defendant Aereokiller LLC.(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 22 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: The event to use is: SELECT "Notices" and SELECT " Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties". In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of John C. Ulin In Support of MOTION for Leave to to Serve Expedited Discovery 14 Supplemental Declaration filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
REPLY In Support of MOTION for Leave to to Serve Expedited Discovery 14 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
Certification of Interested Parties (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
Objections Opposition re: MOTION for Leave to to Serve Expedited Discovery 14 Objections to Ulin Declaration filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Leave to to Serve Expedited Discovery 14 filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (lom) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, re MOTION for Leave to to Serve Expedited Discovery 14 , Memorandum in Support of Motion, 15 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 16 served on August 30, 2012. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of John C. Ulin in Support of MOTION for Leave to to Serve Expedited Discovery 14 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Leave to to Serve Expedited Discovery 14 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Ulin, John) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to to Serve Expedited Discovery filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ulin, John) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Hearing is held off the record. Court and counsel confer re Stipulation to Set an Expedited Briefing Schedule, filed on August 27, 2012. The Stipulation is approved. Court signs the order.: Court Reporter: None Present. (pj) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Expedite, 10 Plaintiffs may file and serve defendant Aerokiller, LLC (Aerokiller) by email their Motion forExpedited Discovery (Motion) on or before Thursday, August 30, 2012; ( Opposition due by 9/6/2012, Replies due by 9/10/2012.). Hearing on the Motion will take place on September 13, 2012 at 8:30a.m. (pj) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff NBCUniversal Media LLC, upon Defendant Aereokiller LLC served on 8/27/2012, answer due 9/17/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patrick Suchacz, Process Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite Discovery filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ulin, John) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company Inc, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. correcting Amended Complaint,, 8 (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1 ; Demand for Jury Trial against Defendants Barry Driller Inc, John Does, Aereokiller LLC, Barry Driller Content Systems PLC filed by Plaintiffs CBS Studios Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBCUniversal Media LLC, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Universal Network Television LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, ABC Holding Company Inc, Big Ticket Televison Inc, Telemundo Network Group LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (lom) (pj). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2012: # 1 21 day summons issued as to 1st AC) (pj). (Entered: 08/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Audrey B. Collins, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 12-06921 ABC(JCx) (rn) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. (See Order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by American Broadcasting Companies Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Universal Network Television LLC. (et) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs American Broadcasting Companies Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Universal Network Television LLC. Related Case(s): CV 12-6921 (ABC (JCx). (et) (mg). (Entered: 08/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs American Broadcasting Companies Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, identifying Other Affiliate NBCUniversal LLC, Other Affiliate Comcast Corporation, Other Affiliate General Electric Company for NBCUniversal Media LLC; Corporate Parent Walt Disney Company for American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Disney Enterprises Inc; Other Affiliate KNBC TV for NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC; Corporate Parent CBS Corporation for CBS Broadcasting Inc, CBS Studios Inc; Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Medial LLC for Universal Network Television LLC. (et) (mg). (Entered: 08/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT against Defendants Barry Driller Inc, BarryDriller Content Systems Plc, John Does 1-10. Case assigned to Judge George H Wu for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs CBS Studios Inc, CBS Broadcasting Inc, NBC Subsidiary KNBC-TV LLC, Disney Enterprises Inc, NBCUniversal Media LLC, American Broadcasting Companies Inc, Universal Network Television LLC. (et) (mg). (Entered: 08/13/2012)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: None, Entered: None
LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (sp)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 175 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?