Hubbel v. Patrish LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:12-cv-01579-CDP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 27, 2017 at 1:41 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Respondent, its officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all persons acting in concert or participation with it or them, pending the finaldisposition of the matters involved herein pendi ng before the Board, are enjoined and restrained from engaging in the following acts and conduct: (see order for further details). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall remain on the docket of this Court and on compliance by Respondent with its obligations undertaken hereto, and upon disposition of the matters pending before the Board, the Petitioner shall cause this proceeding to be dismissed. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/15/12. (KXS)
    LREF
    Blank 20 Filed: 9/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion to limit evidence [# 2 ] is granted as set out above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument and any evidence the parties wish to submit on Friday, October 12, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14-South. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 09/28/2012. (CBL)
      LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 17 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?