JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00725
District Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Judicial Watch, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Judicial Watch, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Bekesha +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 mbekesha@judicialwatch.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Orfanedes +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 porfanedes@judicialwatch.org
v.
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamara Lynn Ulrich +1 202 305 1432 +1 202 616 8460 tamara.ulrich@usdoj.gov
Attributes
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Timeline
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Case reassigned to Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein. Judge Henry H. Kennedy no longer assigned to the case. (ds) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees and related costs is to be filled on, or before 1/20/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/7/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys Fees and Related Costs by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) Forwarded to Chief Judge Lamberth on 12/7/2011 (ds). (Entered: 12/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Palmer, # 2 Declaration of Ryan Law, # 3 Vaughn Index, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ulrich, Tamara) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file for Summary Judgment and to Amend Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ulrich, Tamara) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ulrich, Tamara) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Ulrich, Tamara) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ulrich, Tamara) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. identifying Corporate Parent NONE for JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (dr) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616037930) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 193 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?