Kickapoo Run LLC v. Electronic Medical Solutions
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:12-cv-01278
District Judge David O. Carter, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2017 at 3:23 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kickapoo Run, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W Ritcheson +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 swritcheson@whitefieldinc.com
v.
No Logo Electronic Medical Solutions, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter, re Order to Show Cause 5 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed for lack of prosecution pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (rla) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter. Court orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than JANUARY 30, 2013, why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept one of the following, if it is filed on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on ALL defendants. (See document for further details.) (rla) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(nbo) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
        REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (nbo) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kickapoo Run LLC. (nbo) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            COMPLAINT against Defendant Electronic Medical Solutions. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman.(Filing fee $ 350 Paid) Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiff Kickapoo Run LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Notice of Assignment, # 4 Issued Summons)(nbo) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 126 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?