USA v. Sagote et al
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-00574-MHP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 20, 2019 at 11:57 AM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

v.
No Logo Elisara Taito, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall, Christopher C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hall, Christopher C +1 415 661 9148 +1 415 664 4280

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Kayla Grant

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Juliana Drous +1 415 863 3580 +1 415 255 8631 jdrous@msn.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Francisco
Filed 8/26/2008
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
308-mj-70524-MAG
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a)(d) and 2 attempted armed bank robbery and aiding and abetting attempted armed bank robbery
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a)(d) and 2 armed bank robbery and aiding and abetting armed bank robbery
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
18371 conspiracy to commit armed bank robbery
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None PRB12
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None PRB12
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Arraignment as to Elisara Taito (3) Count 1,2,3 held on 8/27/2008 Plead not guilty. Sentencing set for 9/15/2008 10:00 AM before Hon. Marilyn H. Patel. (Tape #10:21-10:25.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
        CJA 20 appointing Juliana Drous as to Elisara Taito. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/25/08. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Indictment
          INDICTMENT as to Angelica Sagote (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Sefo Sagote (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Elisara Taito (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
            ORDER OF DETENTION as to Elisara Taito. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/26/8. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2008)[3:08-mj-70524-MAG]
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
              Attorney update in case as to Elisara Taito. Attorney Juliana Drous for Elisara Taito added. Attorney Jodi Linker terminated.
                LREF
                Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Proposed Order
                Proposed Order by USA as to Elisara Taito OF DETENTION OF DEFENDANT ELISARA TAITO (Lowder, Gregg) (Filed on 8/25/2008)[3:08-mj-70524-MAG]
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Detention Hearing as to Elisara Taito held on 8/22/2008 Preliminary Examination set for 8/27/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Tape #10:15-10:34.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2008)[3:08-mj-70524-MAG]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Detention Hearing as to Elisara Taito not held on 8/18/2008 Detention Hearing set for 8/22/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Prelim. hrg set for 8/27/08 9:30am before Judge Spero.(Tape #9:33-9:35.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2008)[3:08-mj-70524-MAG]
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Detention Hearing as to Elisara Taito not held on 8/15/2008. Set for 8/18/08 9:30 before Judge Spero for detn hrg, atty appt, submit financial affdt. (Tape #10:04-10:05.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2008)[3:08-mj-70524-MAG]
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Attorney Appointment HearingCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Elisara Taito held on 8/11/2008, Added attorney Christopher C. Hall for Elisara Taito. Attorney Jodi Linker terminated in case as to Elisara Taito. Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 8/15/2008 09:30 AM before Judge Spero.(Tape #9:42-9:47.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2008)[3:08-mj-70524-MAG]
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman:Initial Appearance as to Elisara Taito held on 8/8/2008, Added attorney Jodi Linker for Elisara Taito. Set for 8/11/08 9:30 before Judge Spero for atty appt hrg.(Tape #9:48-9:58.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2008)[3:08-mj-70524-MAG]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT as to Angelica Sagote (1), Sefo Sagote (2), Elisara Taito (3), Donnisha Harrell (4). (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2008)[3:08-mj-70524-MAG]
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                              CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. [3:08-mj-70524-MAG]
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?