Fox Television Stations LLC et al v. BarryDriller Content Systems Plc et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-06921-GW-JC
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 21, 2017 at 10:56 AM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo ABC Holding Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
No Logo Big Ticket Television Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
CBS Broadcasting, Inc. CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
CBS Studios, Inc. CBS Studios, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
Disney Enterprises, Inc. Disney Enterprises, Inc., Plaintiff
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Infoseek Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Active Network, Inc.,
Officer/Director, A.b.c. Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Holding CO Inc.
Officer/Director, ESPN Holding Company, Inc.
Officer/Director, Espn, Inc.
Officer/Director, Espn Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ESPN Digital Media, Inc.

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
No Logo Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Plaintiff
Fox Television Stations, Inc. Fox Television Stations, Inc., Plaintiff
NBC Subsidiary (KNBC-TV), Inc. NBC Subsidiary (KNBC-TV), Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
NBCUniversal Media, LLC NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
No Logo Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
No Logo Telemundo Network Group LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
No Logo Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Plaintiff
No Logo Universal Network Television, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
No Logo WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Blackburn +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4144 james_blackburn@aporter.com
No Logo FilmOn X, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
No Logo FilmOn.com, INC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
No Logo FilmOn.TV INC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
No Logo FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
v.
No Logo Aereokiller LLC, Defendant
No Logo Alkiviades Alki David, Defendant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Wayne Marquart +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 jmarquart@bakermarquart.com
No Logo Barry Driller Inc., Defendant
No Logo BarryDriller Content Systems Plc, Defendant
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 through 3, Defendant
No Logo FilmOn X LLC, Defendant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
No Logo FilmOn.com Inc, Defendant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jaime Wayne Marquart +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 jmarquart@bakermarquart.com
No Logo FilmOn.Tv Inc, Defendant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Wayne Marquart +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 jmarquart@bakermarquart.com
No Logo FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, Defendant

Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Geoffrey Baker +1 424 652 7800 +4 245 652 7850 rbaker@bmchlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jaime Wayne Marquart +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 jmarquart@bakermarquart.com
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (283) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Permanent Injunction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: USCA Order 211 CCA # 15-56420. The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered March 21, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Opinion 239 The judgment of the districtcourt is REVERSED.](mat) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed. CCA # 15-56420. The judgment of the district court is REVERSED. Opinion corrected to update counsel listing. (car) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, ADVANCES the Status Conference previously scheduled for 06/22/2017 to 4/24/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Substitute Party
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed. CCA # 15-56420. The judgment of the district court is REVERSED.(mat) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff Fox Television Stations, LLC for Plaintiff Fox Television Stations, Inc. Notice of Name Change and Consent Motion to Change Case Caption 234 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Notice of Motion is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Substitute Party
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE 232 by Judge George H. Wu. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Stipulation to Continue Status Conference (the "Stipulation"), and good cause appearing therefor: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the status conference currently scheduled for March 16, 2017 be continued to June 22, 2017, at 8:30 a.m. (jy) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from March 16, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. to June 22, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Re: Order,, Set/Reset Hearing, 229 filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Big Ticket Television, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., NBC Subsidiary (KNBC-TV) Inc, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Telemundo Network Group Llc, Universal Cable Productions LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney James S Blackburn counsel for Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Big Ticket Television, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., NBC Subsidiary (KNBC-TV) Inc, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Telemundo Network Group Llc, Universal Cable Productions LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. Changing Firm Name to Arnold Porter Kaye Scholer LLP. Changing e-mail to Ronald.Johnston@apks.com, John.Ulin@apks.com, James.Blackburn@apks.com. Filed by Plaintiffs NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Network Television, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, NBC Subsidiary (KNBC-TV), Telemundo Network Group LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasing LLC, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., ABC Holding Company Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., and Big Ticket Television, Inc.. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CHANGE CASE CAPTION by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:a) "Universal Cable Productions LLC" shall be substituted for "Universal Network Television LLC" for all purposes in this matter; and b) The case caption shall be changed accordingly. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: Having reviewed the parties' Joint Stipulation to Continue Status Conference (the "Stipulation"), and good cause appearing therefor: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the status conference currently scheduled for December 15, 2016, at 8:30 a.m., be continued to March 16, 2017, at 8:30 a.m. (cr) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from December 15, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. to March 16, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Re: Status Conference,, Set/Reset Hearing, 226 filed by plaintiffs ABC Holding Company, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Big Ticket Television, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, NBC Subsidiary (KNBC-TV) Inc, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Telemundo Network Group Llc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney James S Blackburn added to party Fox Broadcasting Company Inc(pty:pla), Attorney James S Blackburn added to party Fox Television Stations Inc(pty:pla), Attorney James S Blackburn added to party NBCUniversal Media, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney James S Blackburn added to party Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(pty:pla))(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge George H. Wu. Effective November 14, 2016, Judge Wu will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 9D on the 9th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Counsel for Defendants is not present. Based on the status report filed on September 22, 2016, and for reasons stated on the record, the status conference is continued to December 15, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: In light of the parties' Joint Status Report 223 regarding the pending appeal in this action, the present status conference now set for April 21, 2016, is continued to September 26, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to jointly file a status report on September 22, 2016.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Big Ticket Television, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., NBC Subsidiary (KNBC-TV) Inc, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Telemundo Network Group Llc, Universal Network Television, LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
Amended CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Aereokiller LLC, Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn X LLC, FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn.TV INC, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, FilmOn.com Inc, FilmOn.com, INC, (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ryan G Baker counsel for Defendants Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn X LLC, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc, Counter Claimants FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn.TV INC, FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, FilmOn.com, INC. Changing Address to 2029 Century Park East, Suite 1600, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/11/14 8:30 am; 9/8/14 8:49 am re Transcript 219 , 218 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/8/14 8:49 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2016. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/11/14 8:30 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2016. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants FilmOn X LLC, FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn.TV INC, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, FilmOn.com Inc, FilmOn.com, INC Court Reporter. Court will contact Scott Malzahn at smalzahn@bakermarquart.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 8/11/14 and 9/8/14. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs ABC Holding Company, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Big Ticket Television, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., NBC Subsidiary (KNBC-TV) Inc, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Telemundo Network Group Llc, Universal Network Television, LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC Court Reporter. Court will contact Eric Mason at eric.mason@aporter.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 07/16/2015 Hrg re Summery Judgment Motions. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Attachments: # 1 07-21-2015 G-120 form)(Blackburn, James) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56420, 9th Circuit regarding USCA Order, 211 . (mat) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed. CCA # 15-80151. The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) is granted. Within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioners shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). (car) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/16/15 9:24 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2015. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Based on the Court's Order 208 , the parties are ordered to file a Joint Status Report by October 26, 2015. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Summary Adjudication
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn X LLC, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Ryan Baker at rbaker@bakermarquart.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 7/16/15 by Katie Thibodeaux re Hearing on Summary Judgment Motions. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation Court Reporter. Court will contact Julie A. Shepard at jshepard@jenner.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 07/16/2015 Hearing re: Summary Judgment Motions. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff ABC Holding Company, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Big Ticket Television, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, NBC Subsidiary (KNBC-TV) Inc, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Telemundo Network Group Llc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC Court Reporter. Court will contact James Blackburn at james.blackburn@aporter.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Transcript of 7-16-2015 Hearing on Summary Judgment Motions. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Blackburn, James) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Stay Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu RE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 162 ; Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication of Defendants' Counterclaims and Declaratory Relief and Defendants' Section III Affirmative Defense 164 . The Court DENIES without prejudice Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Stay 201 . The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. The Court orders counsel to meet and confer and file a joint form of partial summary judgment by 7/23/2015. The Court continues the matter to 7/27/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu, unless the Court grants the proposed order by 4:00 PM on 7/24/2015, at which point, the hearing will be vacated. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (gk) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Stay Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 200 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Supplement (Motion related)
SEALED DOCUMENT - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Nigel Jones in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication. (gk) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 199 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Supplement (Motion related)
SEALED DOCUMENT - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Julie A. Shepard in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3)(gk) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Ruling
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 198 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Motion for Ruling
SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections. (gk) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 197 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Statement (Motion related)
SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact. (gk) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 196 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication. (gk) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None For Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 195 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE REBUTTAL BRIEF ON SUMMARY ADJUDICATION REGARDING SECTION 111 AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: Upon Plaintiffs' Application 193 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the following shall be filed under seal: (l) Portions of Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Brief on Summary Adjudication regarding Section 111, which quote and summarize deposition testimony and documents that defendants have designated testimony of these witnesses as Confidential under the Protective Order; (2) Portions the Supplemental Declaration of Julie A. Shepard in support of Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Brief on Summary Adjudication regarding Section 111 ("Supplemental Shepard Declaration") and exhibits thereto, which I comprise of deposition testimony of Alkiviades David, Mykola Kutovyy and Sigurd Meldal. Defendants have designated testimony of these witnesses as Confidential under the Protective Order; (3) Portions of the Supplemental Declaration of Nigel Jones in support of Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Brief on Summary Adjudication regarding Section 111 ("Jones Supplemental Declaration"), which summarize portions of the FilmOn X source code which defendants have designated "Highly Confidential - For Counsel Only - Source Code" under the Protective Order; (4) Portions of Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact ("Response to Separate Statement") that quote, reference, and/or summarize the aforementioned exhibits, the Jones Supplemental Declaration, or the testimony of Mr. David, Mr. Kutovyy and Mr. Meldal; and (5) Portions of Plaintiffs' Request for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections to Declarations in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication that quote, reference, and/or summarize the aforementioned exhibits, testimony, and the Jones Supplemental Declaration. (gk) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Julie A Shepard in support of APPLICATION to file rebuttal brief on Summary Adjudication regarding section 111 and supporting documents under seal 193 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (shb) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Motion for Order
APPLICATION to file rebuttal brief on Summary Adjudication regarding section 111 and supporting documents under seal filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (shb) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: None Motion Related Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Motion Related Document
DECLARATION OF ALKIVIADES DAVID IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MSJ re Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Section 111 Affirmative Defense and Counterclaim 162 filed by Defendants Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn X LLC, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc, Counter Claimants FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn.TV INC, FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, FilmOn.com, INC. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), 160 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), 161 served on June 18, 2015. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Notice of Lodging
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), 187 (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Counter Defendants Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of DVD in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Counter Defendants Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of Application to Seal, Declaration in Support of Application to Seal, Proposed Order Granting Application to Seal, Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication; Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact, Plaintiffs' Request for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections; Supplemental Declaration of Julie A. Shepard, Supplemental Declaration of Nigel Jones. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: (pj) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 184 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Declaration (Motion related)
SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF JULIE A SHEPARD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5, # 5 Part 6, # 6 Part 7)(pj) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 183 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (pj) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 182 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Declaration (Motion related)
SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF NIGEL JONES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (pj) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 181 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Statement (Motion related)
SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW Joint IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (pj) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 180 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Declaration
SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF KELLY M. RANEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMNtA_RY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENUANTS' COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND DEFENDANTS' SECTION Bl AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5, # 5 Part 6)(pj) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 179 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
SEALED DOCUMENT-ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARYADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMFOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND DEFENDANTS' SECTION 111 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE (pj) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 178 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Declaration
SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF MVKOLA KUTOVYY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND DEFENDANTS' SECTION HI AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE (pj) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 177 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Declaration (Motion related)
SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF DR. SIGURD MELDAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND DEFENDANTS' SECTION 111AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE (pj) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kenneth D Klein counsel for Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Counter Defendants Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Kenneth D. Klein is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth D. Klein. (Klein, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Motion for Leave to File Document
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Documents Under Seal in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication of Defendants' Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief and Defendants' Section 111 Affirmative Defense filed by Defendants Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn X LLC, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. (shb) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Julie A Shepard in support of Plaintiffs' APPLICATION to file Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 172 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (shb) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 OrderCourt Filing
STANDING ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge George H. Wu, (pj) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Motion for Leave to File Document
Plaintiffs' APPLICATION to file Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents Under Seal filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (shb) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Notice of Lodging
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Lodging of Disc re Notice (Other), 164 (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF filed by Defendants Alkiviades Alki David, Does 1 through 3, FilmOn X LLC, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc, Counter Claimants FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn.TV INC, FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, FilmOn.com, INC. (Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party Does 1 through 3(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn X LLC(pty:dft))(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed by Defendant and counterclaimants Alkiviades Alki David, Does 1 through 3, FilmOn X LLC, FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn.TV INC, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, FilmOn.com Inc, FilmOn.com, INC. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Alkiviades Alki David, Does 1 through 3, FilmOn X LLC, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc, Counter Claimants FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn.TV INC, FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, FilmOn.com, INC of Documents under seal. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Summary Judgment (Partial)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Counter Defendants Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal, Declaration of Julie A. Shepard in Support of Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal, [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Counter Defendants Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of Declaration of Julie Shepard, Declaration of Nigel Jones, Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Point and Authorities, and Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Aereokiller LLC, Barry Driller Inc., BarryDriller Content Systems Plc, Alkiviades Alki David, Does, Does 1 through 3, FilmOn X LLC, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc, Counter Claimants FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn.TV INC, FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, FilmOn.com, INC of Documents under seal. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ENTRY ONLY: Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at JC_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Amended Document (Non-Motion)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue 154 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1. The deadline for the parties to simultaneously exchange rebuttal experts reports on the Section 111 issue is May 18, 2015; 2. The deadline for the parties to simultaneously exchange sur-rebuttal expert reports on the Section 111 issue is June 8, 2015; 3. The deadline for the parties to file simultaneous opening briefs on summary adjudication of the Section 111 issue is June 18, 2015; 4. The deadline for the parties to file simultaneous rebuttal briefs on summary adjudication of the Section 111 issue is July 2, 2015; and 5. The hearing on summary adjudication will be on July 16, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. (kss) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Stipulation to Continue
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Certain Scheduling Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO EXCHANGE EXPERT REBUTTAL REPORTS by Judge George H. Wu, re Order 152 (yl) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINTSTIPULATION TO CONTINUEDEADLINE TO EXCHANGEEXPERT REBUTTAL REPORTS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Order, 151 (yl) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015 Stipulation for Order
Joint STIPULATION for Order TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO EXCHANGE EXPERT REBUTTAL REPORTS filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. At the request of counsel, the Court hereby vacates the Telephonic Conference re Discovery Issues previously scheduled for 3/13/15 at 9:30 am before Magistate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. No telephonic appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
(TEXT ONLY ENTRY) SCHEDULING NOTICE SETTING CONTINUED TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY ISSUES by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. At the parties request, the previously set telephonic conference is continued to Friday, March 13, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. The Clerk will initiate the call. The parties are directed to contact the Clerk with their phone numbers and to file briefs identifying the disputed issues and the parties' positions regarding those issues no later than 3:00 p.m. on Thursday. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dml) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
(TEXT ONLY ENTRY) SCHEDULING NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY ISSUES by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. At the parties request, the Court hereby sets a telephonic conference for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. The Clerk will initiate the call. The parties are directed to contact the Clerk with their phone numbers and to file briefs identifying the disputed issues and the parties' positions regarding those issues no later than 5:00 p.m. today. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 Stipulation to Continue
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Certain Scheduling Deadlines Re: Status Conference,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Set/Clear Flags,,, 136 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Answer to Counterclaim
ANSWER to Counterclaim, 139 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation.(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Amended Answer to Complaint
AMENDED ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Alkiviades Alki David. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Amended Answer to Complaint
AMENDED ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant FilmOn.Tv Inc. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Amended Answer to Complaint
AMENDED ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant FilmOn.TV Networks Inc. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Amended Answer to Complaint
AMENDED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant FilmOn.com Inc. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Amended Answer to Complaint
AMENDED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant FilmOn X LLC. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Counterclaim
First COUNTERCLAIM against Counterdefendants All Plaintiffs, filed by Counterclaimants FilmOn X, LLC, FilmOn.com, INC, FilmOn.TV Networks, INC, FilmOn.TV INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn X, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn.TV Networks, INC(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn.TV INC(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn.com, INC(pty:cc))(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR (1) DEFENDANTS TO FILE AMENDED ANSWERS TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; (2) DEFENDANTS TO FILE COUNTERCLAIM; AND (3) PLAINTIFFS TO FILE ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 137 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants shall file Amended Answers in response to the Second Amended Complaint in the form attached as Exhibits A-E to the Stipulation, within two (2) court days from the date of this Order. 2. Defendants shall file the Counterclaim in the form attached as Exhibit F to the Stipulation, within two (2) court days from the date of this Order. 3. Plaintiffs shall file an Answer in response to the Counterclaim in the form attached as Exhibit G to the Stipulation, within two (2) court days after the Counterclaim is filed. (lom) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
STIPULATION to AMEND filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/10/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES OF ;Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: For reasons stated on the record, the above-entitled action is consolidated with NBCUniversal Media,LLC, et al. v. AeroKiller, et al., CV 12-6950-GW(Ex) for all pretrial purposes.;The Court's Further Consideration Based on Additional Submissions is circulated; and attached hereto.;Court confers with counsel and the following schedule is set:Last Day to Amend Pleadings September 22, 2014;Fact Discovery Cutoff Limited to the Section 111 Issue January 9, 2015;Simultaneous Exchange of Initial Expert Reports on Section 111 February 2, 2015;Simultaneous Exchange of Rebuttal Expert Reports March 2, 2015;Simultaneous Opening Briefs on Summary Adjudication of the March 31, 2015 Section 111 Issue; Simultaneous Rebuttal Briefs April 24, 2015; Hearing on Summary Adjudication May 8, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS to Supplement (non-motion), 133 Objections to Declaration of Jim Blackburn filed by Defendants Aereokiller LLC, Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
REPLY to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Court's Request for Briefing re Copyright Act Section 111 filed by Defendants Aereokiller LLC, Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Scott Malzahn Declaration)(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Supplement (non-motion)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/11/14 8:30 am re Transcript 131 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/11/14 8:30 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/23/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2014. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/23/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support request for judicial notice filed by Defendants Aereokiller LLC, Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/23/2014, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT to status conference filed by Defendants Aereokiller LLC, Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. (Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party Alkiviades Alki David(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn.TV Networks Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn.Tv Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan G Baker added to party FilmOn.com Inc(pty:dft))(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Supplement (non-motion)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Parties are ordered to file simultaneous supplemental briefs by August 22, 2014. Simultaneous responses and proposed schedules will be filed by September 2, 2014. The status conference is continued to September 8, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, sets a Status Conference re: USCA Order 125 for 8/11/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 103 filed by Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Fox Television Stations Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 98 filed by Aereokiller LLC, FilmOn.Tv Inc, Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc, CCA # 13-55156 and 13-55226. As stipulated by the parties, this appeal is dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. This order served on the district court shall constitute the mandate of this court. Order received in this district on 7/29/14. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 103 filed by Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Fox Television Stations Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 98 filed by Aereokiller LLC, FilmOn.Tv Inc, Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc, CCA # 13-55156 and 13-55226. The Order is Within 20 days of the date of this order the parties shall file simultaneous briefs of no more than fifteen pages, addressing the implications of the recent decision in American Broadcasting Cos., Inc. v. Aereo, Inc., No. 13-461, 573 U.S. (2014), on this appeal. Order received in this district on 7/9/14. (mat) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT (Joint) filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue 121 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Except for the status conference date, the provisions of this Courts March 14, 2013 Order (Dkt. No. 111) staying the litigation pending appeal remainin full force and effect; 2. The status conference, set for February 3, 2014, will be taken offcalendar; 3. The parties shall file a joint report to this Court within 5 court days of the Supreme Courts decision in American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. v. Aereo,Inc., (U.S. No. 13-461), setting forth their views on how the case should proceed inlight of that decision and when a status conference should be set; and4. The continuance does not preclude the parties from seeking relieffrom this Court if the Ninth Circuits opinion in the appeal and cross-appeal of thisCourts December 27, 2013 Order requires some District Court action. (pj) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from February 3, 2014 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 103 filed by Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Fox Television Stations Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 98 filed by Aereokiller LLC, FilmOn.Tv Inc, Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.com Inc CCA # 13-55156, 13-55226. Submission of this case is vacated and the appeal is held in abeyance pending the United States Supreme Court's decision in American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., v. Aereo, Inc., No. 13-461. Order received in this district on 1/27/2014. (dmap) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The time to appear at the Status Conference, presently set for 02/03/2014, has changed from 8:30 to 11:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the status Conference previously scheduled for 01/23/2014 to 2/3/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven B Fabrizio counsel for Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Steven B. Fabrizio is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Fox Television Stations, Inc., et al.. (Fabrizio, Steven) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re Stipulation to Continue 115 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Except for the status conference date, the provisions of this Courts March 14, 2013 Order (Dkt. No. 111) staying the litigation pending appeal remain in full force and effect; 2. The status conference will be continued from December 2, 2013 to January 23, 2014 at 8:30 a.m.; and 3. The continuance does not preclude the parties from seeking relief from this Court if the Ninth Circuits opinion in the appeal and cross-appeal of this Courts December 27, 2013 Order requires some District Court action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kti) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from December 2, 2013 to January 20, 2014 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Status Conference previously scheduled for 11/21/2013 to 12/2/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE Defendant Aereokiller LLC Name Change filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC, Alkiviades Alki David, Does 1 through 3, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 112 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED UPON DEFENDANTS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR held before Judge George H. Wu:, Show Cause Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu, Settlement was not reached. A Status Conference is set for November 21, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. Thisaction is stayed pending the resolution of the matter in front of the Ninth Circuit Court. The order to show cause is discharged. All previously set dates are vacated and taken off-calendar. Case stayed.Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (pj) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Staying CaseCourt Filing
ORDER STAYING THE LITIGATION PENDING APPEAL by Judge George H. Wu The litigation will be stayed until the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit has ruled on Defendants appeal of this Courts December 27, 2012 Order (Order), Plaintiffs cross-appeal of this Courts Order, and theconsolidated appeal and cross-appeal from this Courts Order issued in the related case, NBCUniversal Media LLC, et al. v. Aereokiller, LLC., et al. (C.D. Cal. CaseNo. 12-6950); A Status Conference is set for November 21, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. (pj) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Stipulation to Stay Case
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Appeal filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CORRECT THE RECORD FOR CONSOLIDATED CROSS APPEALS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Order 107 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:Exhibits A through C attached to the stipulation are filed with the Court and will be transmitted to the Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit as part of therecord of the consolidated cross-appeals (Ninth Circuit Case Nos. 13-55156, 13-55157, 13-55226, and 13-55228). (pj) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Case is called. Counsel are not present. Parties are ordered to appear on March 14, 2013 at 8:30 a.m., and show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute and why sanctions should not be imposed upon Defendants for failure to appear. The Post-Mediation Status Conference is continued to March 14, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Mary Rickey. (bp) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Stipulation for Order
STIPULATION for Order to Correct the Record for Consolidated Cross-Appeals filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Thursday, November 8, 2012; 8:49 A.M. re Transcript 105 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Wilcox, Wil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Transcript (CV)
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Thursday, November 8, 2012; 8:49 A.M. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, phone number 213-290-2849. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2013. (Wilcox, Wil) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Waiver of Service Executed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: 1/25/2013 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: 1/25/2013 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 97 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Order
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Stipulation to Continue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Jury Demand
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Declaration (non-motion)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013 Affidavit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013 Bond
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Notice of Filing Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Transcript (CV)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 ~Notice (other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 78 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge George H Wu (pj)
LREF
Blank 78 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge George H Wu (pj) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (filed11/08/12) Motion Hearing held before Judge George H Wu: Court hears oral argument. The Tentative Final Ruling circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as theCourt's final ruling. The Court GRANTS IN PART/DENIES IN PART Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction. Court signs the proposed order Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Thursday, December 20, 2012; 10:13 A.M. re Transcript 75 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Wilcox, Wil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Thursday, December 20, 2012; 10:13 A.M.. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, phone number 213-290-2849. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/17/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2013. (Wilcox, Wil) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
STATEMENT (1) Geographic Scope of Preliminary Injunction and (2) Amount of Preliminary Injunction Bond filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation (Stone, Richard) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or 41 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order)(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, upon Defendant FilmOn.Tv Inc served on 12/18/2012, answer due 1/8/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Lascala, Registered Agent, Business Filings Incorporated in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Stone, Richard) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, upon Defendant FilmOn.TV Networks Inc served on 12/18/2012, answer due 1/8/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Lascala, Registered Agent, Business Filings Incorporated in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Stone, Richard) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, upon Defendant FilmOn.com Inc served on 12/18/2012, answer due 1/8/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Frances Burris, Registered Agent, National Registered Agents in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Stone, Richard) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 69 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Notice of Filing Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Response - non motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Transcript (CV)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 64 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/17/2012 Objections -- non-motion
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 62 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012 Stipulation and Order
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Aereokiller LLC Court Reporter. Court will contact Jaime Marquart at jmarquart@bakermarquart.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Hearing re Technology. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, by overnight mail to Ryan Baker, Jaime Marquart of Baker Marquart (pj) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Aereokiller LLC, Does 1 through 3, Alkiviades Alki David, FilmOn.TV Networks Inc, FilmOn.Tv Inc, FilmOn.com Inc amending Amended Complaint, 7 ,filed by Plaintiffs Fox Television Stations Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation (pj) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 58 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
Joint STIPULATION to Continue hearing on preliminary injunction from December 18, 2012 to December 20, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anstett, Christian) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or 41 (Response to Sur-Reply) filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Stone, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
Sur-reply re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or 41 filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Anstett, Christian) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Telephone Status Conference held before Judge George H Wu. Hearing held off the record. Court and counsel confer. The Court GRANTS the Stipulation re Filing of Sur-Reply and Response 54 as follows: The sur-reply will be filed by November 30, 2012; the response will be filed by 3:00 p.m. on December 4, 2012; and the Preliminary Injunction hearing 41 is continued from December 6, 2012 to December 18, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. The Court sets a Tutorial hearing on December 6, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. Each side will have 15 minutes for their presentation. Court Reporter: None Present. (kti) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Preliminary Injunction as to FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order RE FILING OF ADDITIONAL BRIEFING RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION)(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re Stipulation to Dismiss Party and to Amend/Correct 51 by Judge George H Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Defendants BarryDriller Content Systems PLC and Barry Driller Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice. 2. Plaintiffs shall manually file a Second Amended Complaint within five (5) court days of the date of this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Barry Driller Inc. and BarryDriller Content Systems Plc terminated.) (kti) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
REPLY In Support Of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or 41 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julie A. Shepard (Supplemental), # 2 Declaration of Nigel Jones, # 3 Evidentiary Objections to Declarations, Requests for Judicial Notice and Exhibits Offered by Defendants)(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 51 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Barry Driller Inc., BarryDriller Content Systems Plc, STIPULATION to AMEND Amended Complaint, 7 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Television Stations Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Dismiss Barrydriller Entities Without Prejudice and to File Second Amended Complaint)(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
  • Attachment 1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Dismiss Barrydriller Entities Without Prejudice
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Julie A. Shepard in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5)(mat) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (mat) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/13/2012 9:10 a.m. re Transcript 47 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Cuneo, Patricia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/13/2012 9:10 a.m. Court Reporter: PAT CUNEO, CSR 1600, website: www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2013. (Cuneo, Patricia) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 46 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or 41 filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Declaration of Ryan Baker, # 3 Declaration of Jaime Marquart, # 4 Declaration of Mykola Kutovyy, # 5 Declaration of Alkiviades David)(Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the following shall be filed under seal: (see attached for further details) 42 (pj) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 40 , Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Declaration of Julie A. Shepard in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Application for Filing Documents Under Seal served on November 8, 2012. (Stone, Richard) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu. Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2012. Discovery cut-off is 4/30/2013. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/30/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2013 at 8:30 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/6/2013 at 9:00 AM. The parties are referred to ADR Procedure No. 3 - Private Mediation. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (kbr) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
APPLICATION to file UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Lodged Proposed Order. (pj) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement.. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate judicial review, please call 213-894-2485 to advise that a Preliminary Injunction has been electronically filed. Failure to call the courtroom deputy, or the after hours filing contact number, may result in a delay of judicial review. Motion filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 12/6/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Declaration of Julie A. Shepard, # 3 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of J. Shepard, # 4 Exhibit E-G to Declaration of J. Shepard, # 5 Exhibit H-J to Declaration of J. Shepard, # 6 Exhibit K to Declaration of J. Shepard, # 7 Exhibit L-M to Declaration of J. Shepard, # 8 Exhibit N-S to Declaration of J. Shepard, # 9 Declaration of Sherry Brennan, # 10 Declaration of Carly Seabrook, # 11 Declaration of Marsha Reed, # 12 Declaration of Rebecca Borden, # 13 Declaration of Samuel Bahun, # 14 Proposed Order re Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation of Application to Seal and Sealed Documents. (Stone, Richard) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge George H Wu. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than (pj) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Aereokiller LLC, Barry Driller Inc., BarryDriller Content Systems Plc, identifying Internet TV Broadcasting LLC. (Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 weeks, filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation.. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: No Certification of Interested Parties by Defendants Barry Driller Inc BarryDriller Content Systems Plc 34 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): The event to use when E-Filing is: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties under NOTICES. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 7 filed by Defendants Barry Driller Inc., BarryDriller Content Systems Plc.(Marquart, Jaime) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation for Discovery 31 Aereokiller shall serve its written responses and objections to the Discovery on or before September 28, 2012; b) Subject to its objections and any response thereto, Aereokiller shall produce documents responsive to the Discovery on or before October15, 2012; and c) Subject to its objections and any response thereto, the deposition ofAereokiller shall occur on or before October 29, 2012. (pj) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: On the Courts own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for November 8, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than October 25, 2012. See CivilL.R. 26-1. (pj) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Discovery as to Preliminary discovery filed by defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re Stipulation for Protective Order 26 . See order for details. (hr) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting 24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven B. Fabrizio on behalf of Plaintiff Fox Television Stations, Inc., et al., designating Richard L. Stone as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Fox Television Stations Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. upon Barry Driller Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/23/2012, answer due 10/22/2012. Waiver of Service signed by Ryan Baker. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Fox Television Stations Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. upon BarryDriller Content Systems Plc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/23/2012, answer due 10/22/2012. Waiver of Service signed by Ryan Baker. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Related Case(s): 12-CV-06950-GW-E (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Steven B. Fabrizio to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10987408 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Fabrizio, Steven) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY IN CONNECTION WITH PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION (filed 08/29/12) 13 held before Judge George H Wu: The tentative is circulated and attached hereto. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court grants in part and denies in part the motion. Defendants objections are due within 15 days. Counsel shall submit a stipulation re production within 30 days. The depositions shall take place within 45 days. The parties are ordered to notify the magistrate judge of the Courts schedule. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (Attachments: # 1 Tentative Ruling) (pj) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
REPLY in Support of MOTION to Expedite Discovery 13 filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ethan A. Glickstein)(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
DISCLOSURE of INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC (Anstett, Christian) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC (Anstett, Christian) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
OBJECTION opposition re: MOTION to Expedite Discovery 13 DEFENDANT AEROKILLER LLC'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATIONS OF JULIE SHEPARD AND SHERRY BRENNAN filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Anstett, Christian) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Expedite Discovery 13 filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC. (Baker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 7 filed by Defendant Aereokiller LLC.(Anstett, Christian) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant to Section 3.1 of General Order 08-05. ORDER case transferred from Judge Audrey B. Collins to the calendar of Judge George H Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 12-06921 GW(JCx). Signed by Judge Audrey B. Collins and Judge George H. Wu. (rn) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Expedite, 11 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: a) Plaintiffs Fox Television Stations, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox FilmCorp., and Fox Broadcasting Company, Inc. (collectively Fox) may fileand serve defendant Aereokiller, LLC (Aereokiller) by email theirMotion for Expedited Discovery (Motion) forthwith;b) Any opposition papers served electronically and filed by Wednesday,September 5, 2012; c) Any reply papers served electronically and filed by Friday, September 7,2012; and d) The hearing on the motion will take place on September 13, 2012 at8:30 a.m. (pj) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge George H Wu:Hearing is held off the record. The above-entitled action will be reassigned as agreed between thisCourt and the Honorable Audrey B. Collins. Clerk to issue order to reassign.Court and counsel confer re Stipulation to Set an Expedited Briefing Schedule, filed on August 27, 2012. The Stipulation is approved. Court signs the order. : Court Reporter: None Present. (pj) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery, # 2 Declaration of Sherry Brennan, # 3 Declaration of Julie Shepard, # 4 Exhibit A-K to Declaration of J. Shepard, # 5 Exhibit L-P to Declaration of J. Shepard, # 6 Proposed Order Granting Expedited Discovery, # 7 Proposed Order re Protective Order)(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Expedite, 11 (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Notice of Motion and Motion re Expedited Discovery, # 2 Memorandum of Points & Authorities re Motion for Expedited Discovery, # 3 Declaration of Sherry Brennan, # 4 Declaration of Julie Shepard, # 5 Exhibit A-K to Declaration of J. Shepard, # 6 Exhibit L-P to Declaration of J. Shepard, # 7 Proposed Order Granting Expedited Discovery, # 8 Proposed Order re Protective Order, # 9 Proof of Service)(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Expedite Briefing Schedule filed by plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulation To Set An Expedited Briefing Schedule)(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fox Television Stations Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, upon Defendant Aereokiller LLC served on 8/14/2012, answer due 9/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patrick Suchanec, Agent Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Singer, David) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Singer, David) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (Singer, David) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants BarryDriller Content Systems Plc, Barry Driller Inc., Aereokiller LLC, Does 1 through 3; Party Does terminated amending Complaint 1 , filed by plaintiffs Fox Television Stations Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summons on First Amended Complaint) (bm) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Steven B. Fabrizio for Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (et) (mg). (Entered: 08/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, identifying Other Affiliate News Corporation for Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Fox Television Stations Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (et) (mg). (Entered: 08/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT against Defendants BarryDriller Content Systems Plc, Does 1 through 5 inclusive. Case assigned to Judge Audrey B. Collins for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Fox Television Stations Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. (et) (mg). (Entered: 08/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re Stipulation for Protective Order 26 . See order for details. (hr)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 294 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?