Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Xerox Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00524

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 7:02 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Xerox Corporation Xerox Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Scott Coy +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 scoy@carterstafford.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Tetsuo Hamada +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 shamada@carterstafford.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Arnett, II +1 214 550 8209 +1 214 550 8185 barnett@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowles & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tabitha Goodwin +1 214 672 2188 +1 214 672 2388 tgoodwin@cowlesthompson.com
v.
Xerox Corporation Xerox Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Scott Coy +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 scoy@carterstafford.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Tetsuo Hamada +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 shamada@carterstafford.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Arnett, II +1 214 550 8209 +1 214 550 8185 barnett@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowles & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tabitha Goodwin +1 214 672 2188 +1 214 672 2388 tgoodwin@cowlesthompson.com
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT. The parties shall take nothing and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
        ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Xerox Corporation of Return of Summons for Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. (Carter, Edgar) Modified on 2/25/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/25/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
          SUMMONS Issued as to Xerox Corporation and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/12/2012 Answer to Counterclaim
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/12/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/12/2012 Answer
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/12/2012 Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/12/2012 Memorandum and Opinion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 14 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?