Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund v. Wynn et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00642-JCM -GWF
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 10:44 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Boilermakers Lodge No. 154 Retirement Fund, Plaintiff

Represented by Reisman Sorokac

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua H Reisman +1 702 727 6258 +1 702 446 6756 jreisman@rsnvlaw.com
No Logo Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Brett Rehns +1 212 213 9311 +1 212 779 0028 drehns@cohenmilstein.com

Represented by Aldrich Law Firm, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Aldrich +1 702 853 5490 +1 702 227 1975 jaldrich@johnaldrichlawfirm.com

Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher E Lometti +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 clometti@cohenmilstein.com
Space Richard A Speirs +1 212 223 3900 +1 212 371 5969 rspeirs@cohenmilstein.com
v.
No Logo Allan Zeman, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
No Logo Alvin V. Shoemaker, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
Space Jarrod L. Rickard +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 jlr@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo D. Boone Wayson, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
Space Jarrod L. Rickard +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 jlr@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Elaine P. Wynn, Defendant

Represented by 16th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William R. Urga +1 702 699 7500 +1 702 699 7555 FedCt@juww.com

Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Stephen Peek +1 702 669 4600 +1 702 669 4650 speek@hollandhart.com

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark B Helm +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 683 5187 mark.helm@mto.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
No Logo John A. Moran, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
Space Jarrod L. Rickard +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 jlr@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Kazuo Okada, Defendant
No Logo Linda Chen, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
Space Jarrod L. Rickard +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 jlr@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Marc D. Schorr, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
Space Jarrod L. Rickard +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 jlr@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Ray R. Irani, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
Space Jarrod L. Rickard +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 jlr@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Robert J. Miller, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
Space Jarrod L. Rickard +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 jlr@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Russell Goldsmith, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
Space Jarrod L. Rickard +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 jlr@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Wynn, Stephen A., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stephen A. Wynn"
Officer/Director, Wynn Resorts Ltd

Represented by Campbell & Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Jude Campbell +1 702 382 5222 +1 702 382 0540 djc@cwlawlv.com
Space J. Colby Williams +1 702 382 5222 +1 702 382 0540 jcw@campbellandwilliams.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
Other Parties
No Logo Wynn Resorts, Limited, Nominal Defendant

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
Space Jarrod L. Rickard +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 jlr@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
Timeline
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 53 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that the above-captioned case be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED without prejudice as to Kazuo Okada. Kazuo Okada terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/04/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* 04/17/12.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Kazuo Okada.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 9/27/2012. (SRK) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 6/7/2012. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman and Judge Philip M. Pro no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:12-cv-00642-JCM-GWF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER to Consolidate. It is ORDERED that case numbers 2:12-cv-509-JCM-GWF, 2:12-cv-555-JCM-GWF, 12-cv-567-JCM-PAL, and 2:12-cv-642-PMP-CWH shall be consolidated. Case number 2:12-cv-509-JCM-GWF shall be the base file. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/6/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 1 Complaint; filed by Defendants Linda Chen, Russell Goldsmith, Ray R. Irani, Robert J. Miller, John A. Moran, Marc D. Schorr, Alvin V. Shoemaker, D. Boone Wayson, Elaine P. Wynn, Stephen A. Wynn, Allan Zeman, Nominal Defendant Wynn Resorts, Limited. (Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 44 Verified Petition for Permission for Attorney Christopher Lometti to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Attorney John Aldrich as Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/30/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Main Document 48 replaced on 5/31/2012) (ECS). (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 43 Verified Petition for Permission for Attorney Richard Speirs to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Attorney John Aldrich as Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/30/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: 44 and 45 VERIFIED PETITIONS; filed by Plaintiff Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund (Aldrich, John) Modified text on 5/31/2012 (SRK). (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 40 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney William Urga added. Attorney J. Stephen Peek terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/30/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Lometti and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John P. Aldrich (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2387011) filed by Plaintiff Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund Motion ripe 5/30/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard Speirs and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John P. Aldrich (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2386986) filed by Plaintiff Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Motion ripe 5/30/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Shane P. Sanders in Support of Cross-Motion re 10 Response to Motion, 41 Reply to Response to Motion, 12 Cross-MOTION Notice of Cross-Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, Lead Counsel, and Liaison Counsel ; by Plaintiff Boilermakers Lodge No. 154 Retirement Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Reisman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 12 Cross-MOTION Notice of Cross-Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, Lead Counsel, and Liaison Counsel ; filed by Plaintiff Boilermakers Lodge No. 154 Retirement Fund. (Reisman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Elaine P. Wynn. Motion ripe 5/29/2012. (Urga, William) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 33 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen R. DiPrima and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney James J. Pisanelli. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/29/2012. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 32 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul K. Rowe and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney James J. Pisanelli. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/29/2012. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 31 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Grant R Mainland for Linda Chen, Russell Goldsmith, Ray R. Irani, Robert J. Miller, John A. Moran, Marc D. Schorr, Alvin V. Shoemaker, D. Boone Wayson, and Allan Zeman and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney James J. Pisanelli. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/29/2012. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Waiver of the Service of Summons by Plaintiff Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund re 34 Waiver of Service Executed. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 30 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley R. Wilson and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney James J. Pisanelli. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/29/2012. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Stephen A. Wynn waiver sent on 5/24/2012, answer due 7/23/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stephen R. DiPrima and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2384110) filed by Defendants Linda Chen, Russell Goldsmith, Ray R. Irani, Robert J. Miller, John A. Moran, Marc D. Schorr, Alvin V. Shoemaker, D. Boone Wayson, Allan Zeman. Motion ripe 5/25/2012. (Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Paul K. Rowe and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2384109) filed by Defendants Linda Chen, Russell Goldsmith, Ray R. Irani, Robert J. Miller, John A. Moran, Marc D. Schorr, Alvin V. Shoemaker, D. Boone Wayson, Allan Zeman. Motion ripe 5/25/2012. (Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Grant R. Mainland and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2384108) filed by Defendants Linda Chen, Russell Goldsmith, Ray R. Irani, Robert J. Miller, John A. Moran, Marc D. Schorr, Alvin V. Shoemaker, D. Boone Wayson, Allan Zeman. Motion ripe 5/25/2012. (Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Bradley R. Wilson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2384107) filed by Defendants Linda Chen, Russell Goldsmith, Ray R. Irani, Robert J. Miller, John A. Moran, Marc D. Schorr, Alvin V. Shoemaker, D. Boone Wayson, Allan Zeman. Motion ripe 5/25/2012. (Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Waivers of the Service of Summonses (Docs 20-28) by Plaintiff Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund re 26 Waiver of Service Executed, 23 Waiver of Service Executed, 24 Waiver of Service Executed, 20 Waiver of Service Executed, 28 Waiver of Service Executed, 25 Waiver of Service Executed, 22 Waiver of Service Executed, 21 Waiver of Service Executed, 27 Waiver of Service Executed. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Linda Chen waiver sent on 5/17/2012, answer due 7/16/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Russell Goldsmith waiver sent on 5/17/2012, answer due 7/16/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Ray R. Irani waiver sent on 5/17/2012, answer due 7/16/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Robert J. Miller waiver sent on 5/17/2012, answer due 7/16/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. John A. Moran waiver sent on 5/17/2012, answer due 7/16/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Marc D. Schorr waiver sent on 5/17/2012, answer due 7/16/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Alvin V. Shoemaker waiver sent on 5/17/2012, answer due 7/16/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. D. Boone Wayson waiver sent on 5/17/2012, answer due 7/16/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Allan Zeman waiver sent on 5/17/2012, answer due 7/16/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel Brett Rehns on behalf of Plaintiff Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. (Rehns, Daniel) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel B. Rehns and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney John P. Aldrich. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/14/2012. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Mark B. Helm to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 6/28/2012.(no image attached) (ASB) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Robert L. Shapiro, Paul K. Rowe, Stephen R. DiPrima, and Bradley R. Wilson to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 6/28/2012.(no image attached) (ASB) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Brett Rehns and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John P. Aldrich (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2366667) filed by Plaintiff Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Motion ripe 5/11/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 12 Cross-MOTION Notice of Cross-Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, Lead Counsel, and Liaison Counsel, 7 MOTION for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs, 8 MOTION for Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel, and 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendants Linda Chen, Russell Goldsmith, Ray R. Irani, Robert J. Miller, John A. Moran, Marc D. Schorr, Alvin V. Shoemaker, D. Boone Wayson, Elaine P. Wynn, Stephen A. Wynn, and Nominal Defendant Wynn Resorts, Limited. (Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 12 Cross-MOTION for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, Lead Counsel, and Liaison Counsel ; filed by Plaintiff Boilermakers Lodge No. 154 Retirement Fund. (Reisman, Joshua) Docket entry relationship modified on 5/8/2012 (SRK). (Entered: 05/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
Cross-MOTION for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, Lead Counsel, and Liaison Counsel re 11 Declaration, 10 Response to Motion, by Plaintiff Boilermakers Lodge No. 154 Retirement Fund. Responses due by 5/24/2012. (Reisman, Joshua) Modified text on 5/8/2012 (SRK). (Entered: 05/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Shane P. Sanders re 10 Response to Motion; filed by Plaintiff Boilermakers Lodge No. 154 Retirement Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Reisman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 7 MOTION for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs, 8 MOTION for Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel, 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, filed by Plaintiff Boilermakers Lodge No. 154 Retirement Fund. Replies due by 5/17/2012. (Reisman, Joshua) Modified text on 5/8/2012 (SRK). (Entered: 05/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM re 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 8 MOTION for Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel, 7 MOTION for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs; filed by Plaintiff Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Aldrich, John) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel by Plaintiff Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Responses due by 5/7/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs by Plaintiff Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Responses due by 5/7/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Responses due by 5/7/2012. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE re: 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 7 MOTION for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs and 8 MOTION for Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel; filed by Plaintiff Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Christopher Lometti, Richard Speirs, and Daniel B. Rehns to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 6/1/2012.(no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-2340204), filed by Excavators Union Local 731 Welfare Fund. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/27/2012. Proof of service due by 8/15/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Aldrich, John) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 53 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that the above-captioned case be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED without prejudice as to Kazuo Okada. Kazuo Okada terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/04/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 113 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?