Hoffman et al v. Panetta et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:12-cv-05049
District Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amanda Shaw, Plaintiff
No Logo Anna Moore, Plaintiff
No Logo Annarose Schaad, Plaintiff
No Logo Daniele Hoffman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Comar, Dave Inder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dave Inder Comar +1 415 640 5856 +1 415 513 0445 inder@comarlaw.com
No Logo Kelly Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Kevin Welsh, Plaintiff
No Logo Kimberly Davis, Plaintiff
No Logo Kole Welsh, Plaintiff
No Logo Lisa Ethridge, Plaintiff
No Logo Lola Miles, Plaintiff
No Logo Lynette Cubano, Plaintiff
No Logo Michelle Kemeny, Plaintiff
No Logo Richard Rovet, Plaintiff
No Logo Sascha Garner, Plaintiff
No Logo Sherry Shour, Plaintiff
No Logo Tamika Lane, Plaintiff
No Logo Tarina Addison, Plaintiff
No Logo Theodore Skovranek, Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas Shockley, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Donald Rumsfeld, Defendant
No Logo John McHugh, Defendant
No Logo Leon Panetta, Defendant
No Logo Michael B. Donley, Defendant
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1391
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Leon Panetta. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
    Summons Issued as to Robert M. Gates. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
      Summons Issued as to Donald Rumsfeld. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
        Summons Issued as to John McHugh. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
          Summons Issued as to Michael B. Donley. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on October 2, 2012. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniele Hoffman.. (Comar, Dave) (Filed on 9/28/2012) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/26/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/2/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT (with jury demand) (no process) against Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, John McHugh, Leon Panetta, Donald Rumsfeld (Filing fee $350, receipt number 34611079081). Filed by Lynette Cubano, Lola Miles, Tarina Addison, Kimberly Davis, Sherry Shour, Kelly Smith, Daniele Hoffman, Sascha Garner, Tamika Lane, Michelle Kemeny, Kevin Welsh, Lisa Ethridge, Kole Welsh, Thomas Shockley, Annarose Schaad, Richard Rovet, Anna Moore, Theodore Skovranek, Amanda Shaw. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2012: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/2/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 202 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?