Pirog v. Astrue
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:08-cv-02094-SBA
District Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo John B. Pirog, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Michael J. Astrue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Small Business Administration

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Firer +1 415 977 8937 +1 415 744 0134 Elizabeth.Firer@ssa.gov
Office Oakland
Filed 4/22/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 900 - Appeal of Fee Determination
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Marin
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags E-Filing, ProSe, RELATE
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/29/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Case Assigned/Reassigned
    Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Judge Hon. William H. Alsup no longer assigned to the case. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Letter
      Letter re: keeping case in San Francisco from John Pirog. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 7, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2008: # (1) Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Certificate Of Service.
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [11] by Michael J. Astrue (Firer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/5/2008) Modified on 8/6/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Social Security Case filed by Michael J. Astrue. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5)(Firer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/5/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Letter
              Letter requesting status of case from John Pirog. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General's Office on 05/08/08 by John B. Pirog. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Firer (Firer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Pirog. as to US Attorney's Office served on 5/6/2008, answer due 7/7/2008. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Pirog. as to SSA Office of the General Counsel served on 5/5/2008, answer due 7/7/2008. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Summons Issued as to USA
                        Summons Issued as to Michael J. Astrue, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting [3] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2008: # (1) Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008, Terminated: 4/28/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John B. Pirog. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Social Security Procedural Order
                              SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 08/07/08 @ 11:00 am, Courtroom 9. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT (ifpp) against Michael J. Astrue. Filed byJohn B. Pirog. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 227 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?