Google Inc. v. Netlist, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:08-cv-04144-SBA
District Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 18, 2020 at 1:47 PM DT (11.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Google, Inc. Google, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

v.
No Logo Netlist, Inc., Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 8/29/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, E-Filing
  Entries (225) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 8/5/2019 Patent/Trademark report
REPORT on the determination of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: # (1) Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Dismiss)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
    ORDER by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [210] Stipulation to Dismiss. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/7/16 (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016) Modified on 12/8/2016 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016, Terminated: 12/7/2016 stipulation
      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Acker, Eric) (Filed on 12/7/2016) Modified on 12/8/2016 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/8/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Status report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc.. (Acker, Eric) (Filed on 9/13/2016) Modified on 9/14/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Status report
          JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc. (Acker, Eric) (Filed on 3/14/2016) Modified on 3/15/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
            ORDER by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong granting [206] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Mark H. Francis. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/27/2016, Entered: 2/27/2016, Terminated: 2/29/2016 Motion to withdraw as attorney
              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Mark H. Francis) filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 3/14/2016. Replies due by 3/21/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Francis, Mark) (Filed on 2/27/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: 9/14/2015 Status report
                JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc.. (Acker, Eric) (Filed on 9/14/2015) Modified on 9/15/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Status report
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc.. (Acker, Eric) (Filed on 3/13/2015) Modified on 3/13/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Status report
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386 by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc. (Acker, Eric) (Filed on 9/12/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Status report
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386 by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc. (Acker, Eric) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified on 3/14/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: 9/13/2013 Status report
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386 by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc. (Altersohn, Allison) (Filed on 9/13/2013) Modified on 9/16/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Status report
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc. (Acker, Eric) (Filed on 3/13/2013) Modified on 3/14/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Status report
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc.. (Acker, Eric) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Eric Martin Acker for Netlist, Inc.,Eric Martin Acker for Netlist, Inc. added. Attorney Sean C. Cunningham terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 08/17/12. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: 8/14/2012 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by David C. Doyle for Morrison & Foerster LLP (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Doyle, David) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Notice - other
                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of John D. Kinton as Counsel, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 5/21/2012) Modified on 5/22/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Status report
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT RE REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,289,386, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Altersohn, Allison) (Filed on 3/13/2012) Modified on 3/14/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Status report
                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT 7,289,386, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Altersohn, Allison) (Filed on 9/13/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: 3/14/2011 Status report
                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT RE Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                          NOTICE of Change In Counsel, filed by Google Inc. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 1/12/2011) Modified on 1/13/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Notice of appearance
                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Donald F. Frederick Zimmer, Jr. and Cheryl A. Sabnis as Counsel, filed by Google Inc. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 1/12/2011) Modified on 1/13/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/13/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                              SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER: That Defendant Netlist, Inc., Substitute Sean C. Cunningham, John M. Guaragna, John D. Kinton and Jesse Hindman of DLA Piper LLP as attorneys of record in place of Adrian M. Pruetz and Erica J. Pruetz of Pruetz Law Group LLP and Enoch H. Liang and Steven R. Hansen of Lee Tran & Liang APLC. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/26/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel and Proposed Order, filed by Sean C. Cunningham (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 10/20/2010) Modified on 10/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [182] Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING action. Parties to submit status reports every (6) six-months. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/13/10. ***Civil Case Terminated (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                    Reply Memorandum re [182] Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386 filed by Google Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/10/2010) Modified on 9/13/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 statement
                                                      Statement of Non-Opposition to [182] Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting [181] Motion to Shorten Time (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Memorandum in opposition
                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re [181] MOTION to Shorten Time filed byNetlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Daniel Taylor)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010, Terminated: 9/14/2010 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                            Joint MOTION And Proposed Order Re: Equipment for Summary Judgment Hearing filed by Netlist, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010, Terminated: 9/14/2010 Motion To Stay
                                                              MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,386 filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2 (1 of 2), # (4) Exhibit 2 (2 of 2), # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010, Terminated: 9/8/2010 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the 08/03/10 Mandatory Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James shall not take place. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/22/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010) Modified on 7/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Exhibits
                                                                    EXHIBITS re [152] Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibits A, B, F, G, K, L and M to Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Netlist, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Counter-Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement CORRECTION OF DOCKET NO. [153] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s)[152]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Exhibits
                                                                      EXHIBITS re [150] Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibit A to Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner In Support Of Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity CORRECTION OF DOCKET NO. [151] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s)[150]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE: Continuing Motion Hearing to 9/14/2010 at 01:00 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010) Modified on 7/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 stipulation
                                                                          STIPULATION and Proposed Order re [80] Cancellation of 08/03/10 Mandatory Settlement Conference filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010, Terminated: 9/14/2010 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                            Joint MOTION re: Equipment for Summary Judgment hearing and Proposed Order, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/20/2010) Modified on 7/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Document E-Filed Under Seal
                                                                              DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re [171] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits D-G, I-P, R-T, and V to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of Netlist, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Patent Infringement by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit E, # (2) Exhibit F, # (3) Exhibit G, # (4) Exhibit I, # (5) Exhibit J, # (6) Exhibit K, # (7) Exhibit L, # (8) Exhibit M, # (9) Exhibit N, # (10) Exhibit O, # (11) Exhibit P, # (12) Exhibit R, # (13) Exhibit S, # (14) Exhibit T, # (15) Exhibit V)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of [172] Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendant Netlist, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment of Patent Infringement filed byNetlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S, # (20) Exhibit T, # (21) Exhibit U, # (22) Exhibit V, # (23) Exhibit W, # (24) Exhibit X, # (25) Exhibit Y)(Related document(s)[172]) (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Document E-Filed Under Seal
                                                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re [171] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Netlist, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment of Patent Infringement by Netlist, Inc.. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [138] Motion to File Under Seal Motion of Summary Judgment of Patent Infringement and Exhibits D-G, I-P, R-T and V to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 07/15/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010) Modified on 7/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: 7/13/2010, Terminated: 9/14/2010 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Google Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: 7/13/2010, Terminated: 9/14/2010 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: 7/13/2010, Terminated: 9/14/2010 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Netlist's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses Based on Netlist's JEDEC Activities Under Seal filed by Netlist, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Joint Stip. and Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Document E-Filed Under Seal
                                                                                            DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re [164] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibits 1 and 5 of the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen In Support of Netlist, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 5)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                              Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of [165] Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendant Netlist, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed byNetlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Related document(s)[165]) (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Document E-Filed Under Seal
                                                                                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re [164] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Defendant Netlist, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Netlist, Inc.. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [159] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Netlist's Reply Brief and Exhibits 1 and 5 to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 07/08/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT [164]*** STIPULATION AND ORDER, Document sealed. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/8/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010) Modified on 7/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, on 7/6/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010) Modified on 7/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of Netlist's Opposition to Google, Inc.'s MSJ of Invalidity, # (2) Exhibit A to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen, # (3) Exhibits B - H to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/6/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Objection
                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to [157] Document E-Filed Under Seal: Opposition to Netlist's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and in Support of Google's Counter-Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/6/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010, Terminated: 7/9/2010 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                            Administrative MOTION to File Under Seal Netlist's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Related Exhibits filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/6/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                              EXHIBITS B, C, E, L, Q, BB, C in Support re [157] Document E-Filed Under Seal to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit C, # (2) Exhibit E, # (3) Exhibit L, # (4) Exhibit Q, # (5) Exhibit BB, # (6) Exhibit CC)(Related document(s)[157]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/30/2010) Modified on 7/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Document E-Filed Under Seal
                                                                                                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re [156] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO NETLIST'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF SCOTT T. WEINGAERTNER AND EXHIBITS A, D, F-K, M-P, R-AA, DD-FF by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit D, # (4) Exhibit F, # (5) Exhibit G, # (6) Exhibit H, # (7) Exhibit I, # (8) Exhibit J, # (9) Exhibit K, # (10) Exhibit M, # (11) Exhibit N, # (12) Exhibit O, # (13) Exhibit P, # (14) Exhibit R, # (15) Exhibit S, # (16) Exhibit T, # (17) Exhibit U, # (18) Exhibit V, # (19) Exhibit W, # (20) Exhibit X, # (21) Exhibit Y, # (22) Exhibit Z, # (23) Exhibit AA, # (24) Exhibit DD, # (25) Exhibit EE, # (26) Exhibit FF)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [154] Motion to Seal Exhibits A, D, F-K, M-P, R-AA, and DD-FF to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT [156]*** STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [154]Motion to Seal Exhibits A, D, F-K, M-P, R-AA, and DD-FF to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010) Modified on 6/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010, Terminated: 6/29/2010 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                      Administrative MOTION to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Opposition to Netlist, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses Based on Netlist's JEDEC Activities and Related Exhibits filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/25/2010) Modified on 6/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  terminate deadlines
                                                                                                                        ***Deadlines terminated re Motion Hearing as to [154] (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                          *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #[179]. *** EXHIBITS A, B, F, G, K, L, M re [152] Document E-Filed Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B, # (2) Exhibit F, # (3) Exhibit G, # (4) Exhibit K, # (5) Exhibit L, # (6) Exhibit M, # (7) Proposed Order)(Related document(s)[152]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2010) Modified on 6/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/22/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Document E-Filed Under Seal
                                                                                                                            DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re [149] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Google's Opposition and Counter Motion and Exhibits C, D, E, H, I, J, and N to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit C, # (3) Exhibit D, # (4) Exhibit E, # (5) Exhibit H, # (6) Exhibit I, # (7) Exhibit J, # (8) Exhibit N)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                              *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #[178]. *** EXHIBIT A re [150] Document E-Filed Under Seal to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Related document(s)[150]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2010) Modified on 6/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/22/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Document E-Filed Under Seal
                                                                                                                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re [148] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Google's Invalidity Motion and Exhibits B and C to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING [145] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Opposition and Counter-Motion and Exhibits C, D, E, H, I, J and N to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support Thereof be FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/21/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING [144] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Invalidity Motion and Exhibits B and C to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support Thereof be FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/21/10 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT [149]*** STIPULATION AND ORDER: That Google's Opposition and Counter-Motion and Exhibits C, D, E, H, I, J and N to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support Thereof be FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/21/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010) Modified on 6/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/24/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT [148]*** STIPULATION AND ORDER: That Google's Invalidity Motion and Exhibits B and C to the Declaration of Scott T. Weingaertner in Support Thereof be FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/21/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010) Modified on 6/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/24/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010, Terminated: 6/22/2010 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                          First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Netlist, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Counter Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support of Opposition to Netlist, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Counter Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # (2) Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010, Terminated: 6/22/2010 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                            First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Related Exhibits filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Netlist, Inc. re [138] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion of Summary Judgment of Infringement and Related Exhibits Pursuant to N.D. Cal. Civ. R. 7-13 (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                [REDACTED VERSION] Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of [141] Document E-Filed Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses Based on Netlist's JEDEC Activities filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Netlist's Motion for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses Based on Netlist's JEDEC Activities)(Related document(s)[141]) (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 6/4/2010) Modified on 6/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Document E-Filed Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT DOCUMENT [140]*** MOTION for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses Based on Netlist's JEDEC Activities, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Steven Hansen (Part 1), # (2) Declaration of Steven Hansen (Part 2), # (3) Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 6/4/2010) Modified on 6/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [139] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits B, C, D, E and G to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010) Modified on 6/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010, Terminated: 6/4/2010 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                      Administrative MOTION to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses Based on Netlist's JEDEC Activities and Related Exhibits to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 6/1/2010) Modified on 6/2/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010, Terminated: 7/16/2010 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                        Administrative MOTION to File Under Seal Motion of Summary Judgment of Infringement and Related Exhibits, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 6/1/2010) Modified on 6/2/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [119] Motion to Seal Portions of the Memorandum in Opposition and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Allison Altersohn. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010) Modified on 5/6/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING Motion for Leave to Amend Infrigement Contentions in case 4:08-cv-04144-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010) Modified on 5/6/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held with Judge Laporte on 4/30/2010. Case did not settle. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                Reply Memorandum re [113] Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Steven R. Hansen ISO Reply to Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # (2) Exhibit A to Declaration of Steven R. Hansen, # (3) Exhibit B to Declaration of Steven R. Hansen, # (4) Exhibit C to Declaration of Steven R. Hansen)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 4/20/2010) Modified on 4/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT [115]*** ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [114] Motion to Seal Portions of Exhibit J to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of Netlist's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 4/14/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010) Modified on 4/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support of [117] Memorandum in Opposition filed by Google Inc.. ***FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT [135]*** (Related document(s)[117]) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 12 re [118] Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s)[118]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 10 re [118] Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s)[118]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 9 re [118] Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s)[118]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 8 re [118] Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s)[118]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 4 re [118] Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s)[118]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 3 re [118] Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s)[118]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 2 re [118] Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s)[118]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 1 re [118] Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s)[118]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing re [Confidential] Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (Patent L.R. 3-1 and 3-6) by Google Inc. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Leo Spooner III in Support of [120] Motion to Seal [Corrected] filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s)[120]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010, Terminated: 6/29/2010 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Portions re [117] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions [Corrected] filed by Google Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  terminate deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                            ***Deadlines terminated re Motion Hearing as to [120] Motion to Seal. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010, Terminated: 5/5/2010 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Opposition and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Allison Altersohn , filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/13/2010) Modified on 4/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Allison Altersohn in Support of [117] Memorandum in Opposition filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit, # (10) Exhibit, # (11) Exhibit, # (12) Exhibit, # (13) Exhibit, # (14) Exhibit, # (15) Exhibit)(Related document(s)[117]) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/13/2010) Modified on 4/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                  [REDACTED] Memorandum in Opposition re [113] Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byGoogle Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/13/2010) Modified on 4/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  terminate deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***Deadlines terminated. [119] Motion to Seal (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [114] Motion to Seal Exhibit J to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010) Modified on 4/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT [116]*** EXHIBIT J to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support re [113] Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Netlist, Inc.. ***FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT [131]*** (Related document(s)[113]) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010) Modified on 4/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT J to the Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support re [113] Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byNetlist, Inc.. ***FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT [115]*** (Related document(s)[113]) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 3/30/2010, Terminated: 4/6/2010 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Document [113] MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Netlist's Administrative Motion to File Portions of Exhibit J to the Decl. of Steven Hansen ISO Netlist's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Under Seal filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Manual Filing, # (2) Declaration of Edward Quon, # (3) Proposed Order in Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # (4) Redacted Copy of "Exhibit J" to Declaration of Steven Hansen ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # (5) Proof of Service of Documents (personally served))(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 3/30/2010, Terminated: 5/5/2010 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Netlist, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Steven Hansen in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Proof of Personal Service of Documents)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [111] Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:08-cv-04144-SBA; GRANTING [37] Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:09-cv-05718-SBA. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Laura Huffman ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 4461004963.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Order Setting Settlement Conference.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 4/30/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/11/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE REFERRED to Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Early Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/4/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010) Modified on 3/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed, as amended, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/05/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  terminate deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***Deadlines terminated. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 stipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Select Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Early Settlement Conference, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/2/2010) Modified on 3/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF STIPULATION to Select Magistrate Judge Trumbull for Early Settlement Conference and Proposed Order, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google, Inc.. (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Expert Designations Pursuant to Order for Pretrial Preparation re [81], filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/17/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Settlement Conference, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/16/2010) Modified on 2/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED STIPULATION and Proposed Protective Order, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010 Order on Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE [85] Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:08-cv-04144-SBA. A Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 03/04/10 at 3:15 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010) Modified on 2/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/5/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2010 03:15 PM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [92] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Scott T. Weingaertner (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [93] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Susan Kim (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [94] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Allison Altersohn (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [90] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mark H. Francis (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [91] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Miller (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Allison Altersohn ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004730.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Susan Kim ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004730.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Scott T. Weingaertner ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004730.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Miller ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004730.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Mark H. Francis ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004730.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Robert F. Perry, filed by Google Inc. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/27/2010) Modified on 1/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER: That Attorney Timothy Tully Scott, Leo Spooner for Google Inc., Timothy Tully Scott, Geoffrey M. Ezgar, Leo Spooner for Google Inc. added and Attorney Shelley Kay Mack; David James Miclean; Howard Glenn Pollack; Jason W. Wolff; Juanita R. Brooks and Robert John Kent, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 01/21/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010, Terminated: 1/21/2010 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Substitute Attorney and Proposed Order Approving Substitution, filed by Google Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified on 1/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: 1/6/2010 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Proposed Order re [85] Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 1/6/2010) Modified on 1/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: 1/6/2010, Terminated: 2/3/2010 Motion to consolidate cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 1/6/2010) Modified on 1/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Order on Motion to Relate CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [83] Motion to Relate Case: C-09-5718-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009) Modified on 12/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009, Terminated: 12/28/2009 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Relate Case and Consolidate: C-09-5718-CRB, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order and Stipulation)(Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 12/17/2009) Modified on 12/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Seth M. Sproul as Counsel, filed by Google Inc. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 11/18/2009) Modified on 7/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/18/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Order Setting Settlement Conference.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Settlement Conference set for 8/3/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/16/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/12/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Settlement (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 terminate hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 11/12/2009 before Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 11/12/2009), Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 11/12/2009 before Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 11/12/2009), Further Case Management Conference held on 11/12/2009 before Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 11/12/2009), Scheduling Conference held on 11/12/2009 before Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 11/12/2009). 7 Day Jury Trial set for 11/1/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Fact Discovery cutoff 3/30/2010; Expert Discovery Cutoff 5/17/2010. Plaintiff name experts by 4/15/2010; Defendant name experts by 4/30/2010. Dispositive Motion hearing cutoff date is 7/27/2010 at 1:00pm. Pretria Papers due 9/21/2010. Motions in Limine filed 9/28/2010; responses to Motions in Limine by 10/5/2010. Referred to Magistrate for Mandatory Settlement Conference to be held in August 2010. Parties agree to private mediation.(Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [76] Objection to Use of 386 Prosecution History During Claim Construction by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Kent, Robert) (Filed on 11/10/2009) Modified on 11/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to Google's Use of the '386 Patent's Prosecution History in its Claim Construction Presentation by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [74] Joint Motion regarding equipment for tutorial and claim construction hearing on 11/12/09. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified on 11/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009, Terminated: 11/9/2009 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION and Proposed Order re Equipment for Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 11/4/2009) Modified on 11/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 11/2/2009) Modified on 11/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re Additional Agreed-Upon Claim Constructions as to [33] Claim Construction Statement filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Jt. Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Amended))(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 10/28/2009) Modified on 10/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Christina D. Jordan as Counsel, filed by Google Inc. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 10/6/2009) Modified on 10/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Robert John Kent, Jr., filed by Google Inc. (Kent, Robert) (Filed on 10/6/2009) Modified on 10/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Howard Glenn Pollack, filed by Google Inc. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 10/6/2009) Modified on 10/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement of Recent Decision, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 9/30/2009) Modified on 10/1/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [56] Motion to Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of David J. Miclean in Support Thereof (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009) Modified on 9/24/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Jayesh R. Bhakta in Support of [62] Reply Memorandum in Support of Claim Construction Brief filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[62]) (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 9/22/2009) Modified on 9/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of [62] Reply Memorandum in Support of Claim Construction Brief filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[62]) (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 9/22/2009) Modified on 9/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Memorandum re Claim Construction Brief filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 9/22/2009) Modified on 9/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration in Support of [66] Brief: Claim Construction filed byGoogle Inc.. ***FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT [65]*** (Related document(s)[66]) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF: Claim Construction filed byGoogle Inc.. ***FILED UNDER SEAL BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT [65]*** (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re [52] Statement, [58] Proposed Order, [57] Declaration in Support, [55] Proposed Order, [60] Notice, [53] Declaration in Support, [59] Certificate of Service, [54] Exhibits, [51] Claim Construction Statement, [56] Motion to Seal Document Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 To Declaration of David J. Miclean In Support Thereof (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING re Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of David J. Miclean In Support Thereof filed by Google Inc. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re [52] Statement, [58] Proposed Order, [57] Declaration in Support, [55] Proposed Order, [53] Declaration in Support, [54] Exhibits, [51] Claim Construction Statement, [56] Motion to Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 To Declaration of David J. Miclean In Support Thereof (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re [56] Motion to Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 To Declaration of David J. Miclean In Support Thereof filed by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of David J. Miclean in Support of [56] Motion to Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 To Declaration of David J. Miclean In Support Thereof filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s)[56]) (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009, Terminated: 9/23/2009 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 2 To Declaration of David J. Miclean In Support Thereof, filed by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re [51] Claim Construction Statement filed by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS 3-6 re [53] Declaration of David J. Miclean in Support, filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 4, # (2) Exhibit 5, # (3) Exhibit 6)(Related document(s)[53]) Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4 (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of David J. Miclean in Support of [51] Claim Construction Statement (REDACTED VERSION), filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Related document(s)[51]) (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix 1 to [51] Claim Construction Statement, filed by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT (RESPONSIVE) - REDACTED VERSION filed by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/18/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED STIPULATION and Proposed Protective Order, by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 8/17/2009) Modified on 8/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER: That the Pruetz Law Group LLP and Lee Tran & Liang APLC will serve as counsel for Netlist, Inc., in place of Morrison & Foerster LLP. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 08/10/09. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change In Counsel and Proposed Order, filed by Netlist, Inc., (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 8/3/2009) Modified on 8/4/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER Confirming Deposition Dates of Jayesh Bhakta and Jeffrey Solomon. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/31/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Adrian M. Pruetz in Support of [44] Brief: Opening Claim Construction filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Related document(s)[44]) (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 7/28/2009) Modified on 7/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief: Opening Claim Construction, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 7/28/2009) Modified on 7/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and Proposed Order Confirming Deposition Dates of Jayesh Bhakta and Jeffrey Solomon, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Jordan, Christina) (Filed on 7/28/2009) Modified on 7/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Adrian Mary Pruetz, filed by Netlist, Inc. (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 7/27/2009) Modified on 7/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Erica Jean Pruetz, filed by Netlist, Inc. (Pruetz, Erica) (Filed on 7/27/2009) Modified on 7/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero in response to Plaintiff's letter of 07/21/09, from Daniel A. Zlatnik, dated 07/24/09 (Zlatnik, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2009) Modified on 7/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re Scheduling Deposition, from Christina D. Jordan, dated 07/21/09. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O)(Jordan, Christina) (Filed on 7/21/2009) Modified on 7/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT INSPECTION PROTOCOL AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 06/25/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re Joint Inspection Protocol, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Jordan, Christina) (Filed on 6/24/2009) Modified on 6/25/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 discovery hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 6/19/2009 before Joseph C. Spero re: docket no. 34 on protocol for inspection of a Google server. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER: Dimissing Count of Contributory Infrigement Without Prejudice, signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/15/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009) Modified on 6/16/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re Discovery Dispute (Production Server), from L. Scott Oliver and Christina Jordan, dated 06/12/09. (Oliver, Larry) (Filed on 6/12/2009) Modified on 6/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit B-1, # (4) Exhibit B-2)(Miclean, David) (Filed on 6/12/2009) Modified on 6/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and Proposed Order Dismissing Count of Contributory Infringement Without Prejudice, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Jordan, Christina) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified on 6/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING re [27] Joint Letter Brief Re: Netlist's Request for production No. 12 filed by Netlist, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/29/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Case Management Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 5/29/2009 before Joseph C. Spero re: Joint letter brief, docket no. 27. Parties to meet and confer and submit a joint letter brief or proposed form or order regarding the protocol for inspection of a server by 6/12/9. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE that the telephonic discovery hearing prev. set for 5/29/2009 at 9:30 AM has been ADVANCED TO THE SAME DAY, at 09:00 AM. The Court will initiate the phone contact. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: re [29] Discovery Hearing set for 5/29/2009 09:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/26/2009 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE that a telephonic discovery hearing has been set for 5/29/2009 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re: Joint Discovery Letter. Court to initiate the phone contact. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re Discovery Dispute (Production Server), from Counsel for Netlist and Google, dated 05/19/09 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Oliver, Larry) (Filed on 5/19/2009) Modified on 5/20/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: 4/27/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, on 4/27/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009) Modified on 4/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: 4/27/2009 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, on 4/27/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009) Modified on 4/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for all Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/23/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: 4/22/2009 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulated and Proposed Protective Order, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 4/22/2009) Modified on 4/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/12/2009 09:00 AM. Claims Construction Discovery due by 7/20/2009.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/19/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/18/2009 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Claim Construction Hearing CONTINUED to 11/12/09 at 9:00 AM (Date Filed: 2/18/2009). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/18/2009) Modified on 2/20/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings: re [22] Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2009 09:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Hearings: re [21] Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/12/2009 09:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2009 03:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: 2/2/2009 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 2/2/2009) Modified on 2/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2009 03:15 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/17/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 12/12/2008) Modified on 12/15/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 answer to counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply to Counterclaim by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 12/8/2008) Modified on 12/9/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Google Inc. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Modified on 12/8/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Netlist, Inc. (Oliver, Larry) (Filed on 11/20/2008) Modified on 11/21/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES: Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2009 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/20/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008) Modified on 11/20/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Netlist, Inc. (Oliver, Larry) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Netlist's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs byNetlist, Inc.. (Oliver, Larry) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: 11/13/2008 Patent/Trademark report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT on the filing of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/3/2008 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Maria Elena James on 11/3/08. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re [6] Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment (Miclean, David) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Clerk's Notice of Impending ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/29/2008 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google Inc.. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/29/2008 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. of Summons and Complaint (Miclean, David) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2008. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/29/08. (Attachments: # (1) Judge Standing Order, # (2) Court Standing Order, # (3) Consent/Decline Form)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. re [1] Complaint (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT /issued summons against Netlist, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611003825.). Filed byGoogle Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2008: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4) (ga, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2008: # (5) Summons Issued) (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 282 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?