Lowy v. American National Insurance Company

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-01857
District Judge Frederic Block, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Frederic Block
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Joel Lowy, Plaintiff

Represented by Lipsius-BenHaim Law, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheryl Deborah Lipsius +1 212 981 8440 +1 888 442 0284 clipsius@lipsiuslaw.com
v.
No Logo American National Insurance Company, Defendant

Represented by Greer, Herz & Adams, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Carl Windsor +1 409 797 3200 +1 409 766 6424 swindsor@greerherz.com

Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Timeline
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER ORDER granting 13 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Conference adjourned to 10/29/12 @ 2:30 PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/2/2012. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by American National Insurance Company. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 11 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Conference adjourned to 10/4/12 @ 12:00 PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/18/2012. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by American National Insurance Company. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 5/31/2012. Discovery schedule set: Mandatory disclosures due 6/8/12. Document requests and interrogatories by 6/29/12 - responses 7/31/12. Conference set for 8/9/12 @ 10:30 AM. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by American National Insurance Company (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Windsor on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Windsor, Steven) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by American National Insurance Company. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear. (COUNSEL NEEDS TO FILE A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/14/2012. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven Carl Windsor Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-5479496. by American National Insurance Company. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference has been scheduled in the above-captioned case on MAY 31, 2012 at 10:00 AM, before the Honorable Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/20/2012. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer 5/17/12. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/18/2012. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American National Insurance Company. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Kings County by American National Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 350) Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no, (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 71 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?