JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01121-BAH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 27, 2016 at 7:41 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Judicial Watch, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Judicial Watch, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Bekesha +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 mbekesha@judicialwatch.org
Space Paul J. Orfanedes +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 porfanedes@judicialwatch.org
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Decklin Leary +1 202 514 3313 +1 202 616 8470 peter.leary@usdoj.gov
Space Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 11 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and 14 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 12, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 14 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for further details. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 12, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Judson Owen Littleton on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Peter D. Leary (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
        REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law (with Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts)Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law (with Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
          Memorandum in opposition to re 14 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law (with Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts)Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law (with Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Leary, Peter) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
            REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Leary, Peter) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
              SEALED Exhibit B re MINUTE Order on Motion for Order. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                RESPONSE re 15 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Refile a Document Under Seal filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Refile a Document Under Seal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leary, Peter) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                    Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law (with Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Bekesha with Exhibits (Part 1)(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) , # 2 Declaration of Michael Bekesha with Exhibits (Part 2), # 3 Declaration of Patrick S. Poole with Exhibits, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified on 4/5/2012 (zrdj). (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                      Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (with Response to Defendant's Statement of Material Facts) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Bekesha with Exhibits (Part 1)(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), # 2 Declaration of Michael Bekesha with Exhibits (Part 2), # 3 Declaration of Patrick S. Poole with Exhibits, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified on 4/5/2012 (zrdj). (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Leary, Peter) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                            STATUS REPORT (Joint) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC., U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Proposed Production Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leary, Peter) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC., U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Leary, Peter) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Decklin Leary on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Leary, Peter) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/21/11., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/20/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2011. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 20, 2011. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                            LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. identifying Corporate Parent NONE for JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (rdj) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 23 Filed: 10/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 11 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and 14 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 12, 2012. (lcbah1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?