Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Mojang AB
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00470
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 7:04 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

v.
No Logo Mojang Ab, Defendant

Represented by Erise IP, PA

Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jaime Kate Olin; Barry Bumgardner and Steven Wayne Hartsell terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER STAYING CASE. This matter is hereby STAYED pending further motion of any party demonstrating good cause to lift the stay. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close the case, and this action is hereby stayed pending further order of the Court. All pending motions are denied as moot without prejudice to re-filing once the stay is lifted. Any party may request the Court lift the stay for good cause, and the Court will do so only upon a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/06/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 19 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv462 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. A uniform Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order shall govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and, if necessary, file objections to the previously agreed to Docket Control and Discovery Orders filed in the lead case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-04-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Mojang AB (PR 3-4(a)) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Mojang AB (PR 3-3 and 3-4(b)) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Mojang AB (PR 3-1 and 3-2) (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 2/1/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 38 Filed: 1/21/2013, Entered: None
                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 19 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2013)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/17/13. cc:attys 1-17-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding E-Discovery by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 35 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Mojang AB. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 30 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Markman Hearing set for 1-30-2014 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/14/12. cc:attys 12-18-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 21 Joint Motion to modify briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/2012. (gsg) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2014. Jury Selection set for 5/4/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Mediation Completion due by 7/26/2013. Markman Hearing set for 1/20/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. David Folsom added as mediator. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/7/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  DISCOVERY ORDER entered. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/7/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE by Mojang AB OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time. The Deadline to Submit Discovery Order and Docket Control Order is extended to 12-05-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/12. cc:attys 11-28-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File DISCOVERY ORDER and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Mojang AB, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 11/14/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Mojang AB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 11/14/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/17/12. cc:attys 10-18-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Mojang AB on 9/27/2012, by personal service through the Hague Convention. (Attachments: # 1 Summons/Complaint)(mll, ) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mojang AB identifying Corporate Parent None for Mojang AB. (Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Mojang AB.(Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Caroline A Bader for Mojang AB. (pkb, ) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric A Buresh for Mojang AB. (pkb, ) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Megan J Redmond for Mojang AB. (pkb, ) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft has to 10-15-2012 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/12. cc:attys 8-22-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Mojang AB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mojang AB, filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US Patent No. 6,857,067)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Mojang AB, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Mojang AB ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3690266.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,857,067)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 513 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?