Unknown

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00643
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 4:48 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Abarta LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Spangler & Fussell PC

v.
No Logo Invensys Systems, Inc., Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss as to defendant Invensys Systems Inc.. All claims are dismissed with prejudice. Attorneys'fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/22/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss "Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice" by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Invensys Systems Inc identifying Corporate Parent Siebe, Inc. for Invensys Systems Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Abarta LLC by Invensys Systems Inc.(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abarta LLC. Invensys Systems Inc served on 10/30/2012, answer due 12/21/2012. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Invensys Systems Inc.( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of Abarta LLC (Fussell, James) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Abarta LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE for Pretrial proceedings to Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/11/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Invensys Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3822105.), filed by Abarta, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,224,326, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 81 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?