In re Santa Cruz Operation, Inc., Serial No. 73737625
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 73737625-EXA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

The Santa Cruz Operation, Inc. The Santa Cruz Operation, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Santa Cruz Operation, Inc., The"

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin R. Greenstein, Esq.
Type Ex Parte Appeal
Status Code 9
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 1/5/1991, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 10/19/1990, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed For Failure To File Abried
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 5/31/1990, Entered: None N
      Returned To Pending
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 5/31/1990, Entered: None X
        Proceedings Resumed
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 4/13/1990, Entered: None X
          Remanded To Examiner
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 3/22/1990, Entered: None T
            Amendment
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 3/2/1990, Entered: None T
              Appellant's Pet. For Susp. & Restoration
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 2/16/1990, Entered: None X
                Appeal To Board
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 27 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?