In re Trump's Castle Associates, Serial No. 74248306
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 74248306-EXA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Trump's Castle Associates"

Toggle Switch Represented by Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W.m. Webner
Type Ex Parte Appeal
Status Code 9
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 9/29/1994, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 6/27/1994, Entered: None D
    Board's Decision: Affirmed
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 12/8/1993, Entered: None E
      Pending (awaiting Decision)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 11/23/1993, Entered: None T
        Oral Hearing Scheduled For 12-08-93
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: None T
          Request For Oral Hearing
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 10/21/1993, Entered: None T
            Reply Brief
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 10/1/1993, Entered: None T
              Examiner's Statement
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 8/5/1993, Entered: None T
                Pending, Instituted
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/5/1993, Entered: None T
                  To Examiner For Statement
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 6/4/1993, Entered: None T
                    Appeal Brief
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/4/1993, Entered: None T
                      Appeal To Board
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 16 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?