The B. Manischewitz Co. Llc v. Tequila Cuervo La Rojena. S.a. De C.v.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 76015077-EXT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Tequila Cuervo La Rojena, S. A. De C. V., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Abelman Frayne & Schwab

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence E. Abelman dbernstein@lawabel.com
No Logo The B. Manischewitz Company, LLC, Potential Opposer
Officially listed as "The B. Manischewitz Co. LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin J. Beran roneill@ostrolenk.com
Type Extension of Time
Date in Location 26-FEB-03
Status Code 9
Location Code 849
Charge to Location Code 85R
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None T
    Progress Letter
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None T
      Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: None T
        Extension Of Time Granted
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: None T
          Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None T
            Extension Of Time Granted
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: None T
              Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None T
                Extension Of Time Granted
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: None T
                  Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None T
                    Extension Of Time Granted
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: None T
                      Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: None T
                        Extension Of Time Granted
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: None T
                          Extension Of Time To Oppose Filed
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 8 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?