Green Bay Packers, Inc., And Nfl v. Game Cave
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 76020756-EXT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Game Cave, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley H. Ellis +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 bellis@sidley.com
No Logo Green Bay Packers, Inc., And Nfl, Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by NFL Properties LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anastasia T. Danias
Type Extension of Time
Date in Location 03-OCT-03
Status Code 9
Location Code 657
Charge to Location Code 85M
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None N
Abandoned After Publication
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None T
    Express Abandonment Of Application
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None T
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None T
        Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None T
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None T
            Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
              LREF
              Blank 20 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: None T
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 19 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None T
                Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                  LREF
                  Blank 18 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: None T
                  Extension Of Time Granted
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: None T
                    Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: None T
                      Extension Of Time Granted
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None T
                        Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: None T
                          Extension Of Time Granted
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: None T
                            Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: None T
                              Extension Of Time Granted
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: None T
                                Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: None T
                                  Extension Of Time Granted
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: None T
                                    Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None T
                                      Extension Of Time Granted
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: None T
                                        Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: None T
                                          Extension Of Time Granted
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None T
                                            Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: None T
                                              Extension Of Time Granted
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: None T
                                                Extension Of Time To Oppose Filed
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None T
                                                  Extension Of Time Granted
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None T
                                                    Extension Of Time To Oppose Filed
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?