The B. Manischewitz Company, Llc v. Loh Enterprises, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 76255594-EXT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Loh Enterprises, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill & Hunn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MELVIN A. HUNN +1 817 332 2113
No Logo The B. Manischewitz Company, LLC, Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin J. Beran roneill@ostrolenk.com
Type Extension of Time
Date in Location 23-JUN-03
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
Charge to Location Code 85R
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: None T
    Extension Of Time Granted
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None T
      Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None T
        Extension Of Time Granted
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: None T
          Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: None T
            Extension Of Time Granted
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: None T
              Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 17 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?