Think Computer Corporation v. Think Schuhwerk Gmbh, et al
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 77408045-EXT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo United Business Media LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan L. Heller latm2@gtlaw.com
Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
No Logo Think Schuhwerk GmbH, Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Moore & Van Allen, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen A. Rubel EAR-PTOTMCorrespondence@mvalaw.com
Type Extension of Time
Date in Location 06-MAY-09
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None T
Extension Of Time Granted
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None T
    Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None T
      Response Re Relationship Due (due Date)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None T
        Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None T
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None T
            Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None T
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None T
                Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 600 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?