Think Computer Corporation v. Marko Schuhfabrik Gmbh, et al
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 77408575-EXT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo United Business Media LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan L. Heller latm2@gtlaw.com
No Logo Marko Schuhfabrik GmbH, Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Moore & Van Allen, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen A. Rubel EAR-PTOTMCorrespondence@mvalaw.com
Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
Type Extension of Time
Date in Location 14-MAY-09
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None N
Delete Entry
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None N
    Extension Denied
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None T
      Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None T
        Extension Of Time Granted
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None T
          Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None T
            Extension Of Time Granted
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None T
              Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None T
                Extension Of Time Granted
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None T
                  Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None T
                    Extension Of Time Granted
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None T
                      Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 623 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?