Think Computer Corporation v. The Big Think, Inc., et al
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 77408601-EXT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo United Business Media LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan L. Heller latm2@gtlaw.com
No Logo The Big Think, Inc., Potential Opposer

Represented by Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
Type Extension of Time
Date in Location 19-MAR-09
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None N
    Extension Denied
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None T
      Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None N
        Terminated
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None T
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None T
            Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None T
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None T
                Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None T
                  Extension Of Time Granted
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None T
                    Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 586 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?