Lenovo (singapore) Pte. Ltd. v. Think Computer Corporation
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 77878254-EXT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
Lenovo (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. Lenovo (Singapore) Pte. Ltd., Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Ference & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley D. Ference, III +1 412 741 8400 +1 412 741 9292 courts@ferencelaw.com
Type Extension of Time
Date in Location 28-JUL-10
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None N
Board's Communication
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None T
    Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None T
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None T
        Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None T
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None T
            Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None T
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None T
                Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 596 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?