Think Computer Corporation v. Facebook, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 77896317-EXT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Harris Peck +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 857 0663 peckah@cooley.com
Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
Type Extension of Time
Date in Location 19-JUL-10
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None N
    Extension Denied
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None T
      Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None T
        Extension Of Time Granted
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 7/18/2010, Entered: None T
          Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None T
            Extension Of Time Granted
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None T
              Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 668 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?