USA v. Coleman
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:07-cr-03246-DMS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell D Dembin +1 619 557 5558 +1 619 557 7381 Mitch.Dembin@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Benjamin Leon Coleman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randy Scott Grossman +1 619 595 5400 +1 619 595 5450 rgrossman@mckennalong.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Diego
Filed 12/13/2007
County San Diego
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-10
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 - False statements on Loan Applications
Count 11
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 408.F
Offense Level 4
42408(a)(7)(B) - False Use of Social Security Account Number
Count 12
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028A (a) (1) - Aggravated Identity Theft
Count 13-14
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201 - Income Tax Evasion
Def Custody Status
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Granting [25] Joint Motion by Defendant Benjamin Leon Coleman and Plaintiff United States of America to Continue Sentencing Hearing.(Sentence With Probation Office Report continued to 11/7/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.) Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/13/08. (lao) (av1).
    LREF
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008, Terminated: 8/13/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Joint MOTION By Defendant Benjamin Leon Coleman and Plaintiff United States of America to Continue Sentencing Hearing by Benjamin Leon Coleman. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Grossman, Randy) (joeh).
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
      SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTION TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by Benjamin Leon Coleman (Supplemental) (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Grossman, Randy) Modified text on 8/13/2008 to include supplemental (lao). supplemental documents require leave of court
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER Granting [22] Joint Motion by Defendant Benjamin Leon Coleman and Plaintiff United States of America to Continue Sentencing Hearing. (Sentence With Probation Office Report continued to 8/29/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.) Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/30/08. (lao)(kaj).
          LREF
          Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008, Terminated: 6/2/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          Joint MOTION By Defendant Benjamin Leon Coleman And Plaintiff United States Of America To Continue Sentencing Hearing by Benjamin Leon Coleman. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Grossman, Randy) (lao).
            LREF
            Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
            ORDER Granting Joint Motion by Defendant Benjamin Leon Coleman and Plaintiff United States of America to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release re [20] Motion as to Benjamin Leon Coleman (1). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/14/08. (lao) (kaj).
              LREF
              Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008, Terminated: 4/14/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              Joint MOTION BY DEFENDANT BENJAMIN LEON COLEMAN AND PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE by Benjamin Leon Coleman. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Grossman, Randy) (lao). Contacted Attny re capitalizing text
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT (Initial Appearance) of Proceedings as to Benjamin Leon Coleman held on 12/13/2007 before Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Court Reporter: Echo Reporting. (leh)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference as to Benjamin Leon Coleman held on 3/21/2008. Court accepts plea previously tendered by magistrate judge - Guilty Counts 1-14. Sentence With Probation Office Report set for 6/20/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Re Defense oral request to expand travel conditions - Defense counsel may submit a joint motion and order if Pretrial Services and the government is in agreement with the modification. (Court Reporter LeeAnn Pence).(Plaintiff Attorney AUSA Mitchell D Dembin).(Defendant Attorney Randy S Grossman RET). (jak)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER re Substitution of Attorney as to Benjamin Leon Coleman. Added attorney Randy S. Grossman for Benjamin Leon Coleman. Attorney Roger Agajanian terminated in case as to Benjamin Leon Coleman. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/29/08. (lao) (av1, ).
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Accept Plea with P.O. ReportCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Accept Plea/Sentencing hearing held. Substitution of Attorney filed substituting Randy Grossman in place of Roger Agajanian. Status Conference set for 3/21/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court finds excludable time until next hearing (XT). (Court Reporter LeeAnn Pence).(Plaintiff Attorney AUSA Mitchell Dembin).(Defendant Attorney Roger Agajanian RET, Randy Grossman RET). (jak)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Sentencing Summary Chart
                      SENTENCING SUMMARY CHART by USA as to Benjamin Leon Coleman (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Dembin, Mitchell) (lao).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Notice of Noncompliance
                        NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.4(a) Mandatory Electronic Filing re [13]. (lao) (av1, ).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                          OBJECTIONS TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by Benjamin Leon Coleman (lao) (av1, ).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Mail Returned
                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable re [6] Findings and Recommendation, [4] Order Setting Conditions of Release Mail sent to Roger Agajanian Law Offices of Roger Agajanian 123 Mesa Vista Road Grand Junction, CO 81503 (lao)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                              MODIFIED ORDER Setting Conditions of Release; Bond set for Benjamin Leon Coleman (1) $30,000 P/S secured by deft and one(1) FRA. Signed by Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/20/07. (lao) Modified text on 12/21/2007 (lao).
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major:Bond Hearing as to Benjamin Leon Coleman held on 12/20/2007. Court calls, swears and examines proposed surety Doddie Giles. Surety Doddie Giles does not object to defendant traveling to the Central District of California to attendant a funeral. Court approves surety Doddie Giles. Court further orders modifying the defendants conditions of release to include travel to the Central and Southern Districts of California. (Court Reporter BLM07-10:18 to 10:29)(Plaintiff Attorney Michelle Pettit, AUSA)(Defendant Attorney Roger Agajanian, Ret.) (gep)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Mitchell D Dembin appearing for USA. (Dembin, Mitchell) (lao).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                    Findings and Recommendation as to Benjamin Leon Coleman: Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. Objection must be filed within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/13/07. (lao) (bar ).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Plea Agreement
                                      PLEA AGREEMENT as to Benjamin Leon Coleman (lao)(bar ).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Consent to PleaCourt Filing
                                        Consent to Rule 11 Plea in a Felony Case before United States Magistrate Judge as to Benjamin Leon Coleman. (lao)(bar).
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Abstract of OrderCourt Filing
                                          ABSTRACT OF ORDER releasing Benjamin Leon Coleman. Signed by Judge Barbara L Major on 12/13/07. (lao)(bar).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                            ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Bond set for Benjamin Leon Coleman (1) $30,000 P/S secured by deft and one(1) FRA. Signed by Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/13/07. (lao)(bar ).
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major :Initial Appearance as to Benjamin Leon Coleman held on 12/13/2007. Arraignment as to Benjamin Leon Coleman (1) Count 1-10,11,12,13-14 held on 12/13/2007. Change of Plea Hearing as to Benjamin Leon Coleman held on 12/13/2007. Plea tendered by Benjamin Leon Coleman(1) Guilty on counts one(1), two(2), three(3), four(4), five(5), six(6), seven(7), eight(8), nine(9), ten(10), eleven(11), twelve(12), thirteen(13) and fourteen(14). Excludable started as to Benjamin Leon Coleman: XT-Interest of Justice 12/13/07-02/29/08. Refer to US Probation for Presentencing Report. Added attorney Roger Agajanian for Benjamin Leon Coleman. Bond set as to Benjamin Leon Coleman (1) $30,000 P/S secured by deft and one(1) FRA; deft must surrender all identification documents in names other than Benjamin Leon Coleman; a Nebbia/Examination of Sureties is required; signature of FRA must be filed by 12/20/07. Bond Hearing has been set for 12/20/07 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge Barbara L. Major. Accept Plea with P.O. Report set for 2/29/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (Tape #BLM07-1:2137-6244).(Plaintiff Attorney Mitchell Dembin, AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Roger Agajanian). (PTS: Monique Arthur).
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Waiver of Indictment
                                                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Benjamin Leon Coleman. (cap)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Information - Felony
                                                  INFORMATION as to Benjamin Leon Coleman (1) count(s) 1-10, 11, 12, 13-14. (cap)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 238 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?