Ascential Software Corporation v. Iteration Software, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 78141316-EXT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Iteration Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgess & Bereznak LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caitlin R. Burgess
No Logo Ascential Software Corporation, Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder shudson@foleyhoag.com
Type Extension of Time
Date in Location 10-MAR-04
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None N
Abandoned After Publication
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None T
    Express Abandonment Of Application
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None N
      Terminated
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None N
        Abandoned After Publication
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None T
          Express Abandonment Of Application
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None T
            Extension Of Time Granted
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: None T
              Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None T
                Extension Of Time Granted
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: None T
                  Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None T
                    Extension Of Time Granted
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: None T
                      Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: None T
                        Extension Of Time Granted
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None T
                          Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: None T
                            Extension Of Time Granted
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None T
                              Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 31 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?