Facebook, Inc. v. Think Computer Corporation
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91198355-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gretchen R. Stroud +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 857 0663 trademarks@cooley.com
v.
Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney CHERYL ABUTLER
Date in Location 26-JAN-11
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (18) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 64 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None T
Bd Decision: Sustained
    LREF
    Blank 63 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None T
    Oral Hearing Appearance Record
      LREF
      Blank 62 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None T
      Oral Hearing Appearance Record
        LREF
        Blank 61 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None T
        Oral Hearing Scheduled
          LREF
          Blank 60 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None T
          Oral Hearing Scheduled
            LREF
            Blank 59 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None T
            Board's Order
              LREF
              Blank 58 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None T
              P's Request For Oral Hearing
                LREF
                Blank 57 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None T
                Paper Received At Ttab
                  LREF
                  Blank 56 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None N
                  Final Brief On Merits For Defendant(s)
                    LREF
                    Blank 55 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None N
                    Final Brief On Merits For Defendant(s)
                      LREF
                      Blank 54 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None T
                      Confidential Defendant's Supporting Evidents/exhibits
                        LREF
                        Blank 53 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None T
                        P's Opposition/response To Motion
                          LREF
                          Blank 52 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None T
                          Brief On Merits For Plaintiff
                            LREF
                            Blank 51 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None T
                            Paper Received At Ttab
                              LREF
                              Blank 50 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None T
                              Paper Received At Ttab
                                LREF
                                Blank 49 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                Testimony For Plaintiff
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 48 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None T
                                  Confidential Testimony For Plaintiff
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 47 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None T
                                    Confidential Testimony For Plaintiff
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 46 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None T
                                      Confidential Brief On Merits For Plaintiff
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 45 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                        Testimony For Plaintiff
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 44 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                          Testimony For Plaintiff
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 43 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                            Testimony For Plaintiff
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 42 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                              Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 41 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                  Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                    Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                      Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None T
                                                        Confidential Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None T
                                                          Confidential Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None T
                                                            Confidential Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                              Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                  Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                    Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                      Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                        Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                          Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                            Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                              Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                  Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None T
                                                                                    Dates Remain As Previously Set
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None T
                                                                                      P's Opposition/response To Motion
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                        Defendant's Notice Of Reliance
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                          Defendant's Notice Of Reliance
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                            Defendant's Notice Of Reliance
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None M
                                                                                              D's Motion For Sanctions
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                                Plaintiff's Notice Of Reliance
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Notice Of Reliance
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Notice Of Reliance
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Notice Of Reliance
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Notice Of Reliance
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Notice Of Reliance
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Notice Of Reliance
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None N
                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Notice Of Reliance
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None T
                                                                                                                P's Notice Of Expert Disclosure
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None T
                                                                                                                  Dates Remain As Previously Set
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None T
                                                                                                                    D's Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None T
                                                                                                                      Bd's Order Re Dicovery Conference
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None N
                                                                                                                        D Request For Discovery Conference-phone
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None N
                                                                                                                          Answer
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None T
                                                                                                                            Pending, Instituted
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None T
                                                                                                                              Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None N
                                                                                                                                Filed And Fee
                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 1,034 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?