The Timberland Company v. Paz Paramdeep Singh Dhody
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91198195-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo The Timberland Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry Currell Jones +1 704 444 1019 +1 704 444 1759 larry.jones@alston.com
v.
No Logo Paz Paramdeep Singh Dhody, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyertons, Hood, Kivlin, Kowert & Goetzel, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dwayne K. Goetzel +1 512 853 8800 dgoetzel@intprop.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney YONG OH (RICHARD)KIM
Date in Location 13-JAN-11
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None T
Board's Decision: Sustained
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None TCourt Filing
    P's Motion For Default Judgement
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None T
      Response Due 30 Days (due Date)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None T
        D's Request To Withdraw As Attorney
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None N
          Answer
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None T
            Pending, Instituted
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None T
              Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None N
                Filed And Fee
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 557 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?