Bullhead Control Systems, Llc And Billy R. Kirk v. Thunder Rose Enterprises, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91202810-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2017 at 8:10 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bullhead Control Systems, Llc And Billy R. Kirk, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aldi Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Rodney & Etter, LLC (New Orleans)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Karl Etter +1 504 483 3224 +1 504 483 2259 jke@rodneylaw.com
v.
No Logo Thunder Rose Enterprises, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aldi Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Rodney & Etter, LLC (New Orleans)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Karl Etter +1 504 483 3224 +1 504 483 2259 jke@rodneylaw.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ROBERTCOGGINS
Date in Location 02-DEC-11
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None T
Consolidated (child); Susp For Civ Action
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None T
    D's Reply In Support Of Motion
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None W
      P's Mot To Susp Pend Disp Civ Action
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None T
        Change Of Correspondence Address
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None T
          Change Of Correspondence Address
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None T
            D's Motion To Dismiss; Tm Rule2.132(a)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None N
              Answer
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None T
                Pending, Instituted
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None T
                  Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None N
                    Filed And Fee
                      LREF

                      Space Space

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 4,210 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?