St. Louis Cardinals Llc v. Negro Leagues Baseball Museum, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91162503-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo St. Louis Cardinals, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowan Liebowitz & Latman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trademark Docketing trademark@cll.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 212 790 9200 mel@cll.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jmn@cll.com
v.
No Logo Negro Leagues Baseball Museum, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Space Select Brands Inc tmdocketing.elbein@hoveywilliams.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jcrawford@hoveywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney MARY CATHERINEFAINT
Date in Location 10-MAY-06
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 40 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 39 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None T
    Paper Received At Ttab
      LREF
      Blank 38 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None T
      Trial Dates Reset
        LREF
        Blank 37 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None T
        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
          LREF
          Blank 36 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None T
          Trial Dates Reset
            LREF
            Blank 35 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None T
            P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
              LREF
              Blank 34 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None T
              Trial Dates Reset
                LREF
                Blank 33 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None T
                P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                  LREF
                  Blank 32 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None S
                  Suspended
                    LREF
                    Blank 31 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None S
                    Suspended
                      LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None W
                      P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None S
                        Suspended
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None W
                          P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None S
                            Suspended
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None W
                              P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None S
                                Suspended
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None W
                                  P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None T
                                    Change Of Correspondence Address
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None S
                                      Suspended
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None W
                                        P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 6/22/2008, Entered: None T
                                          Proceedings Remain Suspended
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None W
                                            P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None T
                                              Proceedings Remain Suspended
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 17 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None W
                                                P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None S
                                                  Suspended
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None W
                                                    P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None S
                                                      Suspended
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None W
                                                        P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None S
                                                          Suspended
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None W
                                                            P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: None S
                                                              Suspended
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: None W
                                                                P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: None X
                                                                  Proceedings Resumed
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None T
                                                                    Procs Susp 6 Mos
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None W
                                                                      P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None T
                                                                        Undeliverable Mail
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None N
                                                                          Answer
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None T
                                                                            Pending, Instituted
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None T
                                                                              Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None N
                                                                                Filed And Fee
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?