Think Computer Corporation v. Facebook, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 78980756-EXT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gretchen R. Stroud +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 857 0663 trademarks@cooley.com
Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
Type Extension of Time
Date in Location 19-JUL-10
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None N
Extension Denied
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None T
    Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None T
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 7/18/2010, Entered: None T
        Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None T
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None T
            Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 625 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?