Red.com, Inc. v. Red Hat, Inc., et al
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 79032154-EXT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Red Bee Media Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Red Bee Media Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacey R. Halpern stacey.halpern@kmob.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Madson & Austin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle W. Grimshaw pchestek@redhat.com
No Logo Red.com Inc., Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Weeks, Kaufman, Nelson & Johnson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janet Robertson Kaufman, Esq.
Type Extension of Time
Date in Location 18-MAR-09
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None T
Extension Of Time Granted
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None T
    Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None T
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None T
        Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None T
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None T
            Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None T
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None T
                Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None T
                  Extension Of Time Granted
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None T
                    Incoming - Ext Time To Oppose Filed
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 80 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?