Reliance Electric Company v. Steel Heddle Manufacturing Co.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91057348-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space
v.
No Logo Steel Heddle Manufacturing Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Steel Heddle Manufacturing Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space
Type Opposition
Status Code 9
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 3/25/1976, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 3/12/1976, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 1/5/1976, Entered: None N
      Answer
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 10/10/1975, Entered: None T
        Pending, Instituted
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 9/5/1975, Entered: None T
          Filed
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 13 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?