National Computer Systems, Inc. v. International Mobile Machines Corporatio N
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91068659-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Computer Systems, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space
v.
No Logo International Mobile Machines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "International Mobile Machines Corporatio N"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney THOMAS JQUINN
Date in Location 10-DEC-90
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 900
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 9/29/1986, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 7/16/1986, Entered: None T
    Cafc Decision: Affirmed 6/6/86 (issued As A Mandate 6/27/86)
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 10/22/1985, Entered: None T
      Appeal To Cafc Ack.
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 10/7/1985, Entered: None N
        Appeal To Cafc
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 8/12/1985, Entered: None T
          Board's Decision: Sustained
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 6/21/1985, Entered: None E
            Pending (awaiting Decision)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 6/21/1985, Entered: None T
              Submitted On Brief--awaiting Decision
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 5/13/1985, Entered: None T
                Rebuttal Brief
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 4/15/1985, Entered: None N
                  Final Brief On Merits For Defendant(s)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/1/1985, Entered: None T
                    Brief On Merits For Plaintiff
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/1/1985, Entered: None N
                      Testimony For Plaintiff
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 3/5/1985, Entered: None T
                        Substitution Of Party For Applicant
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 12/10/1984, Entered: None N
                          Defendant's Notice Of Reliance
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 11/21/1984, Entered: None N
                            Testimony For Plaintiff
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 11/1/1984, Entered: None T
                              Defendant's Opposition To Notice Of Reliance
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 10/31/1984, Entered: None N
                                Plaintiff's Notice Of Reliance
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/29/1984, Entered: None N
                                  Plaintiff's Notice Of Reliance
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/19/1984, Entered: None N
                                    Plaintiff's Notice Of Taking Testimony
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/17/1984, Entered: None N
                                      Plaintiff's Notice Of Taking Testimony
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/8/1984, Entered: None T
                                        Def's Consented Req. To Extend Approved
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 7/25/1984, Entered: None T
                                          D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/19/1984, Entered: None T
                                            Stipulated Protective Order Approved
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 6/19/1984, Entered: None P
                                              Stipulated Protective Order
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/31/1984, Entered: None T
                                                Trial Dates Set
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/29/1984, Entered: None N
                                                  Answer
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/6/1984, Entered: None T
                                                    Pending, Instituted
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1984, Entered: None T
                                                      Filed
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 72 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?