Spoons Restaurants, Inc. v. Classic Brands, Inc.

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91068908-OPP
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Spoons Restaurants, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of Patrick J. Kelvie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick J. Kelvie
v.
No Logo Classic Brands, Inc., Defendant
Attributes
Type Opposition
Date in Location 28-SEP-84
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 900
Timeline
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/28/1984, Entered: None N
Terminated
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/31/1984, Entered: None T
Board's Decision: Sustained
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/1984, Entered: None T
Notice Of Default
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/21/1984, Entered: None G
2(d) Confusion/mistake/deception W Mark
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/1984, Entered: None T
Pending, Instituted
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/3/1984, Entered: None E
Notice Sent; Answer Due (due Date)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/27/1984, Entered: None N
Filed And Fee
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 11 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?