National Computer Systems, Inc. v. International Mobile Machines Corporation
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91071670-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Computer Systems, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dorsey & Whitney Llp +1 714 800 1400
v.
No Logo International Mobile Machines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "International Mobile Machines Corporation"

Toggle Switch Represented by Trachtman, Jacobs & Beck

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Trachtman, Arthur A. Jacobs
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney GEORGE DHOHEIN
Date in Location 29-SEP-87
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 900
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 9/28/1987, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 9/1/1987, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Sustained
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 8/27/1986, Entered: None T
      Pl's Request To Resume Appr; Procs Resumed; Trial Dates Reset
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 6/30/1986, Entered: None T
        P's Request To Lift Suspension
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 12/1/1985, Entered: None T
          #8 Granted; Motion To Susp Granted; Procs Susp
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 10/23/1985, Entered: None T
            Plaintiff's Response To Reconsideration
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 10/7/1985, Entered: None T
              Reconsideration Re Suspension
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 9/19/1985, Entered: None T
                Trial Dates Set
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/19/1985, Entered: None T
                  T.a.c.t. Technology, Inc. Substituted For Defendant; Motion To Sus. Denied
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 8/22/1985, Entered: None T
                    Plaintiff's Response To #4
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 8/9/1985, Entered: None W
                      D's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negot W Cnst
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 7/25/1985, Entered: None T
                        Pending, Instituted
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/25/1985, Entered: None E
                          Notice Sent; Answer Due (due Date)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/31/1985, Entered: None N
                            Filed And Fee
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 32 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?