Vve Laurent-perrier & Co. Societe Anonyme v. Classic Brands, Inc.

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91072272-OPP
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Vve Laurent-perrier & Co. Societe Anonyme, Plaintiff

Represented by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle P. Schwartz
v.
No Logo Classic Brands, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Baker & Friedman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen L. Baker, Esq.
Attributes
Type Opposition
Date in Location 05-JUN-96
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 900
Timeline
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/5/1996, Entered: None N
Terminated
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/5/1996, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/24/1996, Entered: None T
Withdrawal Of Opp.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/27/1996, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/1/1995, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: None T
Party Def's Joined; Pl's Mot To Compel; Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/21/1994, Entered: None T
Def's Resp. To Pl's Motion To Compel
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: None T
Pl' Mot. To Compel & Mot. To Ext. Time
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/27/1994, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/22/1994, Entered: None T
Pl's Motion To Extend W/consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/25/1994, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/24/1994, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/29/1993, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/24/1993, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/29/1993, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/7/1993, Entered: None T
D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/17/1993, Entered: None T
Tdr Re: 66 Granted; Def's Req To Susp Denied As Moot
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/8/1993, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/7/1993, Entered: None T
Def's Req To Susp Proc
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/4/1993, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/8/1992, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: None W
D's Mot To Susp Pend Disp Civ Act W Cnst
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: None T
D's Motion For An Extension Of Time
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: None T
D's Motion For An Extension Of Time
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/29/1991, Entered: None T
D's Motion For An Extension Of Time
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/27/1991, Entered: None T
D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/2/1991, Entered: None T
D's Motion For An Extension Of Time
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/1/1991, Entered: None T
D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/30/1991, Entered: None T
Pl`s Con. To Mot. To Ext.time
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/16/1991, Entered: None T
D's Motion For An Extension Of Time
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/3/1991, Entered: None T
Procs Resumed; Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/31/1990, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/1/1990, Entered: None T
Pl's Mot To Suspend Proceedings W/con
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/19/1990, Entered: None T
P's Motion For An Extension Of Time
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/26/1990, Entered: None T
#47, Resent To Def.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/22/1990, Entered: None T
Undeliverable Mail - Defendant
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/1/1990, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/9/1990, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/11/1989, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/17/1989, Entered: None T
P's Motion For An Extension Of Time
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/13/1989, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/13/1989, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/9/1989, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/17/1989, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/12/1989, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/16/1989, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/18/1989, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/30/1989, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/13/1989, Entered: None T
D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/24/1989, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/14/1989, Entered: None T
D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/13/1989, Entered: None T
D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/15/1988, Entered: None N
Delete Entry
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/9/1988, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/26/1988, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/31/1988, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/22/1988, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/30/1988, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/17/1988, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/2/1988, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/7/1988, Entered: None T
Procs Resumed; Pl's Reply To Interrogs & Documents Due 4-29-88
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/22/1987, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/17/1987, Entered: None W
P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negot W Cnst
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/15/1987, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/13/1987, Entered: None W
P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negot W Cnst
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/19/1987, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/9/1987, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/6/1986, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/30/1986, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/1986, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/2/1986, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/7/1986, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/19/1986, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/9/1986, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/29/1986, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/8/1986, Entered: None T
D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/19/1986, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/12/1986, Entered: None T
D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/4/1985, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Set
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/16/1985, Entered: None N
Answer
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/9/1985, Entered: None T
Pending, Instituted
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/9/1985, Entered: None E
Notice Sent; Answer Due (due Date)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/6/1985, Entered: None N
Filed And Fee
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 18 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?