Reliance Electric Company v. Computer Terminal Systems, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91072940-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent F. Bick, Jr.
v.
No Logo Computer Terminal Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by P.c. & Israel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirschstein, Kirschstein, Ottinger
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney PAULA THAIRSTON
Date in Location 23-JUN-88
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 900
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 6/23/1988, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 5/13/1988, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 4/18/1988, Entered: None N
      Withdrawal Of Opposition
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 10/2/1987, Entered: None T
        Trial Dates Set
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 9/11/1987, Entered: None N
          Answer
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 8/28/1987, Entered: None T
            Answer Due (due Date)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 8/28/1987, Entered: None T
              Proceedings Resumed
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 5/26/1987, Entered: None T
                Response To Order
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/7/1987, Entered: None T
                  Response Re Bankruptcy Due 20 Days
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/8/1986, Entered: None T
                    Procs Susp Pend Bankruptcy
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/13/1986, Entered: None W
                      D's Mot To Susp Pend Disp Outstndng Mot
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/20/1986, Entered: None T
                        #4 Grtd; Mr Schiffmiller No Longer Repre Sents Def; Procs Susp Til 3-20-86
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/13/1986, Entered: None T
                          Defendant's Attorney Withdrawal
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/30/1985, Entered: None T
                            Pending, Instituted
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/30/1985, Entered: None E
                              Notice Sent; Answer Due (due Date)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/4/1985, Entered: None N
                                Filed And Fee
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?