Digital Equipment Corporation v. International Mobile Machines Corporatio N
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91079201-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Digital Equipment Corporation Digital Equipment Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Hayes Soloway, PC

v.
No Logo International Mobile Machines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "International Mobile Machines Corporatio N"

Toggle Switch Represented by International Mobile Machines, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven V. Abramson And H. Ward Classen
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney MARCBERGSMAN
Date in Location 08-AUG-91
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 900
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 8/8/1991, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 6/19/1991, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 5/31/1991, Entered: None T
      Amendment Of S.n.707561;w/stip. To Dismiss Opp.
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 3/15/1991, Entered: None T
        Motion To Amend Denied; Trial Dates Reset
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 2/5/1991, Entered: None T
          Stip To Dismiss With Prejudice And Mot To Amend
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 9/13/1990, Entered: None W
            Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 7/2/1990, Entered: None S
              Suspended
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 6/20/1990, Entered: None W
                Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 3/20/1990, Entered: None S
                  Suspended
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 3/5/1990, Entered: None W
                    P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negot W Cnst
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 7/26/1989, Entered: None T
                      P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 6/23/1989, Entered: None T
                        P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 2/21/1989, Entered: None T
                          Trial Dates Set
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/30/1989, Entered: None N
                            Answer
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/1989, Entered: None T
                              Answer Due (due Date)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/27/1988, Entered: None T
                                D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/21/1988, Entered: None T
                                  Pending, Instituted
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/21/1988, Entered: None E
                                    Notice Sent; Answer Due (due Date)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/28/1988, Entered: None T
                                      Filed And Fee
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?