Ivana Trump v. Pavion, Ltd.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91079446-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Trump, Ivana, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Ivana Trump"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosen, Dainow And Jacobs
v.
No Logo Pavion Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Myron Amer, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Myron Amer +1 516 670 9820 ma@myronamer.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney MARCBERGSMAN
Date in Location 31-AUG-92
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 900
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 8/31/1992, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: None T
    Sj Granted; Opp Sustained
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 1/17/1992, Entered: None T
      Pl's Mot To Vacate Suspension And To Grant Summary Judgment
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 11/9/1990, Entered: None T
        Pl's Status Report Re: C/a
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 11/2/1990, Entered: None T
          Parties Response Re Status C/a Due 11-23-90
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 10/4/1989, Entered: None S
            Suspended Pending Disp Of Civil Action
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 8/17/1989, Entered: None T
              Pl's Mot. For Suspension Pending C/a
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 7/24/1989, Entered: None W
                P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negot W Cnst
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/9/1989, Entered: None T
                  Trial Dates Reset
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/15/1989, Entered: None T
                    Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 3/28/1989, Entered: None T
                      Trial Dates Set
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/10/1989, Entered: None N
                        Answer
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/31/1989, Entered: None T
                          Pending, Instituted
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/31/1989, Entered: None E
                            Notice Sent; Answer Due (due Date)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/5/1988, Entered: None T
                              Opp In Dupl And Fee
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?