Reliance Electric Company v. Automotion Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91082977-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurel V. Dineff
v.
No Logo Automotion, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space
Type Opposition
Date in Location 22-JAN-92
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 900
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 1/22/1992, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 12/6/1991, Entered: None T
      Stip Abandonment Of 73/763,585
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 12/12/1991, Entered: None T
        Procs Resumed And Trial Dates Set
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 5/23/1991, Entered: None S
          Suspended
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 4/18/1991, Entered: None T
            Defs Mot To Suspend Proceedings With Consent
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 1/6/1991, Entered: None T
              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 12/28/1990, Entered: None T
                Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 9/6/1990, Entered: None T
                  Trial Dates Set
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/23/1990, Entered: None N
                    Answer
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/20/1990, Entered: None T
                      Pending, Instituted
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/20/1990, Entered: None E
                        Notice Sent; Answer Due (due Date)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/6/1990, Entered: None T
                          Letter
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/22/1990, Entered: None T
                            Letter
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/6/1990, Entered: None T
                              Letter
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/11/1990, Entered: None T
                                Filed & Fee
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?