'21' Club, Inc. v. Factoria 21
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91098292-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo "21" Club, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Timothyi Hobbs
v.
No Logo Factoria 21, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Factori 21
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney CHARLESGRENDEL
Date in Location 29-MAY-96
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 000
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Sustained
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: None T
      Response To Notice Of Default
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None T
        Notice Of Default
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None T
          Df Communication
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: None N
            Delete Entry
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: None T
              Pending, Instituted
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: None E
                Notice Sent; Answer Due (due Date)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: None N
                  Filed And Fee
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 18 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?