Alenazi v. Chertoff
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00247-IEG-CAB
District Judge Irma E. Gonzalez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Salah M. Alenazi, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Emilio T. Gonzalez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
Space Caroline Jane Clark Prime +1 619 546 7183 +1 619 546 7751 caroline.prime@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
Space Caroline Jane Clark Prime +1 619 546 7183 +1 619 546 7751 caroline.prime@usdoj.gov
No Logo Paul M. Pierre, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
Space Caroline Jane Clark Prime +1 619 546 7183 +1 619 546 7751 caroline.prime@usdoj.gov
No Logo Uscis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
Space Caroline Jane Clark Prime +1 619 546 7183 +1 619 546 7751 caroline.prime@usdoj.gov
Office San Diego
Filed 2/8/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $5000
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 8 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County San Diego
Terminated 6/11/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, REMAND
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Order on Motion to Remand to AgencyCourt Filing
ORDER granting [10] Joint Motion to Remand to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/11/2008. Case is remanded to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for adjudiciation of the naturalization application w/in 60 days of this Order. Pla has 60 days to amend the Complaint in event the application is not adjudicated w/in 60 days of this Order. Case closed. (cc: USCIS) (jah)
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008, Terminated: 6/11/2008 Motion to Remand to Agency
    Joint MOTION to Remand to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by USCIS, Michael Chertoff, Paul M. Pierre, Emilio T. Gonzalez. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Clark, Caroline). (jah).
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [8] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Court orders under FRCP 6(b)(1) that time to answer is extended. Defendants USCIS, Michael Chertoff, Paul M. Pierre, and Emilio T. Gonzalez shall file answer or responsive pleading by 6/10/2008. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/8/2008. (jah)
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by USCIS, Michael Chertoff, Paul M. Pierre, Emilio T. Gonzalez. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Clark, Caroline) (jah).
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salah M. Alenazi. Emilio T. Gonzalez served on 2/9/2008, answer due 4/9/2008. (jah)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salah M. Alenazi. Michael Chertoff served on 2/14/2008, answer due 4/14/2008. (jah)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salah M. Alenazi. USCIS, Dept of Homeland Security Office of the General Counsel served on 2/14/2008, answer due 4/14/2008. (jah)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salah M. Alenazi. Summons and Complaint served upon US Attorney's Office, San Diego, CA on 2/11/2008. (jah)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salah M. Alenazi. Paul M. Pierre served on 2/12/2008, answer due 4/14/2008. (jah)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Summons Issued
                  Summons Issued as to Michael Chertoff, Paul M. Pierre, Emilio T. Gonzalez, USCIS. (knh) (mam).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against Michael Chertoff, Paul M. Pierre, Emilio T. Gonzalez, USCIS ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 147420.), filed by Salah M. Alenazi.(knh)(mam).
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 221 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?