Guess? v. Pastabilities, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91100274-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Guess Guess, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pretty & Schroeder, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL J. MACDERMOTT, ESQ
v.
No Logo Pastabilities, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rhodes, Coats & Bennett, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Roberts Rhodes +1 910 273 4422
Type Opposition
Date in Location 30-MAY-97
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 000
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Dismissed
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 5/1/1997, Entered: None T
      Withdrawal Of Opposition W/ Def's Amend.
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 1/21/1997, Entered: None T
        P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 7/12/1996, Entered: None T
          Def's Req For Suspension
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: None T
            D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: None T
              D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: None T
                D's Motion For An Extension Of Time
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: None T
                  Pending, Instituted
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: None E
                    Notice Sent; Answer Due (due Date)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/26/1995, Entered: None N
                      Filed And Fee
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 28 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?