Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball American League Of Professional Baseball Clubs v. Negro Leagues Baseball Museum, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91161257-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, The American League Of Professional Baseball Clubs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowan Liebowitz & Latman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trademark Docketing trademark@cll.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 212 790 9200 mel@cll.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jmn@cll.com
v.
No Logo Negro Leagues Baseball Museum, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Space Select Brands Inc tmdocketing.elbein@hoveywilliams.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jcrawford@hoverywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney JENNIFERKRISP
Date in Location 28-MAR-06
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None T
    Paper Received At Ttab
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None W
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None T
        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None W
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None T
            P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None W
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None T
                P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None S
                  Suspended
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None W
                    P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                      LREF
                      Blank 31 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None S
                      Suspended
                        LREF
                        Blank 30 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None W
                        P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                          LREF
                          Blank 29 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None S
                          Suspended
                            LREF
                            Blank 28 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None W
                            P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                              LREF
                              Blank 27 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None S
                              Suspended
                                LREF
                                Blank 26 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None W
                                P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 25 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None T
                                  Change Of Correspondence Address
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None S
                                    Suspended
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None W
                                      P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None S
                                        Suspended
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 21 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None W
                                          P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None S
                                            Suspended
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None W
                                              P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None S
                                                Suspended
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None W
                                                  P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None S
                                                    Suspended
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None W
                                                      P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None S
                                                        Suspended
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None W
                                                          P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: None T
                                                            #11 Noted; Procs Remain Susp
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None W
                                                              P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None N
                                                                Delete Entry
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None T
                                                                  Procs Herein Are Suspended Until Six Months From The Mailing Date Of This Action
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None T
                                                                    P's Motion On Consent To Continue Suspension Of Proceedings
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None T
                                                                      Correction To Caption; Procs Resumed; Trial Dates Reset
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: None T
                                                                        Proc Susp Six Months
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None W
                                                                          P's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: None N
                                                                            Answer
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: None T
                                                                              Pending, Instituted
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: None T
                                                                                Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: None N
                                                                                  Filed And Fee
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?