Tony Tuan Nguyen v. Coors Brewing Company
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91118052-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tony Tuan Nguyen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tony Nguyen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beerguy Of America, Inc.
v.
No Logo Coors Brewing Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheridan Ross, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sabrina C. Stavish +1 303 863 2972 +1 303 863 0223 choyd@sheridanross.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney CHERYL ABUTLER
Date in Location 21-OCT-04
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
Charge to Location Code 84K
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None T
    Pl's Motion For Reconsideration Is Denied
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None T
      Pl's Reply Brief
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None N
        Terminated
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None T
          Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: None T
            Def's Motion To Dismiss
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None T
              Pl's Communication
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None T
                Procs. Resumed; Trial Dates Reset
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 12/31/2001, Entered: None T
                  Pl's Communication
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: None S
                    Suspended
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None T
                      P's Motion For An Extension Of Time
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: None T
                        Pl Allowed 30 Days To Appoint New Counsel
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: None T
                          Amended Req To Withdraw As Atty
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: None T
                            Pl's Atty Allowed 30 Days To File Acceptable Mot
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: None T
                              Pl's Atty Req To W/draw
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: None N
                                Answer
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: None T
                                  Letter Of Protest -- Denied
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: None T
                                    Pending, Instituted
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: None T
                                      Notice Sent; Trial Dates Reset; Answer Due
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: None N
                                        Filed And Fee
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?