Frame Work, Inc v. Ingram Micro, Inc
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91123444-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Framework, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ELKE F. SUBER, + 215 965 1210
v.
Ingram Micro Ingram Micro, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ingram Micro, Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew H. Simpson, Esq. asimpson@kmob.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney CINDY BGREENBAUM
Date in Location 18-JUN-02
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Sustained
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None T
      Notice Of Default
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: None T
        Def's Mot To Ext Time W/con
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None T
          Pending, Instituted
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None T
            Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: None N
              Filed And Fee
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 28 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?